Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2094828

EP2094828 - BENEFIT AGENT CONTAINING DELIVERY PARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  04.10.2019
Database last updated on 10.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip04.10.2019Revocation of patentpublished on 06.11.2019  [2019/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ENCAPSYS, LLC
1401 N. Rankin St.
Appleton, WI 54911 / US
[2016/12]
Former [2015/40]For all designated states
APPVION, INC.
825 E. Wisconsin Avenue
P.O.Box 359
Appleton, WI 54912 / US
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
APPLETON PAPERS INC.
P.O. Box 359 825 East Wisconsin Avenue Appleton
Wisconsin 54912 / US
Inventor(s)01 / SMETS, Johan
Bollenberg 79
Lubbeek / BE
02 / SANDS, Peggy Dorothy
5909 Cliff Drive
Appleton, WI 54915 / US
03 / GUINEBRETIERE, Sandra Jacqueline
1620 N. McCarthy Road
Appleton, WI 54913 / US
04 / PINTENS, An
Pauwelslei 203/1002
2930 Brasschaat / BE
05 / DIHORA, Jiten Odhavij
4521 Randall Drive
Hamilton, OH 45011 / US
 [2009/36]
Representative(s)McGuire, Gillian Margaret
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/14]Phillips, Gillian Margaret
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2014/12]Howard, Paul Nicholas , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2013/01]James, Anthony Christopher W.P. , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford One Southampton Row London
WC1B 5HA / GB
Former [2009/36]James, Anthony Christopher W.P. , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date07853137.320.11.2007
[2009/36]
WO2007US24247
Priority number, dateUS20060860645P22.11.2006         Original published format: US 860645 P
US20060861996P30.11.2006         Original published format: US 861996 P
[2009/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008063635
Date:29.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/22]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2094828
Date:02.09.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008
[2009/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2094828
Date:02.01.2013
Language:EN
[2013/01]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR29.05.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.01.2010
ClassificationInternational:C11D17/00, A61K8/11
[2010/07]
Former International [2009/36]C11D3/39, C11D3/384, C11D3/382, C11D3/50
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/36]
TitleGerman:PFLEGEMITTEL ENTHALTENDES ABGABEPARTIKEL[2009/36]
English:BENEFIT AGENT CONTAINING DELIVERY PARTICLE[2009/36]
French:PARTICULE DE DÉLIVRANCE CONTENANT UN AGENT BÉNÉFIQUE[2009/36]
Entry into regional phase23.04.2009National basic fee paid 
23.04.2009Search fee paid 
23.04.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
23.04.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/36]
03.09.2009Observations by third parties
18.06.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.02.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
29.03.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.12.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.08.2012Fee for grant paid
21.08.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12174188.8  / EP2557148
EP14180986.3  / EP2845896
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.06.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  05.09.2013  03.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  20.09.2013  03.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 03  01.10.2013  10.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Im Zollhof 1
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
 04  02.10.2013  10.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 05  02.10.2013  11.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Follmann & Co. Gesellschaft für Chemie- Werkstoffe und- Verfahrenstechnik mbH & Co. KG
Karlstrasse 59
32423 Minden / DE
Opponent's representative
von Renesse, Dorothea
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 09 46
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
 [2019/04]
Former [2015/42]
Opponent(s)01  05.09.2013  03.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  20.09.2013  03.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 03  01.10.2013  10.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Im Zollhof 1
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
 04  02.10.2013  10.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Webster, Jeremy Mark
Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
 05  02.10.2013  11.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Follmann & Co. Gesellschaft für Chemie- Werkstoffe und- Verfahrenstechnik mbH & Co. KG
Karlstrasse 59
32423 Minden / DE
Opponent's representative
von Renesse, Dorothea
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 09 46
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2014/31]
Opponent(s)01  05.09.2013  03.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  20.09.2013  03.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 03  01.10.2013  10.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Reitstötter Kinzebach
Patentanwälte
Im Zollhof 1
67061 Ludwigshafen / DE
 04  02.10.2013  10.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Bristow, Stephen Robert
Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford, MK44 1LQ / GB
 05  02.10.2013  11.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Follmann & Co. Gesellschaft für Chemie- Werkstoffe und- Verfahrenstechnik mbH & Co. KG
Karlstrasse 59
32423 Minden / DE
Opponent's representative
von Renesse, Dorothea
König-Szynka-Tilmann-von Renesse
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB
Postfach 11 09 46
40509 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2013/46]
Opponent(s)01  05.09.2013  03.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  20.09.2013  03.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 03  01.10.2013  10.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Reitstötter - Kinzebach
Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4
67059 Ludwigshafen / DE
 04  02.10.2013   
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Chisem, Janet
Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
 05  02.10.2013   
Follmann & Co. Gesellschaft für Chemie- Werkstoffe und- Verfahrenstechnik mbH & Co. KG
Karlstrasse 59
32423 Minden / DE
Opponent's representative
von Renesse, Dorothea
Patentanwälte Partnerschaft
Konig Szynka Tilmann von Renesse
Mönchenwertherstraße 11
40545 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [2013/45]
Opponent(s)01  05.09.2013  03.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  20.09.2013  03.10.2013  ADMISSIBLE
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
 03  01.10.2013   
BASF SE
67056 Ludwigshafen / DE
Opponent's representative
Reitstötter - Kinzebach
Patentanwälte Ludwigsplatz 4
67059 Ludwigshafen / DE
 04  02.10.2013   
UNILEVER PLC / UNILEVER NV
Unilever House, 100 Victoria Embankment / Weena 455
GB-London EC4Y 0DY / NL-3013 AL Rotterdam / GB
Opponent's representative
Chisem, Janet
Unilever Patent Group Colworth House Sharnbrook
Bedford MK44 1LQ / GB
Former [2013/44]
Opponent(s)01  05.09.2013   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
 02  20.09.2013   
Colgate-Palmolive Company
300 Park Avenue
New York NY 10022-7499 / US
Opponent's representative
Jenkins, Peter David
Page White & Farrer
Bedford House
John Street
London WC1N 2BF / GB
Former [2013/41]
Opponent(s)01  05.09.2013   
Henkel AG & Co. KGaA
Henkelstrasse 57
40589 Düsseldorf / DE
12.11.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
22.07.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
10.03.2016Date of oral proceedings
15.06.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
15.06.2016Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
23.09.2019Legal effect of revocation of patent [2019/45]
Appeal following opposition25.08.2016Appeal received No.  T1989/16
24.10.2016Statement of grounds filed
23.09.2019Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor withdrawn
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
29.03.2011Request for further processing filed
29.03.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
26.04.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
23.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU20.11.2007
AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
MT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE20.11.2013
LU20.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2015/34]HU20.11.2007
AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE20.11.2013
LU20.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2015/32]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
TR02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE20.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/48]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
IE20.11.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/34]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
CH30.11.2013
LI30.11.2013
Former [2014/33]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
MC02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2014/03]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
IT02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/52]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CY02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/49]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
RO02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
SK02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/48]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
DK02.01.2013
EE02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/40]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
PT02.05.2013
Former [2013/38]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
LV02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/37]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
FI02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
NL02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
GR03.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/36]AT02.01.2013
BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
PL02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/35]BE02.01.2013
CZ02.01.2013
LT02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/34]LT02.01.2013
SE02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
BG02.04.2013
IS02.05.2013
Former [2013/33]LT02.01.2013
SI02.01.2013
Former [2013/26]SI02.01.2013
Documents cited:Search[X]EP1589092  (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * examples I-III *;
 [X]EP1588760  (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [X] 1-12 * examples I,II *;
 [X]WO02074430  (QUEST INT [NL], et al) [X] 1-13 * example -; claims 1,8 *;
 [X]EP1407753  (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * examples 2,3 *;
 [X]EP1407754  (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * examples 2,3 *;
 [X]EP1533415  (INT FLAVORS & FRAGRANCES INC [US]) [X] 1-13 * example I *;
 [PX]EP1767185  (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP]) [PX] 1-3,6,11,12 * claims 1,2,15 *;
 [E]EP1894603  (TAKASAGO PERFUMERY CO LTD [JP]) [E] 1-3,8,10,11 * examples 1,4,9 *;
 [PX]WO2006131846  (FIRMENICH & CIE [CH], et al) [PX] 1-3,11,12 * examples 2,3 *;
 [PX]GB2429979  (UNILEVER PLC [GB]) [PX] 1-4,11,12 * page 10, line 20 - line 35 * * page 14, line 10 - line 13; example - *;
 [DA]US6544926  (BODMER JEROME ROBERT [US], et al) [DA] 1,3-5 * claim 1 *;
 [DA]US2002169233  (SCHWANTES TODD ARLIN [US]) [DA] 1,3-5 * claim 1 *
International search[A]US2005112152  (POPPLEWELL LEWIS M [US], et al);
 [A]US2005026801  (BROECKX WALTER AUGUST MARIA [GB], et al);
 [A]US2003092595  (ROMERO ANGELINA PENA [BE], et al)
ExaminationWO2008066773
 EP1533364
by applicantEP1894603
 WO2006131846
otherEP1589092
 EP1588760
 WO02074430
 EP1533364
 EP1407753
 EP1407754
 EP1533415