Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1999737

EP1999737 - AIRCRAFT COLLISION SENSE AND AVOIDANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  08.03.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.04.2017Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 10.05.2017  [2017/19]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-1596 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/50]For all designated states
The Boeing Company
100 North Riverside Plaza
Chicago, IL 60606-2016 / US
Inventor(s)01 / ABRAHAM, Michael, R.
17 Forest Haven Court
O'fallon, MO 63366 / US
02 / YELTON, Dennis, J.
9520 Palomas Ave. N.E.
Albuquerque, NM 87109 / US
03 / SANDERS-REED, Jack
26 Meadow View Rd.
Cedar Crest, NM 87008 / US
04 / WITT, Christian, C.
6308 Corte Alzira N.W.
Albuquerque, NM 87114 / US
05 / MUSIAL, Christopher J.
4916 College Heights Dr. N.W.
Albuquerque, NM 87120 / US
 [2008/50]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2013/15]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2009/52]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2008/50]McLeish, Nicholas Alistair Maxwell
Boult Wade Tennant Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road
GB-London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date07835703.519.02.2007
[2008/50]
WO2007US04547
Priority number, dateUS2006037480713.03.2006         Original published format: US 374807
[2008/50]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008020889
Date:21.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/08]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP1999737
Date:10.12.2008
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008
[2008/50]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1999737
Date:10.04.2013
Language:EN
[2013/15]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:G08G5/04, G01S13/93
[2008/50]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/50]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG UND VERHINDERUNG VON FLUGZEUGKOLLISIONEN[2008/50]
English:AIRCRAFT COLLISION SENSE AND AVOIDANCE SYSTEM AND METHOD[2008/50]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE DÉTECTION ET D'ÉVITEMENT DE COLLISIONS D'AVIONS[2008/50]
Entry into regional phase08.10.2008National basic fee paid 
08.10.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
08.10.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.10.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.10.2008Examination requested  [2008/50]
17.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.09.2012Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 20.09.2012
20.09.2012Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
10.10.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.02.2013Fee for grant paid
18.02.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.09.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  10.01.2014  23.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Airbus Defence and Space GmbH
Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
LKGLOBAL Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte
Brienner Straße 11
80333 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2017/19]
Opponent(s)01  10.01.2014  23.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Airbus Defence and Space GmbH
Willy-Messerschmitt-Straße 1
82024 Taufkirchen / DE
Opponent's representative
Lorenz & Kopf PartG mbB Patentanwälte, LKGLOBAL
Brienner Straße 11
80333 München / DE
Former [2016/17]
Opponent(s)01  10.01.2014  23.01.2014  ADMISSIBLE
EADS Deutschland GmbH
Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse
85521 Ottobrunn / DE
Opponent's representative
Kopf Westenberger Wachenhausen Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Brienner Straße 11
80333 München / DE
Former [2014/08]
Opponent(s)01  10.01.2014   
EADS Deutschland GmbH
Willy-Messerschmitt-Strasse
85521 Ottobrunn / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Engineering
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
17.02.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.06.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
26.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
29.03.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
29.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition24.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1272/16
05.08.2016Statement of grounds filed
20.03.2017Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2017/13]
24.03.2017Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [2017/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
16.02.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.02.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
24.02.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.02.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.02.2007
AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
IT10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
MC10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
RO10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
TR10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
IE19.02.2014
LU19.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
DE02.09.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU19.02.2007
AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
IT10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
MC10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
RO10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
IE19.02.2014
LU19.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
DE02.09.2014
Former [2015/08]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
IT10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
MC10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
RO10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
IE19.02.2014
LU19.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
DE02.09.2014
Former [2015/07]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
IT10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
MC10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
RO10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
IE19.02.2014
LU19.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/46]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
IT10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
MC10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
RO10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
LU19.02.2014
CH28.02.2014
LI28.02.2014
Former [2014/44]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
IT10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
MC10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
RO10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
LU19.02.2014
Former [2014/11]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
IT10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
RO10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2014/10]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
CZ10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
SK10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2014/09]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
DK10.04.2013
EE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/52]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
CY10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/50]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
LV10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
PL10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
BG10.07.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/49]AT10.04.2013
BE10.04.2013
FI10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
SE10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
GR11.07.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/48]AT10.04.2013
LT10.04.2013
NL10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
ES21.07.2013
IS10.08.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/47]LT10.04.2013
SI10.04.2013
PT12.08.2013
Former [2013/37]SI10.04.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]US5581250  (KHVILIVITZKY ALEXANDER [US]) [Y] 1-32 * column 2, lines 29-46 * * column 4, lines 31-62 * * column 5, lines 18-39 *;
 [A]EP1505556  (BODENSEEWERK GERAETETECH [DE]) [A] 1,6,7,9,10,13,15,20,22,25,28 * column 2, paragraphs 8,9 * * column 3, paragraph 10 * * column 4, paragraph 12 * * column 5, paragraph 13 * * column 9, paragraph 28 *;
 [DY]  - SANDERS-REED J N, "Multi-Target, Multi-Sensor, Closed Loop Tracking", ACQUISITION, TRACKING AND POINTING XVIII, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng USA ISSN: 0277-786X, (200404), vol. 5430, pages 94 - 112, XP002467717 [DY] 1-32 * page 96, paragraphs 1,2,5 * * page 99, paragraph 3.2 * * page 100, paragraph 3.3 * * page 106, paragraph L *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.542932
 [A]  - SANDERS-REED J N ET AL, "Multi-target tracking in clutter", LASER WEAPONS TECHNOLOGY III 1 APRIL 2002 ORLANDO, FL, USA, Proceedings of the SPIE - The International Society for Optical Engineering SPIE-Int. Soc. Opt. Eng USA, (200204), vol. 4724, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 30 - 36, XP002467718 [A] 1-32 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.472371
by applicantUS5581250
 US2006055628