Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2119258

EP2119258 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING THE STATE OF A WIRELESS USER DEVICE IN A WIRELESS DOMAIN TO AN APPLICATION SERVER IN AN INTERNET PROTOCOL (IP) DOMAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [2009/47]SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUS FOR COMMUNICATING THE STATE OF A WIRELESS USER DEVICE IN A WIRELESS DOMAIN TO AN APPLICATION SERVER IN AN INTERNET PROTOCOL (IP) DOMAIN
[2018/33]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.12.2019
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  18.01.2019
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.09.2018
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.11.2016
Most recent event   Tooltip27.12.2019No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 29.01.2020 [2020/05]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BroadSoft, Inc.
9737 Washingtonian Boulevard
Suite 350
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
[2019/08]
Former [2014/17]For all designated states
BroadSoft, Inc.
9737 Washingtonian Boulevard
Suite 350
Gaithersburg, MD 20878 / US
Former [2009/47]For all designated states
Broadsoft M6, LLC
Broadsoft, Inc. 220 Perry Parkway
Gaithersburg, Maryland 20877 / US
Inventor(s)01 / RICE, Michael
2020 Arles Lane
Carrollton, TX 75007 / US
02 / MAVEDDAT, Payam
2200 Harrisburg Lane
Plano, TX 75025 / US
03 / DELGADILLO, Gerardo
11413 Sunrise Lane
Frisco, TX 75035 / US
 [2009/47]
Representative(s)Kazi, Ilya , et al
Mathys & Squire LLP The Shard
32 London Bridge Street
London SE1 9SG / GB
[2019/08]
Former [2013/45]de Zeeuw, Johan Diederick , et al
Murgitroyd & Company
Scotland House
165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2009/48]Walker, Stephen
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Former [2009/47]Walker, Stephen
Murgitroyd & Company Scotland House 165-169 Scotland Street
GB-Glasgow G5 8PL / GB
Application number, filing date07863211.421.12.2007
[2009/47]
WO2007US26173
Priority number, dateUS20060876356P21.12.2006         Original published format: US 876356 P
[2009/47]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008079337
Date:03.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2119258
Date:18.11.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008
[2009/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2119258
Date:20.02.2019
Language:EN
[2019/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US21.08.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.02.2014
ClassificationInternational:H04W84/02
[2009/48]
Former International [2009/47]H04Q7/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2019/08]
Former [2009/47]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUM ÜBERMITTELN DES ZUSTANDS EINES DRAHTLOSEN BENUTZERGERÄTS IN EINER DRAHTLOSEN DOMÄNE ZU EINEM ANWENDUNGSSERVER IN EINER INTERNET-PROTOKOLL-(IP-)DOMÄNE[2018/33]
English:SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR COMMUNICATING THE STATE OF A WIRELESS USER DEVICE IN A WIRELESS DOMAIN TO AN APPLICATION SERVER IN AN INTERNET PROTOCOL (IP) DOMAIN[2018/33]
French:SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR COMMUNIQUER L'ÉTAT D'UN DISPOSITIF UTILISATEUR SANS FIL DANS UN DOMAINE SANS FIL À UN SERVEUR D'APPLICATION DANS UN DOMAINE DE PROTOCOLE INTERNET (IP)[2018/33]
Former [2009/47]SYSTEME, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNGEN ZUM ÜBERMITTELN DES ZUSTANDS EINES DRAHTLOSEN BENUTZERGERÄTS IN EINER DRAHTLOSEN DOMÄNE ZU EINEM ANWENDUNGSSERVER IN EINER INTERNET-PROTOKOLL-(IP-)DOMÄNE
Former [2009/47]SYSTEMS, METHODS, AND APPARATUS FOR COMMUNICATING THE STATE OF A WIRELESS USER DEVICE IN A WIRELESS DOMAIN TO AN APPLICATION SERVER IN AN INTERNET PROTOCOL (IP) DOMAIN
Former [2009/47]SYSTÈMES, PROCÉDÉS ET APPAREIL POUR COMMUNIQUER L'ÉTAT D'UN DISPOSITIF UTILISATEUR SANS FIL DANS UN DOMAINE SANS FIL À UN SERVEUR D'APPLICATION DANS UN DOMAINE DE PROTOCOLE INTERNET (IP)
Entry into regional phase16.07.2009National basic fee paid 
16.07.2009Search fee paid 
16.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
16.07.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure16.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/47]
10.09.2014Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
17.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.05.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.09.2017Reply to a communication from the examining division
07.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
11.09.2018Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.01.2019Fee for grant paid
04.01.2019Fee for publishing/printing paid
04.01.2019Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.07.2016
Opposition(s)21.11.2019No opposition filed within time limit [2020/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
24.12.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
23.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
28.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
28.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
12.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
01.12.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
22.12.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
31.12.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT20.02.2019
CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
[2020/03]
Former [2020/01]CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
PL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/49]CZ20.02.2019
DK20.02.2019
EE20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
RO20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
SK20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/48]DK20.02.2019
ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/47]ES20.02.2019
FI20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/46]FI20.02.2019
IT20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/39]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
LV20.02.2019
NL20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
IS20.06.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/38]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
BG20.05.2019
GR21.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/37]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
GR21.05.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/34]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
SE20.02.2019
PT20.06.2019
Former [2019/33]FI20.02.2019
LT20.02.2019
PT20.06.2019
Documents cited:Search[XI]WO03003653  (VERSADA NETWORKS INC [US]) [X] 1-4,6,7,9-14 * page 3, paragraph 11 * * page 6, paragraph 19 - page 7, paragraph 20 * * page 8, paragraph 23 * [I] 5,8,15;
 [X]GB2426410  (NORTEL NETWORKS LTD [CA]) [X] 1,9 * page 6, line 23 - page 7, line 2 * * page 10, lines 14,15 * * page 13, lines 8-10 *
International search[X]WO2005125235  (NETMOTION WIRELESS INC [US], et al);
 [Y]US2002167906  (LA PORTA THOMAS F [US], et al);
 [Y]US6421424  (CREAMER THOMAS E [US], et al);
 [A]US6795701  (BAKER JOHN [US], et al);
 [A]US6519228  (CREAMER THOMAS E [US], et al)
by applicantWO03003653
 GB2426410