Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2061561

EP2061561 - Compositions for treating cancer [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/22]METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CANCER
[2013/07]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  07.06.2013
Database last updated on 09.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.05.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
14.05.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Janssen Oncology, Inc.
10990 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1200
Los Angeles CA 90024 / US
[2013/31]
Former [2009/22]For all designated states
Cougar Biotechnology, Inc.
10990 Wilshire Blvd. Suite 1200
Los Angeles CA 90024 / US
Inventor(s)01 / AUERBACH, Alan, H.
Cougar Biotechnology, Inc
10990 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1200
Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US
02 / BELLDEGRUN, Arie, S.
Cougar Biotechnology, Inc
10990 Wilshire Blvd., Suite 1200
Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US
 [2013/07]
Former [2009/28]01 / AUERBACH, Alan, H.
c/o Cougar Biotechnology, Inc 10990 Wilshire Blvd., suite 1200
Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US
02 / BELLDEGRUN, Arie, S.
c/o Cougar Biotechnology, Inc 10990 Wilshire Blvd., suite 1200
Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US
Former [2009/22]01 / AUERBACH, Alan, H.
10990 Wilshire Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US
02 / BELLDEGRUN, Arie, S.
10990 Wilshire Blvd.
Los Angeles, CA 90024 / US
Representative(s)Oates, Edward Christopher , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/28]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2011/31]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2009/22]Ritter, Thomas Kurt , et al
Jones Day Prinzregentenstraße 11
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date07837326.323.08.2007
[2009/22]
WO2007US18769
Priority number, dateUS20060921506P25.08.2006         Original published format: US 921506 P
[2009/22]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008024484
Date:28.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/09]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2061561
Date:27.05.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008
[2009/22]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2061561
Date:10.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/28]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.02.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K31/573, A61P35/00, A61K31/58, A61K45/06
[2013/07]
Former International [2009/22]A61P35/00, A61K31/58, A61K45/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/22]
Extension statesAL23.03.2009
BA23.03.2009
HR23.03.2009
MK23.03.2009
RS23.03.2009
TitleGerman:Zusammensetzungen zur Behandlung von Krebs[2013/07]
English:Compositions for treating cancer[2013/07]
French:Compositions servant à traiter un cancer[2013/07]
Former [2009/22]VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS
Former [2009/22]METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR TREATING CANCER
Former [2009/22]PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS SERVANT À TRAITER UN CANCER
Entry into regional phase23.03.2009National basic fee paid 
23.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
23.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.03.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/22]
11.03.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
06.09.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.05.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
01.10.2012Observations by third parties
15.10.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.03.2013Observations by third parties
24.05.2013Fee for grant paid
24.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
20.06.2013Observations by third parties
Divisional application(s)EP12160586.9  / EP2478907
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  11.03.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  05.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  07.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Hetero Corporate, 7-2-A2
Industrial Estates, Sanath Nagar
Hyderabad-500 018, A.P. / IN
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents ApS
Symbion Box:33
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 06  08.04.2014  22.04.2015  WITHDRAWN
CABINET LAVOIX
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix, et al
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 07  09.04.2014  07.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 08  10.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Galenicum Health S.L., et al
Avenida Diagonal 123, Floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
 09  09.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 10  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 11  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 12  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 13  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison, et al
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
GB-York YO1 8NQ / GB
 14  10.04.2014  02.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 15  09.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2019/21]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  05.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  07.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Hetero Corporate, 7-2-A2
Industrial Estates, Sanath Nagar
Hyderabad-500 018, A.P. / IN
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents ApS
Symbion Box:33
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 06  08.04.2014  22.04.2015  WITHDRAWN
CABINET LAVOIX
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix, et al
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 07  09.04.2014  07.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 08  10.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Galenicum Health S.L., et al
Avenida Diagonal 123, Floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
 09  09.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 10  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 11  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 12  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 13  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison, et al
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
GB-York YO1 8NQ / GB
 14  10.04.2014  02.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 15  09.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2019/19]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  05.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  07.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Hetero Corporate, 7-2-A2
Industrial Estates, Sanath Nagar
Hyderabad-500 018, A.P. / IN
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents ApS
Symbion Box:33
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 06  08.04.2014  22.04.2015  WITHDRAWN
CABINET LAVOIX
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix, et al
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 07  09.04.2014  07.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 08  10.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Galenicum Health S.L., et al
Avenida Diagonal 123, Floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
 09  09.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 10  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 11  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington and Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 12  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 13  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison, et al
HGF Limited
Saviour House
9 St Saviourgate
GB-York YO1 8NQ / GB
 14  10.04.2014  02.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al
Patentanwälte
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB
Eastsite One
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 15  09.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2018/52]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  05.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  07.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Hetero Corporate, 7-2-A2
Industrial Estates, Sanath Nagar
Hyderabad-500 018, A.P. / IN
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents ApS
Symbion Box:33
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 06  08.04.2014  22.04.2015  WITHDRAWN
CABINET LAVOIX
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix, et al
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 07  09.04.2014  07.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 08  10.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Galenicum Health S.L., et al
Avenida Diagonal 123, Floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
 09  09.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 10  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patent- und Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 11  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Elkington & Fife LLP, et al
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
 12  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 13  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison, et al
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
 14  10.04.2014  02.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 15  09.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2018/02]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  05.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  07.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Hetero Corporate, 7-2-A2
Industrial Estates, Sanath Nagar
Hyderabad-500 018, A.P. / IN
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents ApS
Symbion Box:33
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 06  08.04.2014  22.04.2015  WITHDRAWN
CABINET LAVOIX
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix, et al
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 07  09.04.2014  07.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 08  10.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Galenicum Health S.L., et al
