blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2104932

EP2104932 - MULTI-PRIMARY CONVERSION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  15.11.2019
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.12.2018
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  26.07.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  08.05.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip23.07.2021Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 25.08.2021  [2021/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TP Vision Holding B.V.
Prins Bernhardplein 200
1097 JB Amsterdam / NL
[2019/02]
Former [2014/42]For all designated states
TP Vision Holding B.V.
Prins Bernhardplein 200
1097 JB Amsterdam / NL
Former [2012/33]For all designated states
TP Vision Holding B.V.
High Tech Campus 5
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
Former [2009/40]For all designated states
Koninklijke Philips Electronics N.V.
Groenewoudseweg 1
5621 BA Eindhoven / NL
Inventor(s)01 / HEKSTRA, Gerben J.
High Tech Campus Building 44
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
02 / KLOMPENHOUWER, Michiel A.
High Tech Campus Building 44
5656 AE Eindhoven / NL
 [2009/40]
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[2019/02]
Former [2014/26]Busch, Patrick, et al
TP Vision Europe B.V.
Intellectual Property Department
Prins Bernhardplein 200 - Floor 8
1097 JB Amsterdam / NL
Former [2013/28]Nederlandsch Octrooibureau
P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS The Hague / NL
Former [2012/41]Hutter, Jacobus Johannes, et al
Nederlandsch Octrooibureau P.O. Box 29720
2502 LS Den Haag / NL
Former [2009/40]Uittenbogaard, Frank
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards P.O. Box 220
5600 AE Eindhoven / NL
Application number, filing date07826770.517.10.2007
[2009/40]
WO2007IB54224
Priority number, dateEP2006012257419.10.2006         Original published format: EP 06122574
[2009/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2008047313
Date:24.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/17]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2104932
Date:30.09.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.04.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/40]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2104932
Date:09.01.2019
Language:EN
[2019/02]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP14.05.2009
ClassificationIPC:G09G3/36, G09G3/20
[2018/33]
CPC:
G09G3/20 (EP,US); H04N9/64 (KR); G09G5/00 (KR);
G09G5/02 (KR); G09G2340/0457 (EP,US); G09G2340/06 (EP,US);
G09G3/3607 (EP,US) (-)
Former IPC [2009/40]G09G3/36
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/02]
Former [2009/40]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:MULTIPRIMÄRE KONVERSION[2009/40]
English:MULTI-PRIMARY CONVERSION[2009/40]
French:CONVERSION À PRIMAIRES MULTIPLES[2009/40]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2009National basic fee paid 
16.11.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
16.11.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.11.2009Examination requested  [2009/52]
15.07.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
29.05.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.11.2018Fee for grant paid
28.11.2018Fee for publishing/printing paid
28.11.2018Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.07.2013
Opposition(s)10.10.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2019/51]
Fees paidRenewal fee
02.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
02.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
30.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
24.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
24.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
22.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU17.10.2007
AT09.01.2019
CY09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
MT09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
TR09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
[2021/34]
Former [2021/32]HU17.10.2007
AT09.01.2019
CY09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
TR09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2021/26]AT09.01.2019
CY09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
TR09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2020/29]AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
MC09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
TR09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2020/17]AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
TR09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2020/13]AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SI09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/49]AT09.01.2019
CZ09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
EE09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
RO09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
SK09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/48]AT09.01.2019
DK09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/46]AT09.01.2019
ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/39]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
LV09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
IS09.05.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/38]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
BG09.04.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/37]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
GR10.04.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/35]ES09.01.2019
FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
PL09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/34]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
SE09.01.2019
PT09.05.2019
Former [2019/33]FI09.01.2019
LT09.01.2019
PT09.05.2019
Cited inInternational search[A]WO02091349  (CLAIRVOYANTE LAB INC [US]) [A] 8,9* the whole document *;
 [A]EP1388818  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]US2005083352  (HIGGINS MICHAEL F [US]) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *;
 [A]WO2006106457  (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-12 * the whole document *
by applicantWO2006106457
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.