Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2052026

EP2052026 - HIGH-DENSITY POLYETHYLENE COMPOSITIONS, METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME, INJECTION MOLDED ARTICLES MADE THEREFROM, AND METHOD OF MAKING SUCH ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.10.2009
Database last updated on 24.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip14.12.2019Change: Despatch of interlocutory decision 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Dow Global Technologies LLC
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
[2011/16]
Former [2009/18]For all designated states
DOW GLOBAL TECHNOLOGIES INC.
2040 Dow Center
Midland, MI 48674 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MICHIE, William
9111 South Fitzgerald Way
Missouri City, TX 77459 / US
02 / WHITED, Stephanie
1915 Huber Road
Charleston, WV 25314 / US
03 / WIKER, Nathan
2135 W. Main Street
Houston, TX 77098 / US
04 / ELLEY-BRISTOW, Dale
865 Tudor Close East
Sarnia, ON N7V 2Z8 / CA
 [2009/18]
Representative(s)Boult Wade Tennant LLP
Salisbury Square House
8 Salisbury Square
London EC4Y 8AP / GB
[N/P]
Former [2014/40]Hayes, Adrian Chetwynd
Boult Wade Tennant
Verulam Gardens
70 Gray's Inn Road
London WC1X 8BT / GB
Former [2009/52]Böhm, Brigitte , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Former [2009/18]Böhm, Brigitte , et al
Weickmann & Weickmann Patentanwälte Postfach 86 08 20
81635 München / DE
Application number, filing date07863496.125.10.2007
[2009/18]
WO2007US82502
Priority number, dateUS20070927176P02.05.2007         Original published format: US 927176 P
[2009/18]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008136849
Date:13.11.2008
Language:EN
[2008/46]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2052026
Date:29.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 13.11.2008
[2009/18]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2052026
Date:02.12.2009
Language:EN
[2009/49]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP13.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:C08F210/16, C08L23/06, H01B3/44
[2020/03]
Former International [2009/18]C08L23/08, C08F255/02, C08F2/34, C08F297/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/18]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:HOCHDICHTE POLYETHYLENZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG, DARAUS HERGESTELLTE EINSPRITZGEFORMTE ARTIKEL UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DERARTIGER ARTIKEL[2009/18]
English:HIGH-DENSITY POLYETHYLENE COMPOSITIONS, METHOD OF MAKING THE SAME, INJECTION MOLDED ARTICLES MADE THEREFROM, AND METHOD OF MAKING SUCH ARTICLES[2009/18]
French:COMPOSITIONS DE POLYÉTHYLÈNE HAUTE DENSITÉ, LEUR PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ARTICLE MOULÉ PAR INJECTION OBTENU À PARTIR DE CES COMPOSITIONS, ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE TELS ARTICLES[2009/18]
Entry into regional phase23.02.2009National basic fee paid 
23.02.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
23.02.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure23.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
23.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/18]
20.05.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.09.2009Fee for grant paid
17.09.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.09.2010  07.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Sales (UK) Limited
Hawkslease Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst
Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB
 02  02.09.2010  08.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Opponent's representative
Cabinet Chaillot, et al
16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre
B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
 03  02.09.2010  10.01.2011  WITHDRAWN
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Kador & Partner PartG mbB, et al
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2018/16]
Opponent(s)01  01.09.2010  07.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Sales (UK) Limited
Hawkslease Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst
Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB
 02  02.09.2010  08.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Opponent's representative
Cabinet Chaillot, et al
16/20, avenue de l'Agent Sarre
B.P. 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
 03  02.09.2010  10.01.2011  WITHDRAWN
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Kador & Partner, et al
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2015/46]
Opponent(s)01  01.09.2010  07.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Sales (UK) Limited
Hawkslease Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst
Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames, Middx TW18 4PR / GB
 02  02.09.2010  08.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Total Research & Technology Feluy
Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe / BE
Opponent's representative
Desrois, Julie, et al
Cabinet Chaillot
16-20, Avenue de l'Agent Sarre
BP 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
 03  02.09.2010  10.01.2011  WITHDRAWN
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Kador & Partner, et al
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2014/14]
Opponent(s)01  01.09.2010  07.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Sales (UK) Limited
Hawkslease Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst
Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
Communications House
South Street
Staines-upon-Thames
Middlesex, TW18 4PR / GB
 02  02.09.2010  08.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY S.A. Industrial Property
Patents Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
Opponent's representative
Desrois, Julie, et al
Cabinet Chaillot
16-20, Avenue de l'Agent Sarre
BP 74
92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
 03  02.09.2010  10.01.2011  WITHDRAWN
Borealis AG
IZD Tower
Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Wien / AT
Opponent's representative
Kador & Partner, et al
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2012/10]
Opponent(s)01  01.09.2010  07.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Commercial Services UK Limited
Hawkslease
Chapel lane
Lyndhurst
Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al
Mathisen & Macara LLP
120 Bridge Road
Chertsey
Surrey KT16 8LA / GB
 02  02.09.2010  08.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY S.A. Industrial Property
Patents Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
Opponent's representative
Desrois, Julie, et al
Cabinet Chaillot 16-20, Avenue de l'Agent Sarre BP 74
F-92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
 03  02.09.2010  10.01.2011  WITHDRAWN
Borealis AG
IZD Tower Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
Opponent's representative
Kador & Partner, et al
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2011/07]
Opponent(s)01  01.09.2010  07.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Europe Limited
