blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2097101

EP2097101 - TBPB PROTEINS IN ATTENUATED ORAL LIVE VACCINES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  01.11.2013
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 04.12.2013  [2013/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Pontificia Universidad Católica de Chile
Avda. Libertador Bernardo O'Higgins, 340
Santiago / CL
For all designated states
Leiva, Alvaro Rodrigo Venegas
Hernando de Aguirre 720 Depto. 73
Providencia Santiago 751-0199 / CL
[N/P]
Former [2009/37]For all designated states
Pontificia Universidad Catolica de Chile
Avda. Libertador Bernardo O'Higgins, 340
Santiago 833 1010 / CL
For all designated states
Leiva, Alvaro Rodrigo Venegas
Hernando de Aguirre 720 Depto. 73
Providencia Santiago 751-0199 / CL
Inventor(s)01 / VENEGAS ESPARZA, Alejandro
Sanchez Fontecilla 4582 La Reina
Santiago / CL
 [2010/31]
Former [2009/37]01 / ESPARZA, Alejandro Venegas
Sanchez Fontecilla 4582 La Reina
Santiago / CL
Representative(s)Ladendorf, Oliver
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstrasse 3
80335 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/37]Ladendorf, Oliver
Maiwald Patentanwalts GmbH Elisenhof Elisenstrasse 3
D-80335 München / DE
Application number, filing date07844901.406.11.2007
[2009/37]
WO2007US83750
Priority number, dateCL200620060300006.11.2006         Original published format: CL 200603000
[2009/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2008058116
Date:15.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2097101
Date:09.09.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.07.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.2010
ClassificationIPC:A61K39/116, A61K39/095
[2009/37]
CPC:
A61K39/095 (EP,US); A61P37/04 (EP); A61P37/06 (EP);
A61K2039/523 (EP,US); A61K2039/542 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/37]
TitleGerman:TBPB-PROTEINE IN ABGESCHWÄCHTEN ORALEN LEBENDIMPFSTOFFEN[2009/37]
English:TBPB PROTEINS IN ATTENUATED ORAL LIVE VACCINES[2009/37]
French:PROCÉDURE D'EXPRESSION D'UNE PROTÉINE TBPB PROTÉINE SUR LA SURFACE BACTÉRIENNE DE VACCINS ORAUX VIVANTS ATTÉNUÉS PROTOTYPES DU VACCIN DE LA MÉNINGITE B[2009/37]
Entry into regional phase08.06.2009National basic fee paid 
08.06.2009Search fee paid 
08.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
08.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure08.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/37]
26.04.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
14.12.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
25.06.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/49]
31.07.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2013/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  14.12.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
15.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
29.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]WO0173080  (MICROBIOLOGICAL RES AUTHORITY [GB], et al) [I] 1-15 * examples 1-6; claims 1-3, 6, 22 * * 2. A non-neisserial cell expressing a neisserial iron uptake protein wherein the iron uptake protein is located in an outer surface membrane of the cell 6 A bacterial cell according to any of Claims 1 to 5, expressing TbpB. 43. A method according to Claim 41 or 42, comprising expressing a N. meningitidis gene in N. lactamica. 44. A method according to any of Claims 41 to 43 wherein the Tbp is TbpA. 45. A method according to any of Claims 41 to 43 wherein the Tbp is TbpB.;; claims 2, 6, 43-45 *;
 [A]WO03079995  (UNIV EMORY [US], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [X]  - ANA ISABEL CANALES SOTO, "EXPRESIÓN DE LOS ANTÍGENOS TBPB Y PORA DE Neisseria meningitidis EN LA CEPA VACUNA Salmonella entérica serovar Typhimurium g4550 Y EVALUACIÓNDE RESPUESTA INMUNE EN RATONES VACUNADOS ORALMENTE.", (200403), Universidad Austral de ChileFacultad de CienciasEscuela de Bioquimica, URL: http://cybertesis.uach.cl/tesis/uach/2004/fcc212e/doc/fcc212e.pdf, (20100917), XP007914960 [X] 1-15 * Conclusions of the thesis. 1. The asd gene complements the chromosomal deletion in the gene of the same name ?4550 vaccine strain and metabolic functions as a selection marker as efficiently such as antibiotic resistance markers. 2. And TbpB antigens PorA of N. meningitidis can be expressed in S. enteric serovar Typhimurium ?4550, being able to induce a significant serum response, where the level of expression of TbpB greater than that of PorA. 3. Dual balanced lethal system is efficient to induce serum antibodies anti-TbpB and anti-PorA, in BALB / c immunized, according to the experimental design. 4. TbpB may be a better candidate than PorA for use in developing live oral vaccine against infection with N. meningitidis.; paragraph [05.6]; figures 2, 3, 7, 9, 10-12, Ap1-6; table 2 *
 [A]  - THOMAS CHRISTOPHER E ET AL, "Vaccination of mice with gonococcal TbpB expressed in vivo from Venezuelan equine encephalitis viral replicon particles", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, (200603), vol. 74, no. 3, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 1612 - 1620, XP002601313 [A] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.74.3.1612-1620.2006
 [A]  - STEVENSON ANDREW ET AL, "Use of Bordetella bronchiseptica and Bordetella pertussis as live vaccines and vectors for heterologous antigens.", FEMS IMMUNOLOGY AND MEDICAL MICROBIOLOGY 15 JUL 2003 LNKD- PUBMED:12832115, (20030715), vol. 37, no. 2-3, ISSN 0928-8244, pages 121 - 128, XP002601314 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0928-8244(03)00068-3
 [A]  - COPPENS I ET AL, "Production of Neisseria meningitidis transferrin-binding protein B by recombinant Bordetella pertussis.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY SEP 2001 LNKD- PUBMED:11500415, (200109), vol. 69, no. 9, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 5440 - 5446, XP002601315 [A] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.69.9.5440-5446.2001
 [A]  - RENAULD-MONGÉNIE GENEVIÈVE ET AL, "Role of transferrin receptor from a Neisseria meningitidis tbpB isotype II strain in human transferrin binding and virulence.", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY JUN 2004 LNKD- PUBMED:15155653, (200406), vol. 72, no. 6, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 3461 - 3470, XP002601316 [A] 1-15 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.72.6.3461-3470.2004
 [A]  - Poolman-JT et al., "Chapter 18: Outer Membrane Vesicle-based Meningococcal Vaccines", Poolman-JT et al., Matthias Frosch, Martin C. J. Maiden, Handbook of Meningococcal Disease: Infection Biology, Vaccination, Clinical Management, DOI: 10.1002/3527608508, (20060629), page 371-390, ISBN 9783527312603, XP002601317 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/3527608508
 [A]  - Ekins-A, "Chapter 11: Iron Metabolism in Neisseria meningitidis", Ekins-A, Matthias Frosch, Martin C. J. Maiden, Handbook of Meningococcal Disease: Infection Biology, Vaccination, Clinical Management, DOI: 10.1002/3527608508, (20060629), page 217-34, ISBN 9783527312603, XP002601318 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/3527608508
 [A]  - Derrick-J et al., "Chapter 10: Major Outer Membrane Proteins of Meningococci", Derrick-J et al., Matthias Frosch, Martin C. J. Maiden, Handbook of Meningococcal Disease: Infection Biology, Vaccination, Clinical Management, DOI: 10.1002/3527608508, (20060629), page 181-215, ISBN 9783527312603, XP002601319 [A] 1-15 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/3527608508
International search[Y]US2003186848  (GORRINGE ANDREW RICHARD [GB], et al);
 [X]US2005106184  (FRANKS NICHOLAS P [GB], et al);
 [A]US2006140975  (CURTISS ROY III [US], et al);
 [Y]  - GALAN ET AL., "Cloning and characterization of the asd gene of Salmonella typhimurium: use in stable maintenance of recombinant plasmids in Salmonella vaccine strains", GENE, (199009), vol. 94, no. 1, pages 29 - 35, XP023545841

