Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2116116

EP2116116 - PERIPHERAL DEVICE FOR CONNECTION WITH A HOST [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  05.11.2010
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.11.2010Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 08.12.2010  [2010/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
SanDisk IL Ltd.
7 Atir Yeda Street
44425 Kfar Saba / IL
[2009/46]
Inventor(s)01 / SALOMON, Tavi
24 Hathia St.
58403 Holon / IL
02 / HUBERT, Jonathan
25280 Terrace Grove Rd.
95033-9705 Los Gatos / US
03 / HANLON, Jason, Patrick
617 Lassen Park CT
Scotts Valley, CA 95066-5001 / US
04 / POMERANTZ, Itzhak
18 Golomb Street
43357 Kfar Saba / IL
 [2009/46]
Representative(s)Tothill, John Paul
Dehns
St Bride's House
10 Salisbury Square
London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/46]Tothill, John Paul
Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London
EC4Y 8JD / GB
Application number, filing date07849592.619.12.2007
[2009/46]
WO2007IL01566
Priority number, dateUS20070883346P04.01.2007         Original published format: US 883346 P
US20070885923P22.01.2007         Original published format: US 885923 P
[2009/46]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008081425
Date:10.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2116116
Date:11.11.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008
[2009/46]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.2008
ClassificationInternational:H05K5/02
[2009/46]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/46]
TitleGerman:PERIPHERIEGERÄT ZUR VERBINDUNG MIT EINEM HOST[2009/46]
English:PERIPHERAL DEVICE FOR CONNECTION WITH A HOST[2009/46]
French:PÉRIPHÉRIQUE DESTINÉ À ÊTRE CONNECTÉ À UN HÔTE[2009/46]
Entry into regional phase29.07.2009National basic fee paid 
29.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
29.07.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.07.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/46]
02.11.2010Application withdrawn by applicant  [2010/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Cited inInternational search[X]US5889649  (NABETANI HITOSHI [JP] ET AL) [X] 1-26,30-39 * column 5, line 39 - column 6, line 19; figures 3,4 *;
 [I]US2006212640  (LEE KIAN-LENG [TW] ET AL) [I] 27-29 * paragraph [0014] - paragraph [0022]; figure 1 *;
 [A]US5155663  (HARASE TOSHIKATSU [JP]) [A] 1-39 * column 2, line 67 - column 3, line 47; figure 1 *;
 [A]US6893268  (HARARI ELIYAHOU [US] ET AL) [A] 27-29 * column 6, line 61 - column 7, line 63; figures 1-3 * * column 13, line 32 - line 48; figure 10 *;
 [A]US2006047880  (LINDBLOM STEVEN L [US] ET AL) [A] 27-29 * paragraph [0046] - paragraph [0049]; figure 4 *
 [A]  - "STACKABLE PERSONAL COMPUTER MEMORY CARD INTERNATIONAL ASSOCIATION CARD", IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, IBM CORP. NEW YORK, US, (19940901), vol. 37, no. 9, ISSN 0018-8689, page 531/532, XP000473496 [A] 1-39 * the whole document *