Avenida Diagonal 123, Floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
 09  09.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 10  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm&Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 11  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 12  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 13  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison, et al
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
 14  10.04.2014  02.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 15  09.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2016/33]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  05.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  07.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Hetero Corporate, 7-2-A2
Industrial Estates, Sanath Nagar
Hyderabad-500 018, A.P. / IN
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents ApS
Symbion Box:33
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 06  08.04.2014  22.04.2015  WITHDRAWN
CABINET LAVOIX
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Lavoix, et al
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
FR-75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 07  09.04.2014  07.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 08  10.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Galenicum Health S.L., et al
Avenida Diagonal 123, Floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
 09  09.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 10  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 11  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 12  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 13  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison, et al
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
 14  10.04.2014  02.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 15  09.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2016/21]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  05.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  07.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Hetero Corporate, 7-2-A2
Industrial Estates, Sanath Nagar
Hyderabad-500 018, A.P. / IN
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents ApS
Symbion Box:33
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 06  08.04.2014  22.04.2015  WITHDRAWN
CABINET LAVOIX
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Holtz, Béatrice, et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 07  09.04.2014  07.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 08  10.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Galenicum Health S.L., et al
Avenida Diagonal 123, Floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
 09  09.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 10  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 11  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 12  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 13  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison, et al
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
 14  10.04.2014  02.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 15  09.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2016/11]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  05.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  07.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Hetero Corporate, 7-2-A2
Industrial Estates, Sanath Nagar
Hyderabad-500 018, A.P. / IN
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents ApS
Symbion Box:33
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 06  08.04.2014  22.04.2015  WITHDRAWN
CABINET LAVOIX
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Holtz, Béatrice, et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 07  09.04.2014  07.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 08  10.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Galenicum Health S.L., et al
Avenida Diagonal 123, Floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
 09  09.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 10  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Hamm & Wittkopp Patentanwälte PartmbB, et al
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 11  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 12  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 13  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison, et al
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
 14  10.04.2014  02.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 15  09.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2015/43]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  05.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  07.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Hetero Corporate, 7-2-A2
Industrial Estates, Sanath Nagar
Hyderabad-500 018, A.P. / IN
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents ApS
Symbion Box:33
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 06  08.04.2014  22.04.2015  WITHDRAWN
CABINET LAVOIX
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Holtz, Béatrice, et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 07  09.04.2014  07.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 08  10.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Galenicum Health S.L., et al
Avenida Diagonal 123, Floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
 09  09.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 10  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Wittkopp, Alexander, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 11  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 12  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 13  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison, et al
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
 14  10.04.2014  02.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 15  09.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2015/41]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  05.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  07.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Hetero Corporate, 7-2-A2
Industrial Estates, Sanath Nagar
Hyderabad-500 018, A.P. / IN
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents ApS
Symbion Box:33
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 06  08.04.2014  07.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
CABINET LAVOIX
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Holtz, Béatrice, et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 07  09.04.2014  07.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 08  10.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Galenicum Health S.L., et al
Avenida Diagonal 123, Floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
 09  09.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 10  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Wittkopp, Alexander, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 11  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 12  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 13  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison, et al
Alison Gallafent Ltd
21 Bridge St
Llandeilo SA19 6BN / GB
 14  10.04.2014  02.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 15  09.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2015/09]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
 04  05.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  07.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Hetero Corporate, 7-2-A2
Industrial Estates, Sanath Nagar
Hyderabad-500 018, A.P. / IN
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents ApS
Symbion Box:33
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 06  08.04.2014  07.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
CABINET LAVOIX
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
F-75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Holtz, Béatrice, et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 07  09.04.2014  07.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
 08  10.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Galenicum Health S.L., et al
Avenida Diagonal 123, Floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
 09  09.04.2014  08.07.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 10  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Wittkopp, Alexander, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 11  10.04.2014  16.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Thavies Inn House
3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 12  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 13  10.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
4 George Street
Llandeilo, South Wales SA19 6AS / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison, et al
Alison Gallafent Ltd 4 George Street
Llandeilo, South Wales SA19 6AS / GB
 14  10.04.2014  02.06.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 15  09.04.2014  15.05.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
Hoffmann Eitle
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB
Arabellastraße 30
81925 München / DE
Former [2014/21]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014   
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014   
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.04.2014   
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 04  05.04.2014   
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  07.04.2014   
Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Hetero Corporate, 7-2-A2
Industrial Estates, Sanath Nagar
Hyderabad-500 018, A.P. / IN
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents ApS
Symbion Box:33
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 06  08.04.2014   
CABINET LAVOIX
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
F-75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Holtz, Béatrice, et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 07  09.04.2014   
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
 08  10.04.2014   
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Marjanet Artigas, Georgina, et al
Galenicum Health S.L.
