Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2105020

EP2105020 - METHOD, APPARATUS, AND MEDIUM FOR BANDWIDTH EXTENSION ENCODING AND DECODING [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.01.2014
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.01.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
129, Samsung-ro
Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do, 443-742 / KR
[2012/39]
Former [2009/40]For all designated states
Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd.
416 Maetan-dong Yeongtong-gu
Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 442-742 / KR
Inventor(s)01 / OH, Eun-Mi
c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1, Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR
02 / CHOO, Ki-Hyun
c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1, Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR
03 / KIM, Jung-Hoe
c/o Samsung Advanced Institute of Technology San 14-1, Nongseo-dong Giheung-gu
Yongin-si Gyeonggi-do 446-712 / KR
 [2009/40]
Representative(s)Grootscholten, Johannes A.M. , et al
Arnold & Siedsma
Bezuidenhoutseweg 57
2594 AC The Hague / NL
[N/P]
Former [2009/40]Grootscholten, Johannes A.M. , et al
Arnold & Siedsma Sweelinckplein 1
2517 GK Den Haag / NL
Application number, filing date07851633.320.12.2007
[2009/40]
WO2007KR06667
Priority number, dateKR2007000396312.01.2007         Original published format: KR 20070003963
[2009/40]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008084924
Date:17.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/29]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2105020
Date:30.09.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008
[2009/40]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR17.07.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP11.05.2012
ClassificationInternational:G10L21/02, G10L19/14
[2012/24]
Former International [2009/40]H04N7/24
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/40]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN, ANORDNUNG UND MEDIUM ZUR BANDWEITEERWEITERUNGSKODIERUNG UND DEKODIERUNG[2009/40]
English:METHOD, APPARATUS, AND MEDIUM FOR BANDWIDTH EXTENSION ENCODING AND DECODING[2009/40]
French:PROCÉDÉ, APPAREIL ET SUPPORT POUR CODAGE ET DÉCODAGE D'EXTENSION DE LARGEUR DE BANDE[2009/40]
Entry into regional phase10.08.2009National basic fee paid 
10.08.2009Search fee paid 
10.08.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
10.08.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.08.2009Examination requested  [2009/40]
10.12.2012Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.03.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.10.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
19.12.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.09.2014Date of oral proceedings
15.10.2014Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
16.10.2014Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
Appeal following examination05.01.2015Appeal received No.  T0610/15
26.02.2015Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.03.2013
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
19.12.2013Request for further processing filed
19.12.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.01.2014Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
28.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
29.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
30.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
22.12.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
21.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
27.12.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
27.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
21.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP1657710  (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD [JP] PANASONIC CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0015] , [0032] - [0034] * * figure 5 *;
 [Y]KR100647336B  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 1-15 * paragraphs [0010] , [0040] *;
 [A]US2007005353  (TSUSHIMA MINEO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0006] *;
 [A]US2003195742  (TSUSHIMA MINEO [JP] ET AL) [A] 1-15 * paragraphs [0071] - [0076] *
 [A]  - BOSI M ET AL, "ISO/IEC MPEG-2 ADVANCED AUDIO CODING", JOURNAL OF THE AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, AUDIO ENGINEERING SOCIETY, NEW YORK, NY, US, (19971001), vol. 45, no. 10, ISSN 1549-4950, pages 789 - 812, XP000730161 [A] 1-15 *Sections 6.4 and 8* * figure 1 *
International search[A]US2006261986  ;
 [A]US2005267763  ;
 [A]WO02058052  ;
 [A]US2002007273