Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2094094

EP2094094 - COMPOSITION COMPRISING A MILLED CEREAL PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  15.11.2013
Database last updated on 25.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip15.11.2013Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.12.2013  [2013/51]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
F. Coy, Johannes F.
Kroetengasse 10
64853 Otzberg / DE
For all designated states
Mestemacher GmbH
Am Anger 16
33332 Gütersloh / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/45]For all designated states
F. Coy, Johannes F.
Kroetengasse 10
64853 Otzberg / DE
For all designated states
Mesternmacher GmbH
Am Anger 16
33332 Gütersloh / DE
Former [2009/42]For all designated states
Mesternmacher GmbH
Am Anger 16
33332 Gütersloh / DE
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
F. Coy, Johannes F.
Kroetengasse 10
64853 Otzberg / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Johannes F. Coy
Heidelberger Landstrasse 190
64297 Darmstadt / DE
 [2009/42]
Former [2009/36]01 / see applicant
...
Representative(s)Laufer, Gabriele , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner
Patentanwälte mbB
Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Laufer, Gabriele , et al
Witte, Weller & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 10 54 62
70047 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date07856463.007.12.2007
[2009/36]
WO2007EP10660
Priority number, dateDE20062018834U07.12.2006         Original published format: DE 202006018834 U
[2009/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008068032
Date:12.06.2008
Language:DE
[2008/24]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2094094
Date:02.09.2009
Language:DE
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.06.2008
[2009/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:A21D2/16, A21D2/26, A21D2/36, A21D13/06, A61K36/185, A61K36/899, A61K36/48, A61K36/55, A61K36/52, A23L1/30, A23L1/305
[2009/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/36]
TitleGerman:ZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM GETREIDEMAHLERZEUGNIS[2009/36]
English:COMPOSITION COMPRISING A MILLED CEREAL PRODUCT[2009/36]
French:COMPOSITION COMPRENANT UN PRODUIT DE CÉRÉALES MOULUES[2009/36]
Entry into regional phase13.06.2009National basic fee paid 
13.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
13.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.12.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
13.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/36]
03.12.2009Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
07.01.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.04.2010Observations by third parties
01.09.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.07.2013Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2013/51]
07.08.2013Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2013/51]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  03.12.2009
Fees paidRenewal fee
01.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
22.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.12.201206   M06   Not yet paid
Cited inInternational search[X]DE10036919  (BIELIG HEINZ [DE]) [X] 1-9 * the whole document *;
 [XA]WO2006078148  (IBRAHIMI ILHAM [MA]) [X] 9,10 * the whole document * [A] 1-4,6,7;
 [X]WO2006016357  (ENZYMOTEC LTD [IL]; SHULMAN AVIDOR [IL]; PELLED DORI [IL]; COHEN TZAFR) [X] 9,10 * page 10, paragraph 3 * * page 12, paragraph L - page 13, paragraph 1 * * page 20, paragraph 3 - page 21, paragraph 2 * * examples 1,8,12 *;
 [X]WO2004105517  (DSM IP ASSETS BV [NL]; SPITZER VOLKER [DE]; RAEDERSTORFF DANIEL [FR];) [X] 9,10 * page 2, lines 15-20 * * page 4, lines 5-10 * * page 5, lines 23-26 * * page 6, lines 19-25 * * examples 5-7 * * claims 1,2,18,21,20 *;
 [X]WO03003854  (CANADIAN ORGANIC SPROUT COMPAN [CA]; BARKER DENNIS [CA]) [X] 9 * page 2, lines 13-20 * * example 6; table 20 *;
 [X]EP1175836  (UNILEVER NV [NL]; UNILEVER PLC [GB] LODERS CROKLAAN BV [NL]) [X] 9 * paragraph [0003] * * claims 1,9 *;
 [X]CA2466300  (BIORIGINAL FOOD & SCIENCE CORP [CA]) [X] 9 * page 3, line 25 - page 4, line 3 * * page 5, lines 1-15 * * claims 1,2,8,9,15,21,23-25,38,43 *;
 [X]EP1302116  (VALOREX [FR]) [X] 9 * paragraphs [0014] , [0028] - [0030] * * claims 1-5 *;
 [X]FR2570931  (VIACROZE ALAIN [FR]) [X] 9 * page 1 * * table 6 * * claims 1-3 *;
 [X]RU2182425  ;
 [X]CN1397174  ;
 [X]CN1124092  ;
 [PX]RO121070  ;
 [A]KR20010099388
 [X]  - "Method of bread production", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, Database accession no. 2002-497761, XP002496686 & RU2182425 C 20020520 (UNIV ORLOVO TECH) [X] 9 * column A *
 [X]  - "Nutritive cracker", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2003, Database accession no. 2003-680344, XP002496687 & CN1397174 A 20030219 (MA Z) [X] 9 * column A *
 [X]  - "Healthy flour", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 1997, Database accession no. 1997-504186, XP002496688 & CN1124092 A 19960612 (WANG Y) [X] 10 * column A *
 [PX]  - "Premix composition for bakery products", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2007, Database accession no. 2007-170478, XP002496689 & RO121070 B 20061229 (RO-CREDO SRL) [PX] 9 * column A *
 [A]  - "Wheat flour containing 15 ingredients", DATABASE WPI, 0, Derwent World Patents Index, vol. 2002, Database accession no. 2002-251967, XP002496690 & KR20010099388 A 20011109 (KIM K O) [A] 1-8 * column A *
other   - "Megaathy Usitham", TKDL, Database accession no. SR09/102, XP003029705
    - ABDULLA SAHIB, Anuboga Vaithiya Navaneetham, (1975), page 75
    - "Mega Noikku Ennai", TKDL, Database accession no. GR02/59, XP003029706
    - "Vrhadvamgesvarorasah (Kasturimodakah)", TKDL, Database accession no. HG/2120C, XP003029707
    - Bharata Bhaisajya Ratnakara, (1999), page 711
    - "Nimbadi Curnam", TKDL, Database accession no. VK1/912A, XP003029708
    - BASAVARAJA, Basavarajiyam-Chaukhambha, (2005), page 356