Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2084310

EP2084310 - POLYMER-FREE COATINGS FOR MEDICAL DEVICES FORMED BY PLASMA ELECTROLYTIC DEPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Boston Scientific Limited
P.O. Box 1317 Seaston House Hastings
Christ Church / BB
[2009/32]
Inventor(s)01 / ATANASOSKA, Liliana
5209 Windsor Avenue
Edina, MN 55436 / US
02 / WEBER, Jan
Holdaal 49 6228 Gj
Maastricht / NL
03 / WARNER, Robert
1665 Lamplight Drive
Woodbury, MN 55125 / US
04 / LARSEN, Steve, R.
6048 Foxtail Drive
Lino Lakes, MN 55110 / US
 [2009/35]
Former [2009/32]01 / ATANASOKA, Liliana
5209 Windsor Avenue
Edina, MN 55436 / US
02 / WEBER, Jan
Holdaal 49 6228 Gj
Maastricht / NL
03 / WARNER, Robert
1665 Lamplight Drive
Woodbury, MN 55125 / US
04 / LARSEN, Steve, R.
6048 Foxtail Drive
Lino Lakes, MN 55110 / US
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/32]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date07838346.018.09.2007
[2009/32]
WO2007US20124
Priority number, dateUS20060849466P05.10.2006         Original published format: US 849466 P
[2009/32]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008045184
Date:17.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/16]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2084310
Date:05.08.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.04.2008
[2009/32]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP17.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:C25D5/00, C23C28/00
[2009/32]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/32]
TitleGerman:DURCH PLASMAELEKTROLYTISCHE ABSCHEIDUNG GEBILDETE POLYMERFREIE ÜBERZÜGE FÜR MEDIZINISCHE VORRICHTUNGEN[2009/32]
English:POLYMER-FREE COATINGS FOR MEDICAL DEVICES FORMED BY PLASMA ELECTROLYTIC DEPOSITION[2009/32]
French:REVÊTEMENTS EXEMPTS DE POLYMÈRE POUR DISPOSITIFS MÉDICAUX FORMÉS PAR DÉPÔT ÉLECTROLYTIQUE DE PLASMA[2009/32]
Entry into regional phase04.05.2009National basic fee paid 
04.05.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
04.05.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.05.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
04.05.2009Examination requested  [2009/32]
21.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/51]
07.08.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/51]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  21.02.2013
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
07.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.09.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[XY]WO03094774  (PLASMA COATINGS LTD [GB]; ANDERSON DUNCAN M [GB]) [X] 1,5,10-15,22,33-37 * page 3, line 20 - page 5, line 27; claims 1-24 * [Y] 6-8,16,32;
 [X]WO03083181  (ISLE COAT LTD [GB]; SHATROV ALEXANDER SERGEEVICH [GB]; SAMSONOV VICTOR) [X] 1,5,10-12,20,22-26,28,30,31,33,37 * page 1, line 18 - line 20; claims 1-28; table 1 * * page 15, line 9 - line 18 *;
 [X]WO0238827  (CHANG CHAK MAN THOMAS [AU]; CHEN ZHUPING [AU]) [X] 1,5,10-15,21-23,33-35,37 * page 9, line 10 - line 15; claims 1,9-11,25,29-32 *;
 [X]CA2474367  (ZHANG JINGZENG [CA]) [X] 1,5,10-13,22,23,33,35,37 * page 1; figures 1,2; example 7 * * page 3; claims 1-8 *;
 [Y]WO2005014892  (BOC GROUP PLC [GB]; OKOROAFOR EMMANUEL UZOMA [GB]) [Y] 6-8,32 * claims 21,23 *
 [XY]  - YEROKHIN A L ET AL, "Plasma electrolysis for surface engineering", SURFACE AND COATINGS TECHNOLOGY, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (1999), vol. 122, ISSN 0257-8972, pages 73 - 93, XP002992080 [X] 1-5,22,23,33,35-37 * page 81, paragraph 3 - page 83; tables 2,5 * [Y] 14-16

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0257-8972(99)00441-7
 [Y]  - HAUSLEITER J\RG ET AL, "Prevention of restenosis by a novel drug-eluting stent system with a dose-adjustable, polymer-free, on-site stent coating", EUROPEAN HEART JOURNAL, THE EUROPEAN SOCIETY OF CARDIOLOGY, XX, (200508), vol. 26, no. 15, ISSN 0195-668X, pages 1475 - 1481, XP002369063 [Y] 14-16 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/eurheartj/ehi405