Intellectual Property
Avenida Diagonal 123
Floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
 09  09.04.2014   
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries LTD.
5 Basel Street
Petah Tiqva 49131 / IL
Opponent's representative
Best, Michael, et al
Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Unsöldstrasse 2
80538 München / DE
 10  10.04.2014   
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Wittkopp, Alexander, et al
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 11  10.04.2014   
Generics [UK] Limited
(trading as Mylan)
Albany Gate
Darkes Lane
Potters Bar
Hertfordshire EN6 1AG / GB
Opponent's representative
Gillard, Richard Edward, et al
Elkington and Fife LLP Thavies Inn House 3-4 Holborn Circus
London EC1N 2HA / GB
 12  10.04.2014   
Actavis Group PTC ehf
Reykjavikurvegi 76-78
220 Hafnarfjördur / IS
Opponent's representative
Murray, Adrian D'Coligny, et al
Pinsent Masons
30 Crown Place
Earl Street
London
EC2A 4ES / GB
 13  10.04.2014   
Gallafent, Alison
Alison Gallafent Ltd
4 George Street
Llandeilo, South Wales SA19 6AS / GB
Opponent's representative
Gallafent, Alison, et al
Alison Gallafent Ltd 4 George Street
Llandeilo, South Wales SA19 6AS / GB
 14  10.04.2014   
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP
Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Jacobi, Markus Alexander, et al
Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler LLP Eastsite One Seckenheimer Landstrasse 4
68163 Mannheim / DE
 15  09.04.2014   
Zentiva k.s.
U kabelovny 130
10237 Praha 10 / CZ
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
Former [2014/20]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014   
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014   
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 03  04.04.2014   
Laboratorios Léon Farma, S.A.
Pol. Ind. Navatejera C/La Vallina s/n
24008 Villaquilambre, Leon / ES
Opponent's representative
HOFFMANN EITLE
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Arabellastrasse 4
81925 München / DE
 04  05.04.2014   
STADA Arzneimittel AG
Stadastrasse 2-18
61118 Bad Vilbel / DE
Opponent's representative
Kernebeck, Thomas, et al
Kernebeck Patentanwalts GmbH
Stiftstraße 2
60313 Frankfurt am Main / DE
 05  07.04.2014   
Hetero Drugs Ltd.
Hetero Corporate, 7-2-A2
Industrial Estates, Sanath Nagar
Hyderabad-500 018, A.P. / IN
Opponent's representative
ZBM Patents ApS
Symbion Box:33
Fruebjergvej 3
2100 Copenhagen Ø / DK
 06  08.04.2014   
CABINET LAVOIX
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
F-75009 Paris / FR
Opponent's representative
Holtz, Béatrice, et al
Cabinet Lavoix
2, place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
 07  09.04.2014   
Synthon B.V./Genthon B.V.
Microweg 22
6545 CM Nijmegen / NL
Opponent's representative
Prins, Hendrik Willem, et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK The Hague / NL
 08  10.04.2014   
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Marjanet Artigas, Georgina, et al
Galenicum Health S.L.
