blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2064107

EP2064107 - FOUR WHEEL DRIVE SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.04.2016
Database last updated on 25.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.04.2016No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 25.05.2016  [2016/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Lawson, Thomas Towles Jr.
512 North First Street
Charlottesville VA 22902 / US
[2015/40]
Former [2009/23]For all designated states
Lawson, Thomas Towles Jr.
411 North First Street
Charlottesville VA 22902 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/23]
Representative(s)Ablett, Graham Keith, et al
Ablett & Stebbing
7-8 Market Place
London, W1W 8AG / GB
[2015/25]
Former [2010/03]Ablett, Graham Keith, et al
Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street
London, W1U 6FQ / GB
Former [2009/49]Ablett, Graham Keith, et al
Ablett & Stebbing, Caparo House, 101-103 Baker Street
London W1M 1FD / GB
Former [2009/23]Ablett, Graham Keith, et al
Ablett & Stebbing Caparo House 101-103 Baker Street
London W1U 6FQ / GB
Application number, filing date07837344.624.08.2007
[2009/23]
WO2007US18788
Priority number, dateUS2006046767428.08.2006         Original published format: US 467674
[2009/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2008027320
Date:06.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/10]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2064107
Date:03.06.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.03.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/23]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2064107
Date:17.06.2015
Language:EN
[2015/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US24.04.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP24.06.2010
ClassificationIPC:B62D11/06
[2009/23]
CPC:
B62D9/002 (EP,US); B62D11/003 (EP,US); B62D11/24 (EP,US);
B60K17/354 (EP,US); B60Y2200/221 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT [2015/25]
Former [2009/41]DE,  ES,  FR,  GB,  IT 
Former [2009/23]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:VIERRADANTRIEBSSYSTEM[2009/23]
English:FOUR WHEEL DRIVE SYSTEM[2009/23]
French:TRANSMISSION A QUATRE ROUES MOTRICES[2009/23]
Entry into regional phase25.03.2009National basic fee paid 
25.03.2009Search fee paid 
25.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
25.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/23]
31.03.2009Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s)
11.05.2009Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, FI, GR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR
24.01.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.06.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.02.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.04.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.06.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.12.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
30.04.2015Fee for grant paid
30.04.2015Fee for publishing/printing paid
30.04.2015Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.06.2011
Opposition(s)18.03.2016No opposition filed within time limit [2016/21]
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
19.04.2012Request for further processing filed
19.04.2012Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.05.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
28.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
15.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
22.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]DE1930501  (KLAUE HERMANN) [X] 1,2,4,8-10* figures 1,2,5-7 *;
 [X]WO0032462  (GRANT VERNON JOEL [AU], et al) [X] 1,2,4-13 * the whole document *;
 [XYI]US6135231  (REED JAMES RICHARD [US]) [X] 1,2,4-6,8-12 * column 1, lines 52-56; figures 1-6; claim 1 * [Y] 3 [I] 7,13;
 [X]WO0228677  (SPARK IAN JAMES [AU]) [X] 1,2,4-13 * page 4, lines 16-24; figure 1 *;
 [Y]US2004116232  (LAWSON THOMAS TOWLES [US]) [Y] 3 * figures 1,2 *;
 [X]US6761234  (LAMELA ANTHONY J [US], et al) [X] 1,4-13 * figures 1-7 *;
 [X]WO2005030520  (DEERE & CO [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4,8-10 * figure 1 *
International search[Y]US3972379  (NORRIS CHARLIE L);
 [X]US2005070390  (IRIKURA KOJI [JP], et al)
ExaminationWO02102644
by applicantUS6135231
 US6957731
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.