Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP2095341 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2095341



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 417
08.07.2020 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
16.09.2019 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
08.08.2019 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
18.07.2019 English translation of the claims Search / examination 5
18.07.2019 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
18.07.2019 French translation of claims Search / examination 5
05.04.2019 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
05.04.2019 Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) Search / examination 4
05.04.2019 Text intended for grant Search / examination 59
28.03.2019 Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) Search / examination 1
26.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
22.03.2019 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
19.03.2019 Decision of the Board of Appeal Appeal 21
19.03.2019 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
30.11.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.11.2018 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
29.11.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
28.11.2018 Submission concerning change of applicant's representative Search / examination 1
27.11.2018 F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing Appeal 1
27.11.2018 F3346 Communication with reference to loss of rights, with time limit (ex parte) Appeal 2
22.11.2018 F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing Appeal 1
05.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 1
03.09.2018 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
29.08.2018 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
24.08.2018 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
17.07.2017 Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address Appeal 2
07.07.2017 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 3
06.07.2017 Annexes in respect of a client data request Appeal 6
04.07.2017 Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) Appeal 14
01.12.2016 F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) Appeal 1
26.08.2015 Composition of the board (T) Appeal 1
08.06.2015 F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties Appeal 1
24.04.2015 Amended description with annotations Appeal 2
24.04.2015 Description Appeal 2
24.04.2015 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
16.02.2015 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.12.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
23.12.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
16.12.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
16.12.2014 Decision to refuse according to the state of the file Search / examination 2
16.12.2014 Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) Search / examination 1
16.12.2014 Means of redress Search / examination 2
25.11.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 1
18.11.2014 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Search / examination 2
18.11.2014 Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings Search / examination 2
17.11.2014 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Search / examination 1
26.06.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
24.06.2014 Advice of delivery Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Acknowledgement of a document Search / examination 1
12.06.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 5
12.06.2014 Preparation for oral proceedings Search / examination 2
12.06.2014 Summons to attend oral proceedings Search / examination 1
11.10.2012 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.06.2012 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
04.06.2012 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.08.2011 Amended description with annotations Search / examination 5
05.08.2011 Description Search / examination 5
05.08.2011 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
04.07.2011 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
22.06.2011 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.02.2011 Annex to the communication Search / examination 3
14.02.2011 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.09.2009 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
05.08.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
30.07.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 6
30.07.2009 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 1
01.07.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
02.06.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 5
04.03.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 7
27.01.2009 Notification of the recording of a change PCT receiving Office 1
27.01.2009 Notification of the recording of a change Search / examination 1
10.06.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 52
22.05.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.05.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 3
22.05.2008 Published international application - A1 Search / examination 60
20.02.2008 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) International Searching Authority 1
20.02.2008 Notification relating to declaration under Rule 4.17 PCT (copy for ISA/EP) PCT receiving Office 1
15.11.2007 Abstract PCT receiving Office 1
15.11.2007 Claims PCT receiving Office 9
15.11.2007 Description PCT receiving Office 44
15.11.2007 Drawings PCT receiving Office 5