Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2097088


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
31.07.2018 Change - representative
01.08.2017 Change: Appeal number
24.05.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of statement of grounds of an appeal
14.03.2017 New entry: Appeal number
14.03.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
01.03.2017 Change: Appeal number
01.03.2017 New entry: Appeal number
01.03.2017 New entry: Date of receipt of notice of appeal
12.01.2017 New entry: Despatch of interlocutory decision
12.01.2017 New entry: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
02.12.2016 Change - classification published on  04.01.2017  [2017/01]
02.12.2016 Change - classification published on  04.01.2017  [2017/01]
15.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.08.2016  [2016/33]
08.07.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.08.2016  [2016/32]
06.06.2016 New entry: Date of oral proceedings
20.05.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.06.2016  [2016/25]
19.02.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  23.03.2016  [2016/12]
09.02.2016 New entry: Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
20.11.2015 Change: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
09.10.2015 Change - representative
07.08.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  09.09.2015  [2015/37]
05.08.2015 Change - representative
28.07.2015 New entry: Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations + time limit
17.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.08.2015  [2015/34]
10.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  12.08.2015  [2015/33]
03.07.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  05.08.2015  [2015/32]
26.06.2015 Opposition filed published on  29.07.2015  [2015/31]
19.06.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.07.2015  [2015/30]
15.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  17.06.2015  [2015/25]
08.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  10.06.2015  [2015/24]
01.05.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  03.06.2015  [2015/23]
24.04.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  27.05.2015  [2015/22]
13.03.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.04.2015  [2015/16]
13.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.03.2015  [2015/12]
06.02.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.03.2015  [2015/11]
23.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.02.2015  [2015/09]
16.01.2015 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.02.2015  [2015/08]
22.08.2014 (Expected) grant published on  24.09.2014  [2014/39]
20.08.2014 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
20.08.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
20.08.2014 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
06.05.2014 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
18.04.2014 Change - classification published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
18.04.2014 Change - classification published on  21.05.2014  [2014/21]
30.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
28.08.2013 New entry: Reply to examination report
18.06.2013 Change: Despatch of examination report + time limit
08.03.2013 Change - representative published on  10.04.2013  [2013/15]
18.02.2013 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
15.02.2013 First examination report
28.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
13.04.2012 Change - representative published on  16.05.2012  [2012/20]
29.11.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.11.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
29.01.2010 Change - extension states published on  03.03.2010  [2010/09]
02.12.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
20.11.2009 Change - representative published on  23.12.2009  [2009/52]
07.08.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  09.09.2009  [2009/37]
07.08.2009 Request for examination filed published on  09.09.2009  [2009/37]
20.07.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
03.07.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
01.07.2009 Amendment by applicant
02.10.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
24.06.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
07.06.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
01.03.2008 PCT data prior to European publication