blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2094519

EP2094519 - ELECTROHYDRAULIC TORQUE TRANSFER DEVICE WITH INTEGRATED CLUTCH AND ACTUATOR UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.12.2012
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.07.2014Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): HU
published on 20.08.2014  [2014/34]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
American Axle & Manufacturing, Inc.
One Dauch Drive
Detroit, MI 48211-1198 / US
[2009/36]
Inventor(s)01 / MILLAR, Stuart J.
17 Burns Drive
Maybole, Ayrshire KA19 8FB / GB
 [2009/36]
Representative(s)Novagraaf Technologies
Bâtiment O2
2, rue Sarah Bernhardt
CS90017
92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR
[N/P]
Former [2012/06]Novagraaf Technologies
122, rue Edouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
Former [2009/36]Novagraaf IP
122 rue Édouard Vaillant
92593 Levallois-Perret Cedex / FR
Application number, filing date07862610.806.12.2007
[2009/36]
WO2007US25022
Priority number, dateUS20060875185P15.12.2006         Original published format: US 875185 P
US2007094820330.11.2007         Original published format: US 948203
[2009/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO2008076226
Date:26.06.2008
Language:EN
[2008/26]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2094519
Date:02.09.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2094519
Date:08.02.2012
Language:EN
[2012/06]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:KR26.06.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP22.02.2011
ClassificationIPC:B60K17/16, B60K17/34
[2009/36]
CPC:
B60K17/34 (EP,US); F16D48/02 (EP,US); F16D2048/0203 (EP,US);
F16D2500/1026 (EP,US); F16D2500/10437 (EP,US); F16D2500/70408 (EP,US);
F16D2500/7109 (EP,US) (-)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/36]
TitleGerman:ELEKTROHYDRAULISCHE DREHMOMENTÜBERTRAGUNGSVORRICHTUNG MIT INTEGRIERTER KUPPLUNG UND BETÄTIGUNGSEINHEIT[2009/36]
English:ELECTROHYDRAULIC TORQUE TRANSFER DEVICE WITH INTEGRATED CLUTCH AND ACTUATOR UNIT[2009/36]
French:DISPOSITIF DE TRANSFERT DE COUPLE ÉLECTROHYDRAULIQUE AVEC ENSEMBLE ACTIONNEUR ET EMBRAYAGE INTÉGRÉ[2009/36]
Entry into regional phase10.07.2009National basic fee paid 
10.07.2009Search fee paid 
10.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
10.07.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure10.07.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
10.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/36]
23.08.2011Communication of intention to grant the patent
14.12.2011Fee for grant paid
14.12.2011Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  23.08.2011
Opposition(s)09.11.2012No opposition filed within time limit [2013/03]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
27.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU06.12.2007
AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
TR08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
[2014/34]
Former [2014/21]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
TR08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2013/51]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
MT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2013/33]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
BG08.05.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2013/22]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
ES19.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2013/07]AT08.02.2012
BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/50]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
IT08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
SK08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/49]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
CZ08.02.2012
DK08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
RO08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
SI08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/48]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
EE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
SE08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/41]BE08.02.2012
CY08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/39]BE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
LV08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/37]BE08.02.2012
FI08.02.2012
LT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
PL08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
PT08.06.2012
Former [2012/36]LT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
GR09.05.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/35]LT08.02.2012
NL08.02.2012
IS08.06.2012
Former [2012/34]LT08.02.2012
IS08.06.2012
Documents cited:Search[A]US2002144851  (PORTER FRED C [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 2 *;
 [A]EP1561628  (MAGNA DRIVETRAIN AMERICA INC [US]) [A] 1-15 * figure 3a *;
 [A]US2006131122  (BURNS TIMOTHY M [US], et al) [A] 1-15* figure 2 *
International search[A]US5358455  (LUNDSTROEM BO [SE]);
 [A]US5469950  (LUNDSTROEM BO [SE], et al);
 [Y]JPH11141649  (MAZDA MOTOR);
 [X]US5979631  (LUNDSTROEM BO [SE])
by applicantUS20060875185
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.