blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2097693

EP2097693 - COOLING A SEPARATE ROOM IN A REFRIGERATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.11.2014
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.11.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 24.12.2014  [2014/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
LG Electronics, Inc.
20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Ku
Seoul 150-010 / KR
[2009/37]
Inventor(s)01 / YOON, Chan-Mun
Research Laboratory, Digital Appliance Company, LG Electronics 391-2, Gaeumjeong-dong Changvon-shi
Gyeongsangnam-do 641-711 / KR
 [2009/50]
Former [2009/37]01 / YOON, Chan-Mun
105-218 LG Dormitory Gaeumjeong-dong
Changwon-shi Gyeongsangnam-do 641-110 / KR
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/51]Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2009/37]Palmer, Jonathan R.
Boult Wade Tennant, Verulam Gardens, 70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Application number, filing date07851787.726.12.2007
[2009/37]
WO2007KR06848
Priority number, dateKR2007000031902.01.2007         Original published format: KR 20070000319
KR2007000032002.01.2007         Original published format: KR 20070000320
KR2007000032102.01.2007         Original published format: KR 20070000321
[2009/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2008082141
Date:10.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/28]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2097693
Date:09.09.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/37]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:AT20.11.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.11.2013
ClassificationIPC:F25D17/06, F25D23/06, F25D11/02
[2009/37]
CPC:
F25D17/065 (EP,US); F25D2317/061 (EP,US); F25D2317/0666 (EP,US);
F25D2317/067 (EP,US); F25D2317/0682 (EP,US); F25D2317/0683 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/37]
TitleGerman:KÜHLEN EINES GETRENNTEN RAUMS IN EINEM KÜHLSCHRANK[2009/37]
English:COOLING A SEPARATE ROOM IN A REFRIGERATOR[2009/37]
French:RÉFRIGÉRATEUR[2009/37]
Entry into regional phase02.06.2009National basic fee paid 
02.06.2009Search fee paid 
02.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/37]
11.09.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
21.06.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/52]
29.07.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
29.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
28.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
19.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[I]US3077749  (JUNG ROBERT C, et al) [I] 1-15* figures 1-4 *;
 [XI]EP0478122  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]) [X] 1,8,10,11 * abstract * [I] 2-7,9,12-15;
 [XI]EP0893659  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,8,10,11 * abstract * [I] 2-7,9,12-15;
 [XI]EP1314940  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [X] 1,8-10,12-15 * abstract * [I] 2-7,11;
 [XI]US2006179869  (LEE MYUNG R [KR], et al) [X] 1,2,7,8,10 * abstract * [I] 3-6,9,11-15
International search[XA]US3403533  (BOLLENBACHER LARRY L) [X] 1, 2, 4-6, 10, 11, 17 * Description column 4 lines 10-20, Fig. 6 * [A] 12, 13;
 [A]US5209073  (THOMAS DAVID A [NZ], et al) [A] 1, 5, 6, 7, 8 * Whole document *;
 [A]US5899083  (PETERSON JAMES R [US], et al) [A] 1, 2, 5, 12 * Abstract, Fig. 14 *;
 [XY]EP1559973  (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1 * Abstract, Fig. 2,5,6 * [Y] 12;
 [Y]US2005217287  (JEONG SEONG WOOK [KR], et al) [Y] 12 * Abstract, Fig. 2 *;
 [A]EP1628108  (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [A] 1, 12* Whole document *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.