Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2090129

EP2090129 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING TRACKING AREA UPDATE AND CELL RESELECTION IN A LONG TERM EVOLUTION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  21.08.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.12.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
03.12.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
InterDigital Technology Corporation
200 Bellevue Parkway
Suite 300
Wilmington, DE 19809 / US
[2013/15]
Former [2009/34]For all designated states
INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION
3411 Silverside Road, Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building
Wilmington, DE 19810 / US
Inventor(s)01 / WANG, Peter, Shaomin
412 Pond Path
E. Setauket, New York 11733 / US
02 / MILLER, James M.
18 Louisburg Square
Verona, New Jersey 07044 / US
03 / OLIVERA-HERNANDEZ, Ulises
2 Rolland Laniel
Kirkland, Québec H9J 4A5 / CA
 [2009/34]
Representative(s)AWA Sweden AB
P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
[N/P]
Former [2012/39]Engdahl, Stefan
AWAPATENT AB P.O. Box 45086
104 30 Stockholm / SE
Former [2009/34]Bergholtz Arkelius, Per Christian
Awapatent AB Drottninggatan 89 P.O. Box 45086
S-104 30 Stockholm / SE
Application number, filing date07839773.424.10.2007
[2009/34]
WO2007US22555
Priority number, dateUS20060863528P30.10.2006         Original published format: US 863528 P
[2009/34]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008054668
Date:08.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/19]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2090129
Date:19.08.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008
[2009/34]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP24.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04W4/00
[2009/36]
Former International [2009/34]H04Q7/38
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/34]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM IMPLEMENTIEREN EINER TRACKING-BEREICHSAKTUALISIERUNG UND ZELLENNEUAUSWAHL IN EINEM LANGZEITENTWICKLUNGSSYSTEM[2009/34]
English:METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR IMPLEMENTING TRACKING AREA UPDATE AND CELL RESELECTION IN A LONG TERM EVOLUTION SYSTEM[2009/34]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR IMPLÉMENTER UNE MISE À JOUR D'UNE ZONE DE SUIVI ET RESÉLECTION DANS UN SYSTÈME D'ÉVOLUTION À LONG TERME[2009/34]
Entry into regional phase19.05.2009National basic fee paid 
19.05.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
19.05.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2009Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
19.05.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.05.2009Examination requested  [2009/34]
02.09.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.02.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
20.11.2015Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
20.11.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination19.01.2016Appeal received No.  T1290/16
23.03.2016Statement of grounds filed
06.04.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)EP12182572.3  / EP2530981
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.09.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
12.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
11.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
11.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
14.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
23.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
26.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
25.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
23.10.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
26.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
28.10.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Cited inInternational search[XY]  - "TR 23.882, 3GPP system architecture evolution: Report on Technical Options and Conclusions, Release 7", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP); TECHNICAL REPORT (TR), XX, XX, (20060615), vol. 23.882, no. V123, pages 1 - 127, XP002414829 [X] 1-14 * 4.2 Architecture for the evolved system - non roaming case 7.3.2 Agreements on tracking area issues 7.4 Radio access network - Core network functional spli 7.7.2.2 Mobility in LTE_IDLE state; page 65 * * page 86 * [Y] 29-45
 [A]  - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Radio Resource Control (RRC); Protocol Specification (Release 6)", 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP); TECHNICAL SPECIFICATION (TS), XX, XX, (200512), vol. 25.331, no. V680, pages 44 - 71, XP002433615 [A] 1-14,29-45 * 8.1.1.1.2 System information blocks 8.1.1.3 Reception of system information message by UE *
 [A]  - ANONYMOUS, "3GPP TR 25.912 V7.1.0 (2006-09) ;3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Radio Access Network; Feasibility study for evolved Universal Terrestrial Radio Access (UTRA) and Universal Terrestrial Radio Access Network (UTRAN) (Release 7)", INTERNET CITATION, (200609), URL: ftp://ftp.3gpp.org/specs/archiv/25_series/25.912, (20070521), XP002434320 [A] 1-14,29-45 * 6. Radio interface protocol architecure for evolved UTRA 8. Layer 2 and RRC evolution for evolved UTRA 9. Architecture for evolved UTRAN *
 [XY]  - ERICSSON, "Tracking area concept, 3GPP TSG SA WG2 Architeture -S2#53, S2-062096", (20060630), pages 1 - 5, URL: www.3gpp.org, (20080929), XP002497745 [X] 15-28 * Paragraph 2.1 TA List concept * [Y] 29-45
 [A]  - "Tracking area principles, 3GPP TSG SA WG2 Architecture - s2#53, S2-062333", (20060630), pages 1 - 3, URL: www.3gpp.org, (20080929), XP002497746 [A] 15-28 * Paragraph 2.2 Location management using tracking area principles *