Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2022106

EP2022106 - METHODS FOR MINIMIZING MASK UNDERCUTS AND NOTCHES FOR PLASMA PROCESSING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.04.2014
Database last updated on 17.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 21.05.2014  [2014/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LAM RESEARCH CORPORATION
4650 Cushing Parkway - P1258PCT
Fremont, CA 94538 / US
[2009/07]
Inventor(s)01 / PANDHUMSOPORN, Tamarak
4650 Cushing Parkway
Fremont, California 94538 / US
02 / COFER, Alferd
4650 Cushing Parkway
Fremont, California 94538 / US
03 / BOSCH, William
4650 Cushing Parkway
Fremont, California 94538 / US
 [2009/07]
Representative(s)Kontrus, Gerhard , et al
Lam Research AG
SEZ-Strasse 1
9500 Villach / AT
[2012/43]
Former [2009/44]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Leaman Browne Limited Pearl Chambers 22 East Parade
Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5BY / GB
Former [2009/30]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Leaman Browne 5 South Parade Leeds
LS1 5QX / GB
Former [2009/07]Browne, Robin Forsythe , et al
Leaman Browne 5 South Parade
Leeds, Yorkshire LS1 5QX / GB
Application number, filing date07840207.029.05.2007
[2009/07]
WO2007US69910
Priority number, dateUS2006042100030.05.2006         Original published format: US 421000
[2009/07]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008005630
Date:10.01.2008
Language:EN
[2008/02]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2022106
Date:11.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.01.2008
[2009/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US13.03.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.02.2011
ClassificationInternational:H01L21/3065, H01L21/3213
[2011/13]
Former International [2009/07]H01L51/00, H01L21/02
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/07]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR MINIMIERUNG VON MASKEN-UNTERSCHNITTEN UND -KERBEN FÜR EIN PLASMAVERARBEITUNGSSYSTEM[2009/07]
English:METHODS FOR MINIMIZING MASK UNDERCUTS AND NOTCHES FOR PLASMA PROCESSING SYSTEM[2009/07]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE RÉDUCTION DE GRAVURES SOUS-JACENTES ET D'ENTAILLES DE MASQUES POUR SYSTÈME DE TRAITEMENT AU PLASMA[2009/07]
Entry into regional phase25.11.2008National basic fee paid 
25.11.2008Search fee paid 
25.11.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
25.11.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure25.11.2008Examination requested  [2009/07]
27.09.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
03.12.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/21]
16.01.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
25.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.05.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.03.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[IA]US2005112891  (JOHNSON DAVID [US], et al) [I] 8,10,13,15 * paragraphs [0019] - [0021] - [0036] , [0050] - [0053] - [0059] - [0063] * [A] 1;
 [A]US6187685  (HOPKINS JANET [GB], et al) [A] 1,8 * column 6, line 56 - column 8, line 64; figures 2A,2B *
International search[Y]US2005205862  (KOEMTZOPOULOS C R [US], et al);
 [Y]US2005227378  (MOISE THEODORE S [US], et al);
 [Y]US6531349  (YOSHIDA KAZUYOSHI [JP], et al)