Hawslease Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst, Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al
Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road
GB-Chertsey, Surrey KT16 8LA / GB
 02  02.09.2010  08.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY S.A. Industrial Property
Patents Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
Opponent's representative
Desrois, Julie, et al
Cabinet Chaillot 16-20, Avenue de l'Agent Sarre BP 74
F-92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
 03  02.09.2010  10.01.2011  WITHDRAWN
Borealis AG
IZD Tower Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
Opponent's representative
Kador & Partner, et al
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2011/07]
Opponent(s)01  01.09.2010  07.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Europe Limited
Hawslease Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst, Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al
Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road
GB-Chertsey, Surrey KT16 8LA / GB
 02  02.09.2010  08.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY S.A. Industrial Property
Patents Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
Opponent's representative
Desrois, Julie, et al
Cabinet Chaillot 16-20, Avenue de l'Agent Sarre BP 74
F-92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
 03  02.09.2010  13.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
Opponent's representative
Kador & Partner, et al
Corneliusstrasse 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2010/42]
Opponent(s)01  01.09.2010  07.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Europe Limited
Hawslease Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst, Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al
Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road
GB-Chertsey, Surrey KT16 8LA / GB
 02  02.09.2010  08.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY S.A. Industrial Property
Patents Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
Opponent's representative
Desrois, Julie, et al
Cabinet Chaillot 16-20, Avenue de l'Agent Sarre BP 74
F-92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
 03  02.09.2010  13.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Borealis AG
IZD Tower Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
Opponent's representative
Kador & Partner, et al
Corneliusstraße 15
80469 München / DE
Former [2010/41]
Opponent(s)01  01.09.2010  07.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
Ineos Europe Limited
Hawslease Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst, Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al
Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road
GB-Chertsey, Surrey KT16 8LA / GB
 02  02.09.2010  08.09.2010  ADMISSIBLE
TOTAL PETROCHEMICALS RESEARCH FELUY S.A. Industrial Property
Patents Zone Industrielle C
7181 Seneffe (Feluy) / BE
Opponent's representative
Desrois, Julie, et al
Cabinet Chaillot 16-20, Avenue de l'Agent Sarre BP 74
F-92703 Colombes Cedex / FR
 03  02.09.2010   
Borealis AG
IZD Tower Wagramerstrasse 17-19
1220 Vienna / AT
Opponent's representative
Pillep, Bernhard, et al
Kador & Partner Corneliusstrasse 15
D-80469 München / DE
Former [2010/40]
Opponent(s)01  01.09.2010   
Ineos Europe Limited
Hawslease Chapel Lane
Lyndhurst, Hampshire SO43 7FG / GB
Opponent's representative
Smith, Julian Philip Howard, et al
Compass Patents LLP 120 Bridge Road
GB-Chertsey, Surrey KT16 8LA / GB
11.10.2010Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
21.06.2011Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
18.03.2014Date of oral proceedings
13.06.2014Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.02.2019Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
12.03.2019Reply to a communication from the opposition division
18.07.2019Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
31.07.2019Reply to a communication from the opposition division
18.12.2019Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
Appeal following opposition21.04.2015Appeal received No.  T0756/15
19.06.2015Statement of grounds filed
10.07.2018Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
13.04.2015Appeal received No.  T0756/15
19.06.2015Statement of grounds filed
10.07.2018Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
10.04.2015Appeal received No.  T0756/15
08.06.2015Statement of grounds filed
19.11.2015Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [2015/47]
10.07.2018Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
10.07.2018Date of oral proceedings
18.07.2018Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
DK02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
LT02.12.2009
LV02.12.2009
MT02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
SK02.12.2009
TR02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
GR03.03.2010
IS02.04.2010
PT02.04.2010
HU03.06.2010
IE25.10.2010
LU25.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
ES26.10.2014
BE31.10.2014
[2016/20]
Former [2015/30]AT02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
DK02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
LT02.12.2009
LV02.12.2009
MT02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
SK02.12.2009
TR02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
GR03.03.2010
IS02.04.2010
PT02.04.2010
HU03.06.2010
IE25.10.2010
LU25.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
BE31.10.2014
Former [2013/14]AT02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
DK02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
LT02.12.2009
LV02.12.2009
MT02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
SK02.12.2009
TR02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
GR03.03.2010
IS02.04.2010
PT02.04.2010
HU03.06.2010
IE25.10.2010
LU25.10.2010
MC31.10.2010
CH31.10.2011
LI31.10.2011
Former [2011/25]AT02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
DK02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
LT02.12.2009
LV02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
SK02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
GR03.03.2010
IS02.04.2010
PT02.04.2010
MC31.10.2010
Former [2010/44]AT02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
CZ02.12.2009
EE02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
LT02.12.2009
LV02.12.2009
NL02.12.2009
RO02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
SK02.12.2009
BG02.03.2010
IS02.04.2010
PT02.04.2010
Former [2010/30]AT02.12.2009
CY02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
LT02.12.2009
LV02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
Former [2010/28]CY02.12.2009
FI02.12.2009
LT02.12.2009
LV02.12.2009
SE02.12.2009
SI02.12.2009
Cited inInternational search[A]WO0162847  (BOREALIS TECH OY [FI], et al) [A] 1-51 * page 7, line 16 - line 18 * * page 8, line 27 - page 9, line 7 * * page 11, line 25 - page 12, line 6; example -; claim - *;
 [A]GB1206795  (UNION CARBIDE CORP [US]) [A] 1-51 * the whole document *;
 [A]GB1205635  (ICI LTD [GB]) [A] 1-51 * page 1, line 30 - line 67 * * page 1, line 85 - line 86 * * page 2, line 73 - line 96 *;
 [A]US4485217  (GUNTER HARVEY R [US], et al) [A] 1-51 * the whole document *