Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2126462

EP2126462 - BACKLIGHT ASSEMBLY WITH THIN FILM LIGHT PIPE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.09.2016
Database last updated on 19.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip02.09.2016Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.10.2016  [2016/40]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Luminit LLC
20600 Gramercy Place, Building 203
Torrance, CA 90501-1821 / US
[2013/34]
Former [2010/10]For all designated states
Asahi Kasei Kabushiki Kaisha
3-23, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-8205 / JP
Former [2009/49]For all designated states
Luminit LLC
20600 Gramercy Place, Building 203
Torrance, CA 90501 / US
Inventor(s)01 / FORRESTER, Thomas
901 South 6th Avenue Number 61
Hacienda Heights, CA 91745 / US
02 / POLIAKOV, Evgeni
1425 Breet Place No. 104
San Pedro, CA 90732 / RU
03 / ARIK, Engin
3104 Heavenly Ridge Street
Thousand Oaks, CA 91362-1179 / US
 [2009/49]
Representative(s)Black, Diego , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[2013/28]
Former [2009/50]Barnfather, Karl Jon , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane
London SE1 2HW / GB
Former [2009/49]Barton, Russell Glen , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date07839124.002.10.2007
[2009/49]
WO2007US21135
Priority number, dateUS20060848732P02.10.2006         Original published format: US 848732 P
[2009/49]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008042360
Date:10.04.2008
Language:EN
[2008/15]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2126462
Date:02.12.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008
[2009/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US10.04.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.11.2012
ClassificationInternational:F21V7/04
[2009/49]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/49]
TitleGerman:RÜCKBELEUCHTUNGSANORDNUNG MIT DÜNNSCHICHTLICHTLEITUNG[2009/49]
English:BACKLIGHT ASSEMBLY WITH THIN FILM LIGHT PIPE[2009/49]
French:ENSEMBLE PANNEAU LUMINEUX DOTÉ D'UN CONDUCTEUR DE LUMIÈRE EN MINCE FILM[2009/49]
Entry into regional phase19.08.2009National basic fee paid 
19.08.2009Search fee paid 
19.08.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
19.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination proceduredeletedCommunication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/49]
30.05.2013Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.10.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.02.2014Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.05.2016Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2016/40]
30.05.2016Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2016/40]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.10.2013
Request for further processing for:19.08.2009Request for further processing filed
19.08.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
09.10.2009Decision despatched
19.08.2009Request for further processing filed
19.08.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request procedure closed
03.03.2010Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee
19.08.2009Request for further processing filed
19.08.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.10.2009Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee
19.08.2009Request for further processing filed
19.08.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.10.2009Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee
19.08.2009Request for further processing filed
19.08.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.10.2009Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees
TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT
19.08.2009Request for further processing filed
19.08.2009Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
07.10.2009Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
21.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
20.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
18.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.201509   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006002108  (OUDERKIRK ANDREW J [US], et al) [X] 8-13 * paragraph [0114] * * figure 7 *;
 [X]WO0050807  (LUMITEX INC [US], et al) [X] 8,10,12 * abstract * * page 14, lines 12-27 * * figure 7 *;
 [X]WO9802690  (ALLIED SIGNAL INC [US]) [X] 8,10,12 * abstract * * page 7, line 18 - page 8, line 4 * * page 9, lines 13-20 *;
 [X]US2006082884  (FENG DI [CN], et al) [X] 8,10,12 * abstract * * paragraphs [0031] , [0032] * * figures 1,2 *
International search[X]US6256447  (LAINE JEFFREY A [US]);
 [X]US2006092532  (OUDERKIRK ANDREW J [US], et al);
 [Y]US2005051466  (CARTER LEE F [US], et al);
 [Y]US5459645  (SATTLER WALTER J [US], et al)