Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2092196

EP2092196 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATION OF A PUMP [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  08.08.2014
Database last updated on 22.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Entegris, Inc.
129 Concord Road
Billerica, MA 01821-4600 / US
[2010/48]
Former [2009/35]For all designated states
Entegris, Inc.
3500 Lyman Boulevard
Chaska, MN 55318 / US
Inventor(s)01 / GONNELLA, George
24 Elliott Street
Pepperell, MA 01463-0412 / US
02 / CEDRONE, James
104 Magnolia Street
Braintree, MA 02184 / US
03 / MAGOON, Paul
20 Sarah Drive
Merrimack, NH 03054 / US
 [2009/35]
Representative(s)DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/09]DREISS Patentanwälte PartG mbB
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2013/30]Dreiss
Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Former [2009/35]Meier, Christof
Dreiss Patentanwälte Postfach 10 37 62
70032 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date07836336.330.07.2007
[2009/35]
WO2007US17017
Priority number, dateUS20060861856P30.11.2006         Original published format: US 861856 P
[2009/35]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008066589
Date:05.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2092196
Date:26.08.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008
[2009/35]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2092196
Date:02.10.2013
Language:EN
[2013/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US04.09.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.09.2011
ClassificationInternational:F04B49/06, F04B51/00
[2011/42]
Former International [2009/35]F04B49/06, F04B51/00, G01M19/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/35]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETRIEB EINER PUMPE[2009/35]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR OPERATION OF A PUMP[2009/35]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN UVRE D'UNE POMPE[2009/35]
Entry into regional phase06.06.2009National basic fee paid 
06.06.2009Search fee paid 
06.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
06.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.10.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: US
06.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/35]
10.04.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
05.09.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.04.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2013Fee for grant paid
21.08.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.05.2012
Opposition(s)03.07.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/37]
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
26.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU30.07.2007
AT02.10.2013
BE02.10.2013
BG02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
CZ02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
ES02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
MT02.10.2013
PL02.10.2013
RO02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SK02.10.2013
TR02.10.2013
GR03.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU30.07.2007
AT02.10.2013
BE02.10.2013
BG02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
CZ02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
ES02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
MT02.10.2013
PL02.10.2013
RO02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SK02.10.2013
GR03.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2016/28]AT02.10.2013
BE02.10.2013
BG02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
CZ02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
ES02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
MT02.10.2013
PL02.10.2013
RO02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SK02.10.2013
GR03.01.2014
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2016/25]AT02.10.2013
BE02.10.2013
BG02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
CZ02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
ES02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
PL02.10.2013
RO02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SK02.10.2013
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2016/21]AT02.10.2013
BE02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
CZ02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
ES02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
MC02.10.2013
PL02.10.2013
RO02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SK02.10.2013
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2014/41]AT02.10.2013
BE02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
CZ02.10.2013
DK02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
ES02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
PL02.10.2013
RO02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SK02.10.2013
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2014/37]AT02.10.2013
BE02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
CZ02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
ES02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
PL02.10.2013
RO02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
SK02.10.2013
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2014/36]AT02.10.2013
BE02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
CZ02.10.2013
EE02.10.2013
ES02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
PL02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2014/28]AT02.10.2013
BE02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
CZ02.10.2013
ES02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
PL02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
IS02.02.2014
PT03.02.2014
Former [2014/26]AT02.10.2013
BE02.10.2013
CY02.10.2013
CZ02.10.2013
ES02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
PL02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
IS02.02.2014
Former [2014/25]AT02.10.2013
BE02.10.2013
CZ02.10.2013
ES02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
LV02.10.2013
PL02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
IS02.02.2014
Former [2014/24]AT02.10.2013
BE02.10.2013
CZ02.10.2013
ES02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
PL02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
IS02.02.2014
Former [2014/23]BE02.10.2013
CZ02.10.2013
FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
IS02.02.2014
Former [2014/22]FI02.10.2013
LT02.10.2013
SE02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
Former [2014/20]LT02.10.2013
SI02.10.2013
Former [2014/12]SI02.10.2013
Documents cited:Search[XI]US7013223  (ZHANG QIN [US], et al) [X] 1,12,22 * column 4, line 38 - column 6, line 27 * [I] 2-11,13-21,23-29;
 [A]US6901791  (FRENZ THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1,12,22 * abstract *;
 [A]US2006015294  (YETTER FORREST G JR [US], et al) [A] 1,12,22 * paragraphs [0052] , [0056]; claim 8 *;
 [A]US2006184264  (WILLIS JAMES E [US], et al) [A] 1,12,22 * abstract *
International search[X]US7013223
 [A]US6901791
by applicant US7013223