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0378-1119(90)90464-3
Examination   - ANA ISABEL CANALES SOTO, "Expresión de los antígenos TBPB y Pora de Neisseria meningitidis en la cepa vacuna Salmonella entérica serovar Typhimurium x4550 y evaluación de respuesta inmune en ratones vacunados oralmente", (20050927), URL: http://cybertesis.uach.cl/tesis/uach/2004/fcc212e/xml/fcc212e-md.xml, (20121205), XP055046689
    - "EXPRESIÓN DE LOS ANTÍGENOS TBPB Y PORA DE Neisseria meningitidis EN LA CEPA VACUNA Salmonella entérica serovar Typhimurium [chi]4550 Y EVALUACIÓN DE RESPUESTA INMUNE EN RATONES VACUNADOS ORALMENTE", (20110101), URL: http://cybertesis.uach.cl/tesis/uach/2004/fcc212e/doc/fcc212e.pdf, (20121205), XP055046706
    - C. Jespersgaard ET AL, "Effect of Attenuated Salmonella enterica Serovar Typhimurium Expressing a Streptococcus mutans Antigen on Secondary Responses to the Cloned Protein", Infection and Immunity, (20011101), vol. 69, no. 11, doi:10.1128/IAI.69.11.6604-6611.2001, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 6604 - 6611, XP055046716

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/IAI.69.11.6604-6611.2001
    - SCHODEL F ET AL, "HYBRID HEPATITIS B VIRUS CORE-PRE-S PROTEINS SYNTHESIZED IN AVIRULENT SALMONELLA TYPHIMURIUM AND SALMONELLA TYPHI FOR ORAL VACCINATION", INFECTION AND IMMUNITY, AMERICAN SOCIETY FOR MACROBIOLOGY, USA, (19940501), vol. 62, no. 5, ISSN 0019-9567, pages 1669 - 1676, XP009003228
    - "Expresión de los antígenos TBPB y Pora de Neisseria meningitidis en la cepa vacuna Salmonella entérica serovar Typhimurium x4550 y evaluación de respuesta inmune en ratones vacunados oralmente", (20050901), URL: http://cybertesis.uach.cl/tesis/uach/2004/fcc212e/xml/fcc212e-md.xml, (20121205), XP055046690
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.