Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2088962

EP2088962 - OPTIMIZED STENT JACKET [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  17.08.2018
Database last updated on 15.06.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.09.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  01.05.2017
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip23.11.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): SI
published on 26.12.2018  [2018/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inspiremd Ltd.
3 Menorat HaMaor Street
67448 Tel-aviv / IL
[2009/34]
Inventor(s)01 / HOLZER, Asher
8 Nili Street
43207 Raanana / IL
02 / BAR, Eli
Moshav Megadim
30875 Doar-na Hof Hacarmel / IL
03 / PAZ, Ofir
32 HaTavor Street
75238 Rishon-lezion / IL
 [2009/34]
Representative(s)Abraham, Richard , et al
Maguire Boss
24 East Street
St. Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB
[2017/41]
Former [2009/50]Abraham, Richard , et al
Maguire Boss 24 East Street
St Ives, Cambridgeshire PE27 5PD / GB
Former [2009/34]Miller, James Lionel Woolverton , et al
Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street
London WC1R 4PJ / GB
Application number, filing date07827415.621.11.2007
[2009/34]
WO2007IL01442
Priority number, dateUS20060860486P22.11.2006         Original published format: US 860486 P
[2009/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008062414
Date:29.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2088962
Date:19.08.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008
[2009/34]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2088962
Date:11.10.2017
Language:EN
[2017/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US28.05.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP13.02.2013
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/07, // A61F2/90, A61L31/14
[2017/17]
Former International [2009/34]A61F2/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/41]
Former [2009/34]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:OPTIMIERTER STENTMANTEL[2009/34]
English:OPTIMIZED STENT JACKET[2009/34]
French:GAINE OPTIMISÉE POUR STENT[2009/34]
Entry into regional phase22.06.2009National basic fee paid 
22.06.2009Search fee paid 
22.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
22.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure22.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/34]
04.09.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.12.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.03.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
02.05.2017Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.08.2017Fee for grant paid
30.08.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.08.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17195180.9  / EP3292837
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.06.2016
Opposition(s)12.07.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
26.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
30.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
28.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.200903   M06   Fee paid on   01.12.2009
Rights in Rem or Legal Means of ExecutionID:01
For:AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR
Date:18.04.2012
[2012/24]
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SI11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
MT21.11.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
[2018/52]
Former [2018/43]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
MT21.11.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/42]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
RO11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/36]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
PL11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/35]AT11.10.2017
CZ11.10.2017
DK11.10.2017
EE11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
MC11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
SK11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/24]AT11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
LV11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
BG11.01.2018
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/23]AT11.10.2017
ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
SE11.10.2017
GR12.01.2018
IS11.02.2018
Former [2018/22]ES11.10.2017
FI11.10.2017
LT11.10.2017
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006009835  (OSBORNE THOMAS A [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * paragraphs [0043] , [0045] , [0056] *;
 [X]US5236447  (KUBO YOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 11-20 * column 3, line 13 - line 24 * * column 5, line 29 - line 33 * * column 6, line 18 - line 25 * * column 8, line 66 - line 68 *;
 [X]US5769884  (SOLOVAY KENNETH S [US]) [X] 1 * column 2, line 20 - line 25 * * column 4, line 53 - column 5, line 15 * * column 7, line 16 - line 19 * * claim 1 *;
 [X]US5871538  (DEREUME JEAN-PIERRE GEORGES EM [BE]) [X] 1 * column 1, line 23 - line 31 * * column 2, line 43 - line 45 * * column 2, line 63 - line 65 * * column 4, line 19 - line 21 * * column 5, line 27 - line 31 *;
 [A]US2003100945  (YODFAT OFER [IL], et al) [A] 1-21 * paragraphs [0030] , [0033] *
International search[X]US5769884  (SOLOVAY KENNETH S [US]);
 [Y]US6939376  (BETTS RONALD E [US], et al);
 [Y]US4321711  (MANO HIROSHI)
by applicantUS5871538
 US2004030377
 US2005187140
 US2004236407
 US6902522
 US6669961
 US6447796
 US6369039
 US6939374
 US6919100
    - F. LIISTRO, "Late Acute Thrombosis After Paclitaxel Eluting Stent Implantation", HEART, (200109), vol. 86, pages 262 - 264
    - ZAKARIJA, MD ET AL., "Clopidogrel-Associated TTP: An Update of Pharmacovigilance Efforts Conducted by Independent Researchers, Pharmaceutical Suppliers, and the Food and Drug Administration", STROKE, (200402), pages 533 - 537
    - NGUYEN MSC, PHARM ET AL., "Resistance To Clopidogrel: A Review Of The Evidence", JOURNAL OF THE AMERICAN COLLEGE OF CARDIOLOGY, (20050419), vol. 45, no. 8, doi:doi:10.1016/j.jacc.2005.01.034, XP004896359

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jacc.2005.01.034
    - MONTASER HAJ ET AL., "Acquired Haemophilia May Be Associated With Clopidogrel", BRITISH MEDICAL JOURNAL, (200408), pages 323 - 329
    - "TCT Annual Meeting: Antiplatelet Agents", JOURNAL OF INTERVENTIONAL CARDIOLOGY, (200604), vol. 19, page 193
 WO2006IB51874