EP2180753 - A METHOD FOR PROCESSING BUSYNESS OF FLEXIBLE ALERT GROUP WITH MULTIUSER TYPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 11.09.2015 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2015 | Refusal of application | published on 14.10.2015 [2015/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | For all designated states ZTE Corporation ZTE Plaza Keji Road South, Hi-Tech Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Qiang Zte Plaza Keji Road South Hi-tech Industrial Park Shenzhen, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [2010/17] | Representative(s) | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte mbB Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2010/17] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patentanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | ||
Former [2010/17] | Dr. Weitzel & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Friedenstrasse 10 89522 Heidenheim / DE | Application number, filing date | 07845769.4 | 30.11.2007 | [2010/17] | WO2007CN03406 | Priority number, date | CN20071136359 | 24.07.2007 Original published format: CN200710136359 | [2010/17] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009012627 | Date: | 29.01.2009 | Language: | ZH | [2009/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2180753 | Date: | 28.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 29.01.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.03.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04W84/00 | [2010/17] | CPC: |
H04L65/1069 (EP,US);
H04L65/1094 (EP);
H04M3/465 (EP,US);
H04L65/1016 (EP,US);
H04M2203/2044 (EP,US);
H04M2207/18 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/17] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG DER BELEGTHEIT EINER FLEXIBELRUFGRUPPE MIT MEHRBENUTZERTYP | [2010/17] | English: | A METHOD FOR PROCESSING BUSYNESS OF FLEXIBLE ALERT GROUP WITH MULTIUSER TYPE | [2010/17] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR TRAITER L'OCCUPATION D'UN GROUPE D'ALERTE FLEXIBLE DE TYPES MULTI-UTILISATEURS | [2010/17] | Entry into regional phase | 14.01.2010 | Translation filed | 14.01.2010 | National basic fee paid | 14.01.2010 | Search fee paid | 14.01.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.01.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/17] | 09.10.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.12.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.06.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/42] | 19.03.2015 | Date of oral proceedings | 26.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/42] | 26.05.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.12.2012 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 16.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.04.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2006104431 (EMERY RICHARD T [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0046] - [0048] *; | [A]US2007041550 (MCLARTY BRANDON D [US], et al) [A] 1-6 * abstract ** paragraphs [0010] - [0014] *; | [X]US2007047698 (KAFKA HENRY [US]) [X] 1-6 * abstract * * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0005] , [0006] * | International search | [A]CN1543110 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [A]EP1739916 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |