EP2052223 - FLOW MEASUREMENT DIAGNOSTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.10.2020 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 25.10.2019 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 07.06.2019 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.11.2020 [2020/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Rosemount Inc. 12001 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | [2016/45] |
Former [2009/18] | For all designated states Rosemount, Inc. 12001 Technology Drive Eden Prairie, MN 55344 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WEHRS, David, L. 16480 North Hillcrest Court Eden Prairie, MN 55346 / US | [2009/18] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [2019/48] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/18] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07836452.8 | 02.08.2007 | [2009/18] | WO2007US17301 | Priority number, date | US20060503878 | 14.08.2006 Original published format: US 503878 | [2009/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008021017 | Date: | 21.02.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/08] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2052223 | Date: | 29.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 21.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2052223 | Date: | 27.11.2019 | Language: | EN | [2019/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G01F25/00, G01F15/00 | [2009/18] | CPC: |
G01F15/00 (EP,US);
G01F25/10 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, LI [2019/48] |
Former [2009/37] | CH, DE, LI | ||
Former [2009/18] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | FLUSSMESSUNGSDIAGNOSEN | [2009/18] | English: | FLOW MEASUREMENT DIAGNOSTICS | [2009/18] | French: | DIAGNOSTIC DE MESURE D'ÉCOULEMENT | [2009/18] | Entry into regional phase | 18.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 18.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 15.03.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 21.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.04.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.06.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.10.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.03.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 30.03.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 14.06.2019 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.10.2019 | Fee for grant paid | 16.10.2019 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 16.10.2019 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 15.05.2015 | Appeal received No. T1674/15 | 06.08.2015 | Statement of grounds filed | 01.03.2019 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.06.2011 | Opposition(s) | 28.08.2020 | No opposition filed within time limit [2020/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.08.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 29.08.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 28.08.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.08.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.08.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]EP0827096 (FOXBORO CO [US]) [X] 1,7,10,14 * page 3, line 48 - page 22, line 51; figure - *; | [X]WO0050851 (ROSEMOUNT INC [US]) [X] 1,5,8-15,19-21,24,25 * the whole document *; | [X]US2005011278 (BROWN GREGORY C [US], et al) [X] 1-4,10,16-18,22,23 * paragraphs [0019] - [0094]; figure - *; | [X]US2005284237 (HENRY MANUS P [GB], et al) [X] 1,6,7,10* paragraphs [0466] - [0483]; figure 45 * |