Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2087407

EP2087407 - PROCESS CARTRIDGE, ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS, AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PHOTOSENSITIVE DRUM UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.05.2014
Database last updated on 17.10.2018
Most recent event   Tooltip04.09.2015Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 07.10.2015  [2015/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Canon Kabushiki Kaisha
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
[2009/33]
Inventor(s)01 / UENO, Takahito
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / MIYABE, Shigeo
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
03 / MORIOKA, Masanari
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
04 / HISANO, Masato
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA
30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome
Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
 [2013/29]
Former [2009/33]01 / UENO, Takahito
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
02 / MIYABE, Shigeo
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
03 / MORIOKA, Masanari
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
04 / HISANO, Masato
c/o CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2 Shimomaruko 3-chome Ohta-ku
Tokyo 146-8501 / JP
Representative(s)TBK
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
[2013/29]
Former [2009/33]TBK-Patent
Bavariaring 4-6
80336 München / DE
Application number, filing date07860559.925.12.2007
[2009/33]
WO2007JP75364
Priority number, dateJP2006034619022.12.2006         Original published format: JP 2006346190
JP2007004266522.02.2007         Original published format: JP 2007042665
JP2007033030321.12.2007         Original published format: JP 2007330303
[2009/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008078836
Date:03.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/27]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2087407
Date:12.08.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008
[2009/33]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2087407
Date:17.07.2013
Language:EN
[2013/29]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP03.07.2008
ClassificationInternational:G03G21/18, G03G21/16
[2009/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/33]
TitleGerman:PROZESSKARTUSCHE, ELEKTROPHOTOGRAPHISCHE BILDERZEUGUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND PHOTOSENSITIVE ELEKTROPHOTOGRAPHISCHE TROMMELEINHEIT[2009/33]
English:PROCESS CARTRIDGE, ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC IMAGE FORMING APPARATUS, AND ELECTROPHOTOGRAPHIC PHOTOSENSITIVE DRUM UNIT[2009/33]
French:CARTOUCHE DE TRAITEMENT, APPAREIL DE FORMATION D'IMAGE ÉLECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE, ET UNITÉ DE TAMBOUR PHOTOSENSIBLE ÉLECTROPHOTOGRAPHIQUE[2009/33]
Entry into regional phase26.03.2009National basic fee paid 
26.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
26.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure26.03.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
26.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/33]
17.01.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.05.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.07.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.02.2013Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.06.2013Fee for grant paid
07.06.2013Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP13169112.3  / EP2631718
EP13169114.9  / EP2631719
EP17174142.4
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  17.01.2012
Opposition(s)22.04.2014No opposition filed within time limit [2014/26]
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.01.2010Renewal fee patent year 03
03.01.2011Renewal fee patent year 04
02.01.2012Renewal fee patent year 05
02.01.2013Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCY17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
MT17.07.2013
IS17.11.2013
IE25.12.2013
LU25.12.2013
[2015/41]
Former [2014/48]CY17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
IS17.11.2013
IE25.12.2013
LU25.12.2013
Former [2014/38]CY17.07.2013
MC17.07.2013
IS17.11.2013
LU25.12.2013
Former [2014/18]CY17.07.2013
IS17.11.2013
Former [2014/10]CY07.08.2013
IS17.11.2013
Cited inInternational search[Y]EP1178370  (CANON KK [JP]) [Y] 1-182 * paragraphs [0045] - [0049] - [0056] - [0059] - [0068] - [0071] - [0087]; figures 1-9,14,15 *;
 [YA]US6473580  (INOMATA MITSUGU [JP]) [Y] 61-120,182 * column 1, line 9 - column 8, line 42; figures 1,34-36 * * column 26, line 46 - column 27, line 23 * [A] 1-60,121-181,183;
 [Y]JPH05341589  (CANON KK) [Y] 1-60,121-181,183 * abstract *;
 [Y]US2006240896  (OHASHI MASAAKI [JP], et al) [Y] 1-60,121-181,183 * paragraphs [0041] - [0046] - [0068] - [0071]; figures 1,2,6 *;
 [Y]JP2004045603  (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC) [Y] 121-181,183 * abstract *
ExaminationJPH01164818
 JP2002031153
 US2005191092