Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2046996

EP2046996 - METHODS FOR SELECTING MEDICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  04.08.2017
Database last updated on 17.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.08.2017Refusal of applicationpublished on 06.09.2017  [2017/36]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MAYO FOUNDATION FOR MEDICAL EDUCATION AND RESEARCH
200 First Street S.W.
Rochester, MN 55905 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/16]For all designated states
Mayo Foundation for Medical Education and Research
200 First Street SW
Rochester, MN 55905 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MRAZEK, David A.
3443 Wright Road S.W.
Rochester, MN 55902 / US
02 / O'KANE, Dennis J.
4421 Valley Court S.W.
Rochester, MN 55902 / US
03 / BLACK, John L.
909 Eighth Street SW
Rochester, MN 55902 / US
 [2009/16]
Representative(s)Crump, Julian Richard John , et al
Beresford Crump LLP
16 High Holborn
London WC1V 6BX / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP
Alder Castle
10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2013/08]Rands, Peter David , et al
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2009/16]Grund, Martin
Grund Intellectual Property Group Nikolaistrasse 15
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07840663.402.08.2007
[2009/16]
WO2007US75092
Priority number, dateUS2006049897602.08.2006         Original published format: US 498976
[2009/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008017038
Date:07.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/06]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2046996
Date:15.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.02.2008
[2009/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.06.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:C12Q1/68
[2009/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/16]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:MEDIKAMENTENAUSWAHLVERFAHREN[2009/16]
English:METHODS FOR SELECTING MEDICATIONS[2009/16]
French:PROCÉDÉS POUR LA SÉLECTION DES MÉDICAMENTS[2009/16]
Entry into regional phase16.02.2009National basic fee paid 
16.02.2009Search fee paid 
16.02.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
16.02.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/16]
24.03.2010Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.07.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.01.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.10.2011Date of oral proceedings
07.11.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/36]
07.11.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
04.07.2017Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/36]
Appeal following examination22.12.2011Appeal received No.  T0758/12
05.03.2012Statement of grounds filed
04.07.2017Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
04.07.2017Date of oral proceedings
11.07.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)EP12152518.2  / EP2465949
EP15020211.7  / EP3037549
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  05.07.2010
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.08.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
27.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
27.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
29.08.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[X]WO2006075254  (PROGENIKA BIOPHARMA SA [ES], et al) [X] 15 * page 161 - page 186 *;
 [X]  - ARRANZ M J ET AL, "Pharmacogenetics for the individualization of psychiatric treatment", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF PHARMACOGENOMICS, WOLTERS KLUWER HEALTH, XX, (20010101), vol. 1, no. 1, ISSN 1175-2203, pages 3 - 10, XP009092573 [X] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.2165/00129785-200101010-00001
 [A]  - DEVANE C L, "Pharmacogenetics and drug metabolism of newer antidepressant agents", JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PSYCHIATRY, PHYSICIANS POSTGRADUATE PRESS, INC, US, (19941201), vol. 55, no. Suppl, ISSN 0160-6689, pages 38 - 47, XP009092484 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO2004074456  (MAYO FOUNDATION [US], et al);
 [Y]  - BISHOP J.R. AND ELLINGROD V.L., "Neuropsychiatric pharmacogenetics: moving toward a comphrehensive understanding of predicting risks and response", PHARMACOGENOMICS, (200407), vol. 5, no. 5, pages 463 - 477, XP008102578
 [Y]  - BONDY B. AND ZILL P., "Pharmacogenetics and psychopharmacology", CURRENT OPINION IN PHARMACOLOGY, (20040201), vol. 4, no. 1, pages 72 - 78, XP008102564
 [Y]  - MITCHELL P.B., "Therapeutic drug monitoring of psychotropic medications", BRITISH JOURNAL OF CLINICAL PHARMACOLOGY, (200004), vol. 49, no. 4, pages 303 - 312, XP008102566

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1046/j.1365-2125.2000.00174.x
 [A]  - COUTTS R.T. AND URICHUK L.J., "Polymorpic cytochromes P450 and drugs used in psychiatry", CELLULAR AND MOLECULAR NEUROBIOLOGY, (199906), vol. 19, no. 3, pages 325 - 354, XP008102565

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1023/A:1006945715127