Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2223281

EP2223281 - MODELLING COMPUTER BASED BUSINESS PROCESS FOR CUSTOMISATION AND DELIVERY [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  02.11.2012
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip02.11.2012Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.12.2012  [2012/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Development Company, L.P.
11445 Compaq Center Drive West
Houston, TX 77070 / US
[2010/35]
Inventor(s)01 / STEPHENSON, Bryan
Hewlett-Packard Co.
Palo Alto
CA B-1/1a 1U H10
Mail Stop 1125, 1501 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US
02 / BELROSE, Guillaume Alexandre
27, White Horse Road
SN8 2FE, Malborough, Wiltshire / GB
03 / EDWARDS, Nigel
Hp Ltd.
Filton Rd. Stoke Gifford
Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
04 / GRAUPNER, Sven
Hewlett-Packard Co.
Palo Alto
CA B-3
1U H8, Mail Stop 1125, 1501 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US
05 / ROLIA, Jerome
Hewlett-Packard (Canada) Co.
100 Herzberg Road
Kanata, Ontario K2K 2A6 / CA
06 / WILCOCK, Lawrence
Bristol Filton B1 (BUK01) 1 M25
Mail Stop HPLB
Filton Rd. Stoke Gifford
Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
07 / MANLEY, John
HP Ltd.
Mail Stop M26
Filton Rd. Stoke Gifford
Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
 [2011/37]
Former [2010/35]01 / STEPHENSON, Bryan
Hewlett-Packard Co. Palo Alto CA B-1/1a 1U H10 Mail Stop 1125 1501 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US
02 / BELROSE, Guillaume Alexandre
HP Ltd. Filton Road Stoke Gifford
Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
03 / EDWARDS, Nigel
Hp Ltd. Filton Rd. Stoke Gifford
Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
04 / GRAUPNER, Sven
Hewlett-Packard Co. Palo Alto CA B-3 1U H8 Mail Stop 1125 1501 Page Mill Road
Palo Alto, California 94304-1100 / US
05 / ROLIA, Jerome
Hewlett-Packard (Canada) Co. 100 Herzberg Road
Kanata, Ontario K2K 2A6 / CA
06 / WILCOCK, Lawrence
Bristol Filton B1 (BUK01) 1 M25 Mail Stop HPLB Filton Rd. Stoke Gifford
Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
07 / MANLEY, John
HP Ltd. Mail Stop M26 Filton Rd. Stoke Gifford
Bristol BS34 8QZ / GB
Representative(s)Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler
Zinkler, Schenk & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte
Radlkoferstrasse 2
81373 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/35]Zimmermann, Tankred Klaus , et al
Schoppe, Zimmermann, Stöckeler & Zinkler Patentanwälte Postfach 246
82043 Pullach bei München / DE
Application number, filing date07855293.220.12.2007
[2010/35]
WO2007US88346
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2009082388
Date:02.07.2009
Language:EN
[2009/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2223281
Date:01.09.2010
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.07.2009
[2010/35]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR02.07.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.04.2011
ClassificationInternational:G06Q99/00
[2010/35]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2010/35]
TitleGerman:MODELLIERUNG EINES COMPUTERGESTÜTZTEN UNTERNEHMENSPROZESSES ZUR ANPASSUNG UND ABLIEFERUNG[2010/35]
English:MODELLING COMPUTER BASED BUSINESS PROCESS FOR CUSTOMISATION AND DELIVERY[2010/35]
French:MODÉLISATION DE PROCESSUS COMMERCIAL SUR ORDINATEUR POUR PERSONNALISATION ET LIVRAISON[2010/35]
Entry into regional phase15.06.2010National basic fee paid 
15.06.2010Search fee paid 
15.06.2010Designation fee(s) paid 
15.06.2010Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.06.2010Examination requested  [2010/35]
24.11.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
01.02.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
12.06.2012Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2012/49]
18.07.2012Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2012/49]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2012
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.06.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[X]GB2419703  (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [X] 1-15 * page 12 - page 27 *;
 [X]WO2004090684  (SYSTEM MAN ARTS INC [US]; YEMINI SHAULA ALEXANDER [US]; DESIMONE SALVA) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0031] - paragraph [0128] *;
 [X]US2007157165  (KIM GILOONG [KR]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0032] - paragraph [0092] *;
 [X]EP1710744  (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0033] - paragraph [0068] *;
 [X]US2007240047  (KOSOV YURY [US] ET AL) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0035] - paragraph [0078] *;
 [X]US2002111820  (MASSEY STUART E [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0025] - paragraph [0078] *;
 [X]WO2007081406  (FOCUS TECHNOLOGIES LLC [US]; MOORE J LYNN JR [US]; HANKINS LANCE W [US) [X] 1-15 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0026] *
 [X]  - BLUNDEN M ET AL, "Storage Networking Virtualization What's it all about", IBM REDBOOKS, XX, XX, (20001201), XP002286341 [X] 1-15 * page 16 - page 89 *
International search[A]WO2005029375  (IBM CORPORATION);
 [A]KR20040012250  (ELECTRONICS AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS RESEARCH INSTITUTE);
 [A]US2006229922  (LEVY ET AL.);
 [A]KR100633478B  (KIM, GIL OONG);
 [A]EP1542123  (IBM CORP.)