Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2099410

EP2099410 - COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING MACROMOLECULAR ASSEMBLIES OF LIPID AND SURFACTANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.12.2014
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.12.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Malvern Cosmeceutics Limited
Malvern Hills Science Park Geraldine Road
Malvern, Worcestershire WR14 3SZ / GB
[2009/38]
Inventor(s)01 / TONGE, Stephen
Malvern Cosmeceutics Limited Malvern Hills Science Park Geraldine Road Malvern
Worcestershire WR14 3SZ / GB
02 / HARPER, Andrew
Malvern Cosmeceutics Limited Malvern Hills Science Park Geraldine Road Malvern
Worcestershire WR14 3SZ / GB
 [2009/38]
Representative(s)Goodall, Scott , et al
Sagittarius IP
Marlow International
Parkway
Marlow SL7 1YL / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/19]Goodall, Scott , et al
Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Former [2013/07]Sagittarius IP
Three Globeside
Fieldhouse Lane
Marlow
Buckinghamshire SL7 1HZ / GB
Former [2009/38]Goodall, Scott
Sagittarius IPC Limited Taylor House 39 High Street
Marlow, Buckinghamshire SL7 1AF / GB
Application number, filing date07824940.629.11.2007
[2009/38]
WO2007GB50730
Priority number, dateGB2006002383829.11.2006         Original published format: GB 0623838
GB2006002429005.12.2006         Original published format: GB 0624290
US20060873560P08.12.2006         Original published format: US 873560 P
[2009/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008065451
Date:05.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2099410
Date:16.09.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008
[2009/38]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K8/02, A61K8/14, A61K8/55, A61K8/97, A61Q19/00, A61K9/107, G01N33/68, A61K47/48
[2009/38]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/38]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN MIT MAKROMOLEKULAREN ANORDNUNGEN AUS LIPID UND TENSID[2009/38]
English:COMPOSITIONS COMPRISING MACROMOLECULAR ASSEMBLIES OF LIPID AND SURFACTANT[2009/38]
French:NOUVELLES COMPOSITIONS[2009/38]
Entry into regional phase29.06.2009National basic fee paid 
29.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
24.08.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
16.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
26.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.04.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.10.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.12.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.10.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.08.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.05.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.05.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.12.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.04.2016Date of oral proceedings
04.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
04.05.2016Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination01.07.2016Appeal received No.  T2255/16
05.09.2016Statement of grounds filed
11.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP11181313.5  / EP2428200
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  16.09.2009
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
06.05.2014Request for further processing filed
06.05.2014Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
19.05.2014Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
05.07.2013Request for further processing filed
05.07.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
16.07.2013Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
24.08.2012Request for further processing filed
24.08.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
03.09.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
10.10.2011Request for further processing filed
10.10.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
28.10.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
08.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
16.05.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
30.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
29.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
17.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
18.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
21.05.2018Renewal fee patent year 11
23.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
27.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.201105   M06   Fee paid on   16.05.2012
30.11.201711   M06   Fee paid on   21.05.2018
Cited inInternational search[X]US6897200  (BURKE THOMAS G [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6-177 * column 3, line 12 * * column 13, line 55 * * column 12, lines 64,65; examples 3,7 *;
 [X]US2002102297  (SAFINYA CYRUS R [US] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6-177 * paragraphs [0135] , [0158] , [0179] , [0188]; examples 1,2,4; claim 31 *;
 [X]US6846489  (GARCON NATHALIE MARIE-JOSEPHE [BE] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6-177 * abstract *;
 [X]US5785976  (WESTESEN KIRSTEN [DE] ET AL) [X] 1,2,6-177 * examples 3,6,7,11,21-23,25,30-32 *