blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2054863

EP2054863 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING AN ADDITIONAL GAME TO PLAYERS OF A LOTTERY GAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  27.11.2015
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip27.11.2015Refusal of applicationpublished on 30.12.2015  [2015/53]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Scientific Games Holdings Limited
Athlone Road Ballymahon
County Longford / IE
[2013/16]
Former [2013/13]For all designated states
Scientific Games Holdings Limited
Athlone Road
Ballymahon
County Longford, Dublin 4 / IE
Former [2009/19]For all designated states
Scientific Games Holdings Limited
Embassy House Herbert Park Lane
Ballsbridge, Dublin 4 / IE
Inventor(s)01 / MARTINECK, Jeffrey D.
11825 Wind Creek Overlook
Alpharetta, GA 30005 / US
02 / BENNETT, Joseph, Waldo, III
535 Emerald Parkway
Sugar Hill GA 30518 / US
 [2009/19]
Representative(s)Schlief, Thomas P.
Canzler & Bergmeier
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/19]Schlief, Thomas P.
Friedrich-Ebert-Strasse 84
85055 Ingolstadt / DE
Application number, filing date07841130.321.08.2007
[2009/19]
WO2007US76370
Priority number, dateUS2006083904921.08.2006         Original published format: US 839049
US2007084220721.08.2007         Original published format: US 842207
[2009/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2008024742
Date:28.02.2008
Language:EN
[2008/09]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2054863
Date:06.05.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.02.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/19]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP19.06.2008
ClassificationIPC:G07F17/32
[2009/19]
CPC:
G07F17/329 (EP,US); G06F21/64 (EP,US); G06Q10/00 (EP,US);
G06Q50/34 (EP,US); G07C15/005 (EP,US); G07C15/006 (EP,US);
G07F17/32 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/19]
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR IMPLEMENTIERUNG EINES ZUSÄTZLICHEN SPIELS FÜR SPIELER EINES LOTTERIESPIELS[2009/19]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR IMPLEMENTING AN ADDITIONAL GAME TO PLAYERS OF A LOTTERY GAME[2009/19]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FOURNIR À DES JOUEURS UNE PARTIE SUPPLÉMENTAIRE D'UN JEU DE LOTERIE[2009/19]
Entry into regional phase02.02.2009National basic fee paid 
02.02.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
02.02.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/19]
17.06.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.10.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.03.2010Date of oral proceedings
29.03.2010Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/53]
29.03.2010Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
05.11.2015Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/53]
Appeal following examination28.05.2010Appeal received No.  T1939/10
09.08.2010Statement of grounds filed
05.11.2015Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
05.11.2015Date of oral proceedings
10.11.2015Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.06.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.08.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
08.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
08.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
24.06.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
07.08.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
07.08.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[Y]US2005262338  (IRWIN KENNETH E JR [US]) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0010]; figures 3-6 * * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0038] *;
 [Y]US2006059363  (MESE JOHN C [US] ET AL) [Y] 1-20 * abstract * * paragraph [0017] - paragraph [0030]; figures 1-3 *;
 [A]US2003200175  (WANG YI-MIN [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0007] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0044] * * claims 1,5,6 *;
 [A]WO2004102353  (GTECH CORP [US]; ORAM THOMAS K [US]; SZREK WALTER [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0029] - paragraph [0077] *;
 [A]US7089585  (DHARMARAJAN BASKARAN [US]) [A] 1-20 * paragraph [0009] - paragraph [0010] * * paragraph [0028] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0054] *;
 [A]US6370649  (ANGELO MICHAEL F [US] ET AL) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *;
 [A]EP1422907  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [A] 1,12 * figure 6 *
ExaminationWO2004103496
    - "MAC Vortrag", UNIVERSITÄT POTSDAM, URL: http://www.cs.uni-potsdam.de/ti/lehre/05-Kryptographie/slides/MAC_vortrag.pdf
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.