Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2073623

EP2073623 - DEVICE FOR RECOVERING CHAFF ON A COMBINE HARVESTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  03.03.2017
Database last updated on 11.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip03.03.2017Revocation of patentpublished on 05.04.2017  [2017/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bon, Alain
31 Grande Rue
08210 Euilly Et Lombut / FR
[2009/27]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/27]
Representative(s)Rhein, Alain , et al
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein-Poupon
4A, rue de l'Industrie
67450 Mundolsheim / FR
[N/P]
Former [2011/51]Rhein, Alain , et al
CABINET BLEGER-RHEIN
17, rue de la Forêt
67550 Vendenheim / FR
Former [2009/27]Rhein, Alain , et al
Cabinet Bleger-Rhein 17 Rue de la Forêt
67550 Vendenheim / FR
Application number, filing date07858532.008.10.2007
[2009/27]
WO2007FR52101
Priority number, dateFR2006005413006.10.2006         Original published format: FR 0654130
[2009/27]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008040921
Date:10.04.2008
Language:FR
[2008/15]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2073623
Date:01.07.2009
Language:FR
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.04.2008
[2009/27]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2073623
Date:19.06.2013
Language:FR
[2013/25]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.05.2008
ClassificationInternational:A01D41/12
[2009/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/27]
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN ZUR RÜCKGEWINNUNG VON HÄCKSEL AN EINEM MÄHDRESCHER[2009/27]
English:DEVICE FOR RECOVERING CHAFF ON A COMBINE HARVESTER[2009/27]
French:DISPOSITIF DE RECUPERATION DE LA MENUE PAILLE SUR UNE MOISSONNEUSE BATTEUSE[2009/27]
Entry into regional phase27.04.2009National basic fee paid 
27.04.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/27]
31.08.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.12.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
29.11.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
29.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.12.2012Observations by third parties
18.01.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.04.2013Fee for grant paid
24.04.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  31.08.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  13.03.2014  11.04.2014  ADMISSIBLE
THIERART/SCIACCALUGA, M. Grégory
11 rue des Remparts/3,rue des Tuileries
08300 Le Châtelet sur Retourne/
08270 Saulces Monclin / FR
Opponent's representative
Oudin, Stéphane
JurisPatent Dijon - Cabinet GUIU 10, Rue Paul Thénard
21000 Dijon / FR
 [2014/21]
Former [2014/17]
Opponent(s)01  13.03.2014   
THIERART/SCIACCALUGA, M. Grégory
11 rue des Remparts/3,rue des Tuileries
08300 Le Châtelet sur Retourne/
08270 Saulces Monclin / FR
Opponent's representative
Oudin, Stéphane
JurisPatent Paris - Cabinet GUIU 28 Rue d'Aboukir
75002 Paris / FR
29.04.2014Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
28.08.2014Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
04.06.2015Date of oral proceedings
19.06.2015Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
19.06.2015Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
20.12.2016Legal effect of revocation of patent [2017/14]
Appeal following opposition24.08.2015Appeal received No.  T1699/15
28.10.2015Statement of grounds filed
20.12.2016Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the proprietor was rejected
20.12.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.02.2017Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
26.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
25.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
GB08.10.2015
IT08.10.2015
LU08.10.2015
PL08.10.2015
RO08.10.2015
ES09.10.2015
HU09.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NL01.11.2015
DE03.05.2016
[2017/12]
Former [2016/40]AT19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
GB08.10.2015
IT08.10.2015
LU08.10.2015
RO08.10.2015
HU09.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
NL01.11.2015
DE03.05.2016
Former [2016/39]AT19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
GB08.10.2015
IT08.10.2015
LU08.10.2015
RO08.10.2015
HU09.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
DE03.05.2016
Former [2016/36]AT19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
GB08.10.2015
IT08.10.2015
LU08.10.2015
RO08.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
DE03.05.2016
Former [2016/34]AT19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
GB08.10.2015
LU08.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
DE03.05.2016
Former [2016/33]AT19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
LU08.10.2015
CH31.10.2015
LI31.10.2015
DE03.05.2016
Former [2016/26]AT19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
LU08.10.2015
Former [2015/41]AT19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
MT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/48]AT19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
IE08.10.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/25]AT19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
MC19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/21]AT19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
DK19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/18]AT19.06.2013
CY19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/10]AT19.06.2013
CZ19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
SK19.06.2013
CY31.07.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
IS19.10.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/09]AT19.06.2013
EE19.06.2013
FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/08]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
PT21.10.2013
Former [2014/02]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
LV19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
Former [2013/50]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
BG19.09.2013
GR20.09.2013
Former [2013/49]FI19.06.2013
LT19.06.2013
SE19.06.2013
SI19.06.2013
GR20.09.2013
Former [2013/47]LT19.06.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]WO03051101  (GLENVAR PASTORAL COMPANY PTY L [AU], et al) [Y] 1-3,5 * page 3, line 13 - page 4, line 24; figures 1,2 *;
 [Y]FR2314655  (DEERE & CO [US]) [Y] 1-3 * page 2, line 34 - page 3, line 5; figure 1 *;
 [Y]GB918355  (GUNTHER CLAAS) [Y] 5 * the whole document *;
 [A]US4236530  (JOHNSON JOHN L B) [A] 1 * column 2, lines 63-67; figure 2 * * column 9, lines 34-44 *;
 [DA]WO0076294  (MCLEOD HARVEST INC [CA]) [DA] 1 * page 1, line 24 - page 2, line 6 * * page 18, line 2 - line 6 * * page 22, line 12 - page 25, line 2; figure 7a *;
 [A]FR1055341  (CLAEYS) [A] 1 * the whole document *
ExaminationUS3370728
 US3580257
 US3938683
 US6358143
 US4100720
by applicantWO0076294
otherUS3938683
 US4100720
 US6358143