Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2068743

EP2068743 - MEDICAL PROCEDURES TRAYS, KITS AND RELATED METHODS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/25]MEDICAL PROCEDURES TRAYS AND RELATED METHODS
[2016/40]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  19.01.2018
Database last updated on 20.08.2019
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.02.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  03.02.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip28.06.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 31.07.2019  [2019/31]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Vidacare LLC
550 E. Swedesford Road
Suite 400
Wayne, PA 19087 / US
[2016/52]
Former [2016/20]For all designated states
Vidacare LLC
4350 Lockhill Selma Road
Suite 150
Shavano Park, TX 78249-2095 / US
Former [2010/42]For all designated states
Vidacare Corporation
4350 Lockhill Selma Road, Suite 150
Shavano Park, TX 78249-2095 / US
Former [2009/25]For all designated states
Vidacare Corporation
722 Isom Road
San Antonio, TX 78216 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MILLER, Larry J.
16260 Highway 46
Spring Branch, Texas 78070 / US
02 / TITKEMEYER, Robert W.
1402 Aylsbury
San Antonio, Texas 78216 / US
03 / BOLLETER, David S.
13023 Mahogany Run
San Antonio, Texas 78232 / US
04 / HARMON, Matthew T.
321 Broadway Avenue A-3
Santa Cruz, California 95060 / US
 [2009/25]
Representative(s)Lawrence, John , et al
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB
[2017/11]
Former [2010/14]Lawrence, John , et al
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
Former [2009/25]Ljungberg, Robert
Baker Botts (UK) LLP 41 Lothbury
London EC2R 7HF / GB
Application number, filing date07842286.211.09.2007
[2009/25]
WO2007US78205
Priority number, dateUS20060825325P12.09.2006         Original published format: US 825325 P
US20070910122P04.04.2007         Original published format: US 910122 P
[2009/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008033873
Date:20.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/12]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2068743
Date:17.06.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 20.03.2008
[2009/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2068743
Date:15.03.2017
Language:EN
[2017/11]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US17.07.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.03.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61B10/02, A61B17/00, A61B50/30, A61B50/33, A61B46/10, A61B90/00, A61B46/00
[2016/40]
Former International [2009/25]A61B19/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/11]
Former [2009/25]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:MEDIZINISCHE EINGRIFFE-TABLETTS , KITS UND ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN[2016/40]
English:MEDICAL PROCEDURES TRAYS, KITS AND RELATED METHODS[2016/40]
French:PLATEAUX POUR OPÉRATIONS MÉDICALES, KITS ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS[2016/40]
Former [2009/25]MEDIZINISCHE EINGRIFFE, TABLETTS UND ENTSPRECHENDE VERFAHREN
Former [2009/25]MEDICAL PROCEDURES TRAYS AND RELATED METHODS
Former [2009/25]PLATEAUX POUR OPÉRATIONS MÉDICALES ET PROCÉDÉS ASSOCIÉS
Entry into regional phase09.04.2009National basic fee paid 
09.04.2009Search fee paid 
09.04.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
09.04.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/25]
14.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
08.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.04.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.08.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.01.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.02.2017Fee for grant paid
01.02.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.02.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)EP17154221.0  / EP3189787
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  30.04.2012
Opposition(s)18.12.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2018/08]
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
12.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
12.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
12.09.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
11.09.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.09.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU11.09.2007
AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
IE11.09.2017
LU11.09.2017
MT11.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
[2019/31]
Former [2018/43]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
IE11.09.2017
LU11.09.2017
MT11.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/39]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
IE11.09.2017
LU11.09.2017
BE30.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/34]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
IE11.09.2017
LU11.09.2017
CH30.09.2017
LI30.09.2017
Former [2018/29]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
MC15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/14]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SI15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2018/09]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
DK15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/51]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
PT17.07.2017
Former [2017/50]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
PL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/49]AT15.03.2017
CZ15.03.2017
EE15.03.2017
ES15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
RO15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
SK15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
IS15.07.2017
Former [2017/48]CZ15.03.2017
FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Former [2017/41]FI15.03.2017
LT15.03.2017
LV15.03.2017
NL15.03.2017
SE15.03.2017
BG15.06.2017
GR16.06.2017
Documents cited:Search[XY]US6716215  (DAVID JOHN [US], et al) [X] 6 * figures 3-6 * * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0044] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0051] * [Y] 9-11;
 [Y]WO0009024  (KYPHON INC [US]) [Y] 9-11 * page 24, line 8 - page 28, line 5 * * page 37, line 9 - line 10; figure 2 *;
 [A]US2004249389  (KIM JUN HYUN [KR]) [A] 9,13 * paragraph [0034] - paragraph [0036]; figure 5b *;
 [A]US2003225411  (MILLER LARRY J [US]) [A] 9,12 * paragraph [0048]; figure 7a * * paragraph [0055]; figure 9 *;
 [A]US2004249306  (ISLAM ABUL BASHAR MOHAMMED ANW [US]) [A] 10-11 * paragraph [0020] *
International search[X]US6716215  (DAVID JOHN [US], et al);
 [Y]US6613054  (SCRIBNER ROBERT M [US], et al);
 [Y]US4046254  (KRAMER STEVEN G);
 [Y]US4844259  (GLOWCZEWSKIE JR FRANK P [US], et al);
 [Y]US6382212  (BORCHARD CRAIG F [US]);
 [Y]US5556399  (HUEBNER RANDALL J [US]);
 [Y]US4720881  (MEYERS WILLIAM K [US]);
 [Y]US2003225344  (MILLER LARRY J [US]);
 [Y]WO2005110259  (SINTEA BIOTECH S P A [IT], et al);
 [Y]US2005236940  (ROCKOFF MARK A [US]);
 [Y]US4484577  (SACKNER MARVIN A [US], et al)
by applicantUS4553539
 US20050042912