Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2097088

EP2097088 - MUSCLE DERIVED CELLS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CARDIAC PATHOLOGIES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  22.08.2014
Database last updated on 06.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip31.07.2018Change - representative 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
UNIVERSITY OF PITTSBURGH
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center
Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
[2014/39]
Former [2009/37]For all designated states
University of Pittsburgh
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CHANCELLOR, Michael B.
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center
Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
02 / PAYNE, Thomas
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center
Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
03 / JANKOWSKI, Ronald
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center
Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
04 / PRUCHNIC, Ryan
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center
Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
 [2014/39]
Former [2009/37]01 / CHANCELLOR, Michael B.
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
02 / PAYNE, Thomas
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
03 / JANKOWSKI, Ronald
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
04 / PRUCHNIC, Ryan
200 Gardner Steel Conference Center Thackeray & O'Hara Streets
Pittsburgh, PA 15260 / US
Representative(s)Haseltine Lake Kempner LLP
Lincoln House, 5th Floor
300 High Holborn
London WC1V 7JH / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/15]Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo LLP
Alder Castle
10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2012/20]Clarke, Victoria , et al
Mintz Levin Cohn Ferris Glovsky and Popeo Intellectual Property LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2009/52]Aston, Heidi Frances , et al
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo IP, LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Former [2009/37]Aston, Heidi Frances , et al
Mintz, Levin, Cohn, Ferris, Glovsky and Popeo IP, LLP Alder Castle 10 Noble Street
London EC2V 7JX / GB
Application number, filing date07862321.228.11.2007
[2009/37]
WO2007US24566
Priority number, dateUS20060867405P28.11.2006         Original published format: US 867405 P
[2009/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008066886
Date:05.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/23]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2097088
Date:09.09.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008
[2009/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2097088
Date:24.09.2014
Language:EN
[2014/39]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP25.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K35/34, A61K35/12, C12N5/077
[2017/01]
Former International [2014/21]A61K35/34, A61P9/04
Former International [2009/37]A61K35/34, A61P9/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/37]
TitleGerman:ZELLEN AUS MUSKELN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON HERZERKRANKUNGEN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG[2009/37]
English:MUSCLE DERIVED CELLS FOR THE TREATMENT OF CARDIAC PATHOLOGIES AND METHODS OF MAKING AND USING THE SAME[2009/37]
French:CELLULES DÉRIVÉES DES MUSCLES UTILISÉES DANS LE TRAITEMENT DE PATHOLOGIES CARDIAQUES, ET LEURS PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION ET D'UTILISATION[2009/37]
Entry into regional phase29.06.2009National basic fee paid 
29.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
29.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure29.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
29.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/37]
18.02.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
27.08.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.05.2014Communication of intention to grant the patent
18.08.2014Fee for grant paid
18.08.2014Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.08.2014Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  18.02.2013
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  23.06.2015   
Innovacell Biotechnologie AG
Mitterweg 24
6020 Innsbruck / AT
Opponent's representative
Drexl, Janna
Dehmel & Bettenhausen
Patentanwälte PartmbB
Herzogspitalstraße 11
80331 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2015/31]
Opponent(s)01  23.06.2015   
Innovacell Biotechnologie AG
Mitterweg 24
6020 Innsbruck / AT
Opponent's representative
Drexl, Janna
Dehmel & Bettenhausen
Patent- und Rechtsanwälte
Herzogspitalstraße 11
80331 München / DE
29.07.2015Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
08.02.2016Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.11.2016Date of oral proceedings
13.01.2017Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
13.01.2017Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition13.03.2017Appeal received No.  T0527/17
23.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
27.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0527/17
23.05.2017Statement of grounds filed
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
26.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
27.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU28.11.2007
AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
MT24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
[2016/33]
Former [2016/32]HU28.11.2007
AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
TR24.09.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2016/25]AT24.09.2014
BG24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2016/12]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SI24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/37]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
IT24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/34]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
DK24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/33]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
CH30.11.2014
LI30.11.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/32]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
MC24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/30]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
LU28.11.2014
BE30.11.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/25]AT24.09.2014
CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/24]CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
PL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/23]CY24.09.2014
CZ24.09.2014
EE24.09.2014
ES24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
SK24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
IS24.01.2015
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/22]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
RO24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
PT26.01.2015
Former [2015/16]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
NL24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/12]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
LV24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/11]CY24.09.2014
FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
GR25.12.2014
Former [2015/09]FI24.09.2014
LT24.09.2014
SE24.09.2014
Former [2015/08]LT24.09.2014
Cited inInternational search[X]WO0178754  (UNIV PITTSBURGH [US]; CHANCELLOR MICHAEL B [US]; HUARD JOHNNY [US]; CA) [X] 1-22 * page 33, line 14 - page 35; claims 1-12 * * page 17, lines 13-18 * * page 18, lines 13,14 * * abstract *;
 [DX]US6866842  (CHANCELLOR MICHAEL B [US] ET AL) [DX] 1-22 * column 24, paragraph 2 * * column 13, paragraph 2 * * column 8, paragraph 1 * * column 12, lines 43-50 * * column 59, lines 10,11 *;
 [X]  - LEE J Y ET AL, "The effects of periurethral muscle-derived stem cell injection on leak point pressure in a rat model of stress urinary incontinence", JOURNAL OF IMMUNOLOGY, THE WILLIAMS AND WILKINS CO. BALTIMORE, (20030201), vol. 14, no. 1, ISSN 0022-1767, pages 31 - 37, XP002472751 [X] 1-22 * figure 1 * * page 32, column L * * page 32, column R, paragraph L - page 33, column L, paragraph 1 * * abstract *