Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2102224

EP2102224 - CRYSTALLINE FORM OF 1- (ß-D-GLUCOPYRANOSYL) -4 -METHYL- 3- [5- (4 -FLUOROPHENYL) -2-THIENYLMETHYL]BENZENE HEMIHYDRATE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  10.01.2014
Database last updated on 14.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip26.07.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
26.07.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation
3-2-10, Dosho-machi
Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-8505 / JP
[2016/11]
Former [2013/33]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation
2-6-18, Kitahama Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-8505 / JP
Former [2009/39]For all designated states
Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation
2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541-8505 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / NOMURA, Sumihiro
c/o Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation
2-6-18, Kitahama, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 541- 8505 / JP
02 / KAWANISHI, Eiji
c/o Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation
2-6-18, Kitahama, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 541- 8505 / JP
 [2013/27]
Former [2009/39]01 / NOMURA, Sumihiro
c/o Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation, 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 541- 8505 / JP
02 / KAWANISHI, Eiji
c/o Mitsubishi Tanabe Pharma Corporation, 2-10, Dosho-machi 3-chome, Chuo-ku, Osaka-shi
Osaka 541- 8505 / JP
Representative(s)Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2014/07]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
Former [2009/39]Vossius & Partner
Siebertstraße 4
81675 München / DE
Application number, filing date07850306.703.12.2007
[2009/39]
WO2007JP73729
Priority number, dateJP2006032701904.12.2006         Original published format: JP 2006327019
US20060868426P04.12.2006         Original published format: US 868426 P
[2009/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008069327
Date:12.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/24]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2102224
Date:23.09.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008
[2009/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2102224
Date:12.02.2014
Language:EN
[2014/07]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP12.06.2008
ClassificationInternational:C07H7/04, A61K31/70
[2009/39]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/39]
Extension statesAL01.07.2009
BA01.07.2009
HR01.07.2009
MK01.07.2009
RS01.07.2009
TitleGerman:KRISTALLINE FORM VON 1- (ß-D-GLUCOPYRANOSYL) -4 -METHYL- 3- [5- (4 -FLUOROPHENYL) -2-THIENYLMETHYL]BENZOL-HEMIHYDRAT[2009/39]
English:CRYSTALLINE FORM OF 1- (ß-D-GLUCOPYRANOSYL) -4 -METHYL- 3- [5- (4 -FLUOROPHENYL) -2-THIENYLMETHYL]BENZENE HEMIHYDRATE[2009/39]
French:FORME CRISTALLINE DE 1- (ß-D-GLUCOPYRANOSYL) -4 -MÉTHYLE- 3- [5- (4 -FLUOROPHÉNYL) -2-THIÉNYLMÉTHYLE]BENZÈNE HÉMIHYDRATE[2009/39]
Entry into regional phase01.07.2009National basic fee paid 
01.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
01.07.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/39]
28.09.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.03.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
21.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
22.05.2013Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO
22.05.2013Fee for grant paid
22.05.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
14.08.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  28.09.2009
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  12.11.2014  19.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida de Cornellà 144 7th floor
08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES
Opponent's representative
Torrejón-Nieto, Javier
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida de Cornellà 144, 7th floor
08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES
 [2016/11]
Former [2016/01]
Opponent(s)01  12.11.2014  19.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida de Cornellà 144 7th floor
08950 Esplugues de Llobregat / ES
Opponent's representative
Torrejón-Nieto, Javier
Galenicum Health S.L.
Diagonal 123, Planta 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Former [2014/52]
Opponent(s)01  12.11.2014  19.11.2014  ADMISSIBLE
Galenicum Health S.L.
Avenida Diagonal 123 floor 11
08005 Barcelona / ES
Opponent's representative
Torrejón-Nieto, Javier
Galenicum Health S.L.
Diagonal 123, Planta 11
ES-08005 Barcelona / ES
19.12.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
29.06.2015Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
24.10.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
24.10.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition13.12.2016Appeal received No.  T2651/16
24.02.2017Statement of grounds filed
25.06.2020Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
20.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Cited inInternational search[DA]WO2005012326  (TANABE SEIYAKU CO [JP], et al) [DA] 1-7 * abstract * * page 84; table 1; compound 84 * * page 68 - page 70; example 1 * * page 75, lines 23-28 *