Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2041246

EP2041246 - METHODS FOR PRODUCING FUELS AND SOLVENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  07.06.2016
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.09.2019New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Governors of the University of Alberta
10230 Jasper Avenue
Suite 4000
Edmonton, Alberta T5J 4P6 / CA
[2017/28]
Former [2009/14]For all designated states
The Governors of the University of Alberta
Suite 4000 8308-114 Street N.W.
Edmonton, Alberta T6G 2E1 / CA
Inventor(s)01 / BRESSLER, David
16 Norfolk Close
St. Albert, T8N 7B9 / CA
 [2009/14]
Representative(s)Dehns
St. Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/14]Campbell, Neil Boyd
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date07849051.312.07.2007
[2009/14]
WO2007IB04187
Priority number, dateUS20060807358P14.07.2006         Original published format: US 807358 P
[2009/14]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008029301
Date:13.03.2008
Language:EN
[2008/11]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2041246
Date:01.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.03.2008
[2009/14]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US03.03.2011
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.07.2011
ClassificationInternational:C10L1/04, C07C1/207, C07C9/22, C07C11/00
[2011/33]
Former International [2009/14]C10L1/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/14]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON KRAFTSTOFFEN UND LÖSUNGSMITTELN[2009/14]
English:METHODS FOR PRODUCING FUELS AND SOLVENTS[2009/14]
French:PROCÉDÉS DE PRODUCTION DE COMBUSTIBLES ET DE SOLVANTS[2009/14]
Entry into regional phase14.01.2009National basic fee paid 
14.01.2009Search fee paid 
14.01.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
14.01.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure14.01.2009Examination requested  [2009/14]
20.02.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.08.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.03.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
06.06.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
24.05.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M01)
02.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
09.03.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
09.03.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination11.05.2017Appeal received No.  T1871/17
19.07.2017Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.08.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
06.06.2013Request for further processing filed
06.06.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
20.06.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
27.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
23.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
12.01.2017Renewal fee patent year 10
24.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
17.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
28.08.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.07.201004   M06   Fee paid on   25.01.2011
31.07.201610   M06   Fee paid on   12.01.2017
31.07.201913   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.2019
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US4554397  (STERN ROBERT [FR], et al) [X] 1-15 * see examples 1-4 see claims 1-14. * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15;
 [Y]US5225580  (ZINNEN HERMANN A [US]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [Y]US5917068  (BARNICKI SCOTT DONALD [US], et al) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *;
 [XYI]  - ZHANG ZAILONG ET AL., "CATALYTIC DECARBOXYLATION OF FATTY ACID BY IRON-CONTAINING MINERALS IN IMMATURE OIL SOURCE ROCKS AT LOW TEMPERATURE", CHINESE SCIENCE BULLETIN, (19990831), vol. 44, no. 16, pages 1523 - 1527, XP002649190 [X] 1-15 * see page 1523, description , line 1= "that fatty acids may be converted into alkanes by decarboxylation"; see page 1524, point 1 experimental, lines 1-2 "atmospheric pressure"; line 5-6= "after adsorbing certain amount of stearic acid(catalyst to reactant weight ratio was 30:1)" and line 7= "decarboxylation proceeded at 150°C for 2 h". see page 1525, point 2 (ii) "catalytic activities of seven immature source rocks for stearic acid decarboxylation." * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15
 [XYI]  - LI ZHE ET AL., "CATALYTIC DECABOXYLATIONS OF FATTY ACIDS IN IMMATURE OIL SOURCE ROCKS", SCIENCE IN CHINA (SERIES D), (20031231), vol. 46, no. 12, pages 1250 - 1260, XP002649191 [X] 1-15 * SEE DESCRIPTION PAGE 1250, LINES 6-10; SEE POINT 2.4, LINES 1-2 AND BIBLIOGRAPHIC REFERENCES 6,7; SEE POINT 2.4, LINES 6-13. SEE FOOT OF TABLE 6 (SEE (a)). * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1360/03yd0124
 [XYI]  - MASARU WATANABE ET AL., "DECOMPOSITION OF A LONG CHAIN SATURATED FATTY ACID WITH SOME ADDITIVES IN HOT COMPRESSED WATER", ENERGY CONVERSION AND MANAGEMENT, (20060315), vol. 47, pages 3344 - 3350, XP002649192 [X] 1-15 * see abstracts lines 1-5; see point 2. , lines 1 and 10 (=673°K; 25 Mpa; 3 h.) see point 3.1, line 4-5(=conversion of C17 acid decomposition in the Ar atmosphere (without SCW)") * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.enconman.2006.01.009
 [XYI]  - T.A. FOGLIA ET AL., DECARBONYLATION DEHYDRATION OF FATTY ACIDS TO ALKENES IN THE PRESENCE OF TRANSITION METAL COMPLEXES, DALLAS, AOCS, (19751231), XP002649331 [X] 1-15 * see tables I-IV; see "general procedure", lines 1-12 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/BF02635473
 [XYI]  - MATHIAS SNARE ET AL., "HETEROGENEOUS CATLYTIC DEOXYGENATION OF STEARIC ACID FOR PRODUCTION OF BIODIESEL", IND. ENG. CHEM. RES., (20060628), vol. 45, pages 5708 - 5715, XP002649332 [X] 1-15 * see page 5708, right column, bibliographic reference citation 11; see tables 1-5; see figures 1,2. * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/ie060334i
 [XYI]  - IVA KUBICKOVA ET AL., "HYDROCARBONS FOR DIESEL FUEL VIA DECARBOXYLATION OF VEGETABLE OILS", CATALYSIS TODAY, (20051231), vol. 106, pages 197 - 200, XP002649333 [X] 1-15 * see figure 2; see point 2. "experimentals" * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.cattod.2005.07.188
 [XYI]  - WILHELM F. MAIER, "GAS PHASE DECARBOXYLATION OF CARBOXYLIC ACIDS", CHEM. BER., (19821231), vol. 115, pages 808 - 812, XP002649362 [X] 1-15 * SEE TABLE 1, ITEMS 1-16 AND TABLE FOOT; SEE PAGE 810, LINES 1-9. SEE PAGE 811, EXPERIMENTAL PART TO PAGE 812, LINE 15. * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15
 [XYI]  - "CARBOXYLIC ACID (MANUFACTURE)", KIRK OTHMER, ENCYCLOPEDIA OF CHEMICAL TECHNOLOGY, JOHN WILEY AND SONS, (19781231), vol. 4, pages 835 - 844, XP002649334 [X] 1-15 * SEE PAGE 835, LINES 1-12 * [Y] 1-15 [I] 1-15
International search[X]US5578090  (BRADIN DAVID S [US]);
 [X]WO2004035714  (UNIV CARNEGIE MELLON [US]);
 [Y]US5917068  (BARNICKI SCOTT DONALD [US], et al);
 [XP]WO2007027955  (BRAZEN BIOFUELS INC [US], et al);
 [XP]US2007068848  (MONNIER JACQUES [CA], et al);
 [XP]WO2007068798  (NESTE OIL OYJ [FI], et al)