Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2028817

EP2028817 - A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING A NOTIFICATION MESSAGE THROUGH THE FILE DELIVERY OVER UNIDIRECTIONAL TRANSPORT PROTOCOL [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.2015
Database last updated on 16.01.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip15.07.2016Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 17.08.2016  [2016/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN
[N/P]
Former [2009/09]For all designated states
Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd.
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District, Shenzhen
Guangdong 518129 / CN
Inventor(s)01 / YUE, Peiyu
c/o Huawei Software Technologies Co., Ltd.
Floor 2, Building A, NO.48, Ning Nan AV
Nanjing 210012 / CN
02 / SHI, Teng
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / ZHANG, Jie
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / CHEN, Li
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
05 / FU, Xin
Huawei Administration Building
Bantian
Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
 [2014/36]
Former [2010/11]01 / YUE, Peiyu
c/o Huawei Software Technologies Co., Ltd. Floor 2, Building A, NO.48, Ning Nan AV
Nanjing 210012 / CN
02 / SHI, Teng
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / ZHANG, Jie
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / CHEN, Li
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
05 / FU, Xin
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
Former [2009/09]01 / YUE, Peiyu
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
02 / SHI, Teng
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
03 / ZHANG, Jie
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
04 / CHEN, Li
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
05 / FU, Xin
Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District
Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN
Representative(s)Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich PartmbB
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
[2014/36]
Former [2009/30]Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Former [2009/09]Körber, Martin Hans
Mitscherlich & Partner Sonnenstrasse 33
80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date07846104.319.12.2007
[2009/09]
WO2007CN71278
Priority number, dateCN2007110171624.04.2007         Original published format: CN200710101716
[2009/09]
Filing languageZH
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008128409
Date:30.10.2008
Language:ZH
[2008/44]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2028817
Date:25.02.2009
Language:EN
[2009/09]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2028817
Date:03.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:CN30.10.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2009
ClassificationInternational:H04L12/58, H04L29/08, H04L12/18, H04L29/06
[2014/14]
Former International [2009/09]H04L29/06
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/09]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ÜBERTRAGEN UND EMPFANGEN EINER BENACHRICHTIGUNG ÜBER EIN DATEILIEFERUNGSSYSTEM ÜBER EIN UNIDIREKTIONALES ÜBERTRAGUNGSPROTOKOLL[2009/09]
English:A METHOD AND AN APPARATUS FOR TRANSMITTING AND RECEIVING A NOTIFICATION MESSAGE THROUGH THE FILE DELIVERY OVER UNIDIRECTIONAL TRANSPORT PROTOCOL[2009/09]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL POUR ÉMETTRE ET RECEVOIR UN MESSAGE DE NOTIFICATION À TRAVERS LE PROTOCOLE DE DISTRIBUTION DE FICHIER PAR TRANSPORT UNIDIRECTIONNEL[2009/09]
Entry into regional phase19.12.2008Translation filed 
19.12.2008National basic fee paid 
19.12.2008Search fee paid 
19.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
19.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.12.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
19.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/09]
12.08.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.11.2009Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.07.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.06.2014Fee for grant paid
24.06.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
22.07.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.08.2009
Opposition(s)04.06.2015No opposition filed within time limit [2015/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
23.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU19.12.2007
AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
MT03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
TR03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IE19.12.2014
LU19.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU19.12.2007
AT03.09.2014
BE03.09.2014
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
TR03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IE19.12.2014
LU19.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2016/27]AT03.09.2014
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
MC03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IE19.12.2014
LU19.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2016/25]AT03.09.2014
BG03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IE19.12.2014
LU19.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/50]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SI03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IE19.12.2014
LU19.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/47]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IE19.12.2014
LU19.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
CH31.12.2014
LI31.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/46]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IE19.12.2014
LU19.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/35]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
DK03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
LU19.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/30]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
BE31.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/24]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
PL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/23]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
CZ03.09.2014
EE03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
SK03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
IS03.01.2015
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/22]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
RO03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
PT05.01.2015
Former [2015/16]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
NL03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/12]AT03.09.2014
CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
LV03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY03.09.2014
ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
GR04.12.2014
Former [2015/10]ES03.09.2014
FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
Former [2015/09]FI03.09.2014
LT03.09.2014
SE03.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT03.09.2014
Documents cited:Search[X]US2006015568  (WALSH ROD [FI], et al) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0036] - [0040] * * paragraphs [0064] - [0066] *;
 [X]EP1562344  (NTT DOCOMO INC [JP]) [X] 1-16 * abstract * * paragraphs [0011] - [0020] * * paragraphs [0066] - [0074] * * paragraphs [0081] - [0093]; figure 8 *;
 [A]  - PAILA R WALSH NOKIA M LUBY DIGITAL FOUNTAIN R LEHTONEN TELIASONERA V ROCA INRIA RHONE-ALPES T, "FLUTE - File Delivery over Unidirectional Transport; draft-ietf-rmt-flute-revised-03.txt", IETF STANDARD-WORKING-DRAFT, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20070126), vol. rmt, no. 3, ISSN 0000-0004, XP015049778 [A] 1-16 * the whole document *
International search[X]WO2006008593  (NOKIA CORP [FI], et al);
 [A]CN1934825  (NOKIA CORP [FI]);
 [A]US2006059267  (CUGI GUIDO [FI], et al)