Intellectual Property
Avenida Diagonal 123
Floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Former [2014/19]
Opponent(s)01  02.04.2014   
Alfred E. Tiefenbacher (GmbH & Co. KG)
Van-der-Smissen-Straße 1
22767 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
 02  02.04.2014   
Helm AG
Nordkanalstrasse 28
20097 Hamburg / DE
Opponent's representative
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Jungfernstieg 38
20354 Hamburg / DE
21.05.2014No. 14: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
02.06.2014No. 14: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
18.07.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.06.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
15.02.2016Date of oral proceedings
11.03.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
11.03.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
Appeal following opposition20.05.2016Appeal received No.  T1258/16
21.07.2016Statement of grounds filed
11.02.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
17.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
10.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Cited inInternational search[X]WO2004037269  (PANTARHEI BIOSCIENCE BV [NL], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7-9,27,28,32,33,36 * claims 14-19 * * page 12, line 11 - page 13, line 32 *;
 [X]US2006030608  (NELSON RICHARD M [US], et al) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,27,28 * paragraph [0186] * * paragraph [0197] * * paragraph [0241] * * paragraph [0191] * * paragraph [0193] * * paragraph [0196] *;
 [X]WO02053138  (SHANAHAN-PRENDERGAST ELISABETH [IE]) [X] 1,2,5,7,8,27,28 * claims 1,7-9 * * page 12, line 20 - page 13, line 31 * * page 14, line 29 - page 19, line 25 * * page 16, line 30 * * page 21, line 9 - page 22, line 21 *;
 [DA]WO2006021776  (BTG INT LTD [GB], et al);
 [X]  - O'DONNELL A ET AL, "Hormonal impact of the 17[alpha]-hydroxylase/C17,20-lyase inhibitor abiraterone acetate (CB7630) in patients with prostate cancer", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER 14 JUN 2004 UNITED KINGDOM, (20040614), vol. 90, no. 12, ISSN 0007-0920, pages 2317 - 2325, XP002464868 [X] 1,2,4-6,9,22,23,25-28,30-32,35 * page 2318, column R, paragraph 1 * * page 2319, column L, paragraph 7 - column R, paragraph 13 * * page 2320, column R, paragraph 2 * * page 2323, column R, paragraph 4 *
 [A]  - MADAN RAVI A ET AL, "Abiraterone Cougar Biotechnology", IDRUGS, CURRENT DRUGS LTD, GB, (2006), vol. 9, no. 1, ISSN 1369-7056, pages 49 - 55, XP008087480
Examination   - WALSH ET AL, "Docetaxel Plus Prednisone or Mitoxantrone Plus Prednisone for Advanced Prostate Cancer", JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, LIPPINCOTT WILLIAMS & WILKINS, BALTIMORE, MD, US, vol. 173, no. 2, doi:10.1016/S0022-5347(05)60500-9, ISSN 0022-5347, (20050201), page 456, (20050201), XP025376626

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-5347(05)60500-9
    - JAKOBSEN A ET AL, "Medroxyprogesterone acetate and prednisone in advanced breast cancer. A randomized trial", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF CANCER AND CLINICAL ONCOLOGY, OXFORD, GB, vol. 22, no. 9, ISSN 0277-5379, (19860901), pages 1067 - 1072, (19860901), XP026213975

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0277-5379(86)90007-6
    - DANILA D C ET AL, "Phase II multicenter study of abiraterone acetate plus prednisone therapy in patients with docetaxel-treated castration-resistant prostate cancer", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY 20100320 AMERICAN SOCIETY OF CLINICAL ONCOLOGY USA LNKD- DOI:10.1200/JCO.2009.25.9259, (20100320), vol. 28, no. 9, ISSN 0732-183X, pages 1496 - 1501
otherWO9320097
    - O'DONNEL A. ET AL, "Hormonal impact of the 17[alpha]-hydroxylase/C17,20-lyase inhibitor abiraterone acetate (CB7630) in patients with prostate cancer.", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CANCER, (2004), vol. 90, pages 2317 - 2325, XP002464868
    - RAVI A. MADAN ET AL, "Abiraterone Cougar Biotechnology.", IDRUGS, (2006), vol. 9, no. 1, pages 49 - 55, XP008087480
    - GERBER G.S. ET AL, "Prostate specific antigen for assessing response to ketoconazole and prednisone in patients with hormone refractory metastatic prostate cancer.", THE JOURNAL OF UROLOGY, (1990), vol. 144, pages 1177 - 1179, XP008151701
    - "Corticosteroid.", WIKIPEDIA ARTICLE, pages 1 - 7, XP003030719
    - BARRIE S.E. ET AL, "Pharmacology of Novel Steroidal Inhibitors of Cytochrome P450 17.alpha (17.alpha.-Hydroxylase/C17-20 Lyase)", JOURNAL OF STEROID BIOCHEMISTRY AND MOLECULAR BIOLOGY, (19940901), vol. 50, no. 5-6, pages 167 - 273, XP002581259