Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2039044

EP2039044 - METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING, COMMUNICATING AND/OR USING INTERFERENCE INFORMATION [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  27.05.2011
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip27.05.2011Refusal of applicationpublished on 29.06.2011  [2011/26]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Qualcomm Incorporated
5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, CA 92121 / US
[2009/13]
Inventor(s)01 / GOROKHOV, Alexei
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / KHANDEKAR, Aamod
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
03 / PALANKI, Ravi
7699 Palmilla Drive, 3209
San Diego, California 92122 / US
04 / PRAKASH, Rajat
8730 Costa Verde Blvd., Apt. 2439
San Diego, California 92122 / US
 [2009/18]
Former [2009/17]01 / GOROKHOV, Alexei
c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive
San Diego, California 92121-1714 / US
02 / KHANDEKAR, Aamod
8465 Regents Road, 339
San Diego, California 92122 / US
03 / PALANKI, Ravi
7699 Palmilla Drive, 3209
San Diego, California 92122 / US
04 / PRAKASH, Rajat
8730 Costa Verde Blvd., Apt. 2439
San Diego, California 92122 / US
Former [2009/13]01 / GOROKHOV, Alexei
12543 El Camino Real
San Diego, California 92130 / US
02 / KHANDEKAR, Aamod
8465 Regents Road, 339
San Diego, California 92122 / US
03 / PALANKI, Ravi
7699 Palmilla Drive, 3209
San Diego, California 92122 / US
04 / PRAKASH, Rajat
8730 Costa Verde Blvd., Apt. 2439
San Diego, California 92122 / US
Representative(s)Heselberger, Johannes
Bardehle Pagenberg Partnerschaft mbB
Patentanwälte, Rechtsanwälte
Prinzregentenplatz 7
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/25]Heselberger, Johannes
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle - Pagenberg - Dost Altenburg - Geissler Galileiplatz 1
81679 München / DE
Former [2009/13]Wunsch, Alexander
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Bardehle Pagenberg Dost Altenburg Geissler Galileiplatz 1
D-81679 München / DE
Application number, filing date07845244.821.06.2007
[2009/13]
WO2007US71821
Priority number, dateUS20060815664P21.06.2006         Original published format: US 815664 P
US20060815733P21.06.2006         Original published format: US 815733 P
US20060816281P23.06.2006         Original published format: US 816281 P
[2009/17]
Former [2009/13]US20060815664P21.06.2006
US20060815773P21.06.2006
US20060816281P23.06.2006
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2007149997
Date:27.12.2007
Language:EN
[2007/52]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2039044
Date:25.03.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.2007
[2009/13]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP10.04.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04L1/00, H04B7/005
[2009/13]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/13]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR MESSUNG, WEITERLEITUNG UND/ODER VERWENDUNG VON INTERFERENZINFORMATIONEN[2009/13]
English:METHODS AND APPARATUS FOR MEASURING, COMMUNICATING AND/OR USING INTERFERENCE INFORMATION[2009/13]
French:PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL DE MESURE, DE COMMUNICATION ET/OU D'UTILISATION D'INFORMATIONS DE BROUILLAGE[2009/13]
Entry into regional phase21.01.2009National basic fee paid 
21.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
21.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.01.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/13]
22.04.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.09.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.10.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.04.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.2010Application refused, date of legal effect [2011/26]
18.10.2010Date of oral proceedings
16.02.2011Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2011/26]
16.02.2011Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  22.04.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.06.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
31.03.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[A]US7042957  (ZIRWAS WOLFGANG [DE]) [A] 1-77 * column 5, lines 20-27 *
 [X]  - JIM TOMCIK (QUALCOMM, INCORPORATED), "MBFDD and MBTDD Wideband Mode: Technology Overview", IEEE 802.20 WORKING GROUP ON MOBILE BROADBAND WIRELESS ACCESS, (20060106), pages 1 - 109, URL: http://www.ieee802.org/20/Contribs/C802.20-05-68r1.pdf, (20080102), XP002467625 [X] 1,8,30,35,40,45,54,63,68,73,2-7,9-29,31-34,36-39,41-44,46-53,55-62,64-67,69-72,74-77 * sections 10.1.1 and 10.1.3 in pages 51 and 52 * * the whole document *
 [XA]  - JIM TOMCIK QUALCOMM INCORPORATED, "QFDD Technology Overview Presentation", IEEE 802.20 Working Group on Mobile Broadband Wireless Access, (20051115), pages 1 - 73, URL: http://www.ieee802.org/20/Contribs/C802.20-05-59r1.pdf, (20080201), XP002467626 [X] 1-15,18-77 * pages 25,28 * * the whole document * [A] 16,17
 [A]  - CHOI S H ET AL, "Method and apparatus for confirming multiple frame structure and indicating transmission diversity through phase modulation of forward pilot time slot in nb-tdd cdma communication system", DATABASE WPI, (20020509), XP002968161 [A] 1-77 * the whole document *
 [A]  - CHELLALI A ET AL, "Computational reduction during idle transmission in DSL modems", ACOUSTICS, SPEECH AND SIGNAL PROCESSING, 1998. PROCEEDINGS OF THE 1998 IEEE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON SEATTLE, WA, USA 12-15 MAY 1998, NEW YORK, NY, USA,IEEE, US, (19980512), vol. 6, ISBN 0-7803-4428-6, pages 3441 - 3444, XP010279621 [A] 1-77 * abstract *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICASSP.1998.679605