Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2108178

EP2108178 - DELAYED TRANSIT FARE ASSESSMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  14.02.2014
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.02.2014Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 19.03.2014  [2014/12]
14.02.2014Change - representativepublished on 19.03.2014  [2014/12]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Visa U.S.A. Inc.
P.O. Box 8999
San Francisco, CA 94128-8999 / US
[2009/42]
Inventor(s)01 / DIXON, Phil
7389 Juncus Ct.
San Diego, CA 92129 / US
02 / HAMMAD, Ayman, A.
6981 Corte Mercado
Pleasanton, CA 94566 / US
03 / EL-AWADY, Khalid
1938 Montecito Ave. Apt. 2
Mountain View, CA 94043 / US
 [2009/42]
Representative(s)Gosnall, Toby , et al
Barker Brettell LLP
100 Hagley Road
Edgbaston
Birmingham
B16 8QQ / GB
[2014/12]
Former [2009/50]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
B16 9PW / GB
Former [2009/42]Lawrence, John
Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham
West Midlands B16 9PW / GB
Application number, filing date07844679.629.10.2007
[2009/42]
WO2007US82842
Priority number, dateUS20070887307P30.01.2007         Original published format: US 887307 P
US2007068117401.03.2007         Original published format: US 681174
[2009/42]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008094324
Date:07.08.2008
Language:EN
[2008/32]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2108178
Date:14.10.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008
[2009/42]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US07.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:G07B15/00
[2009/42]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/42]
TitleGerman:FAHRPREISBEURTEILUNG BEI TRANSPORTVERZÖGERUNG[2009/42]
English:DELAYED TRANSIT FARE ASSESSMENT[2009/42]
French:ÉVALUATION DIFFÉRÉE DU TARIF DANS UN SYSTÈME DE TRANSPORT[2009/42]
Entry into regional phase27.07.2009National basic fee paid 
27.07.2009Search fee paid 
27.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
27.07.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.07.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
27.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/42]
10.02.2014Application withdrawn by applicant  [2014/12]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[X]US2006278704  (SAUNDERS PETER D [US], et al)
 [A]US2005192815  (CLYDE STUART M [CA])
 [A]US2004210498  (FREUND PETER C [US])
 [A]US2003080186  (MCDONALD IAN [US], et al)
 [A]US2002029165  (TAKATORI SUNAO [JP], et al)