EP2092069 - MODIFIED SOLUBLE FGF RECEPTOR FC FUSIONS WITH IMPROVED BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 15.11.2013 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.03.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 25.04.2018 [2018/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | [2013/51] |
Former [2011/19] | For all designated states Aventis Pharma S.A. 20, avenue Raymond Aron 92160 Antony / FR | ||
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states CENTELION 72-82 rue Léon Geffroy 94400 Vitry Sur Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NESBIT, Mark Sanofi-aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | 02 /
CAMERON, Béatrice Sanofi-aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | 03 /
BLANCHE, Francis Sanofi-aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | 04 /
SORDELLO, Sylvie Sanofi-aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | 05 /
NICOLAZZI, Céline Sanofi-aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | 06 /
TROMBE, Marc Sanofi-aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | [2013/51] |
Former [2009/35] | 01 /
NESBIT, Mark Sanofi-aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
02 /
CAMERON, Béatrice Sanofi-aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | |||
03 /
BLANCHE, Francis Sanofi-aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | |||
04 /
SORDELLO, Sylvie Sanofi-aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | |||
05 /
NICOLAZZI, Céline Sanofi-aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | |||
06 /
TROMBE, Marc Sanofi-aventis 174 avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Representative(s) | Neyret, Daniel Jean Marie, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/38] | Neyret, Daniel Jean Marie, et al Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | ||
Former [2011/09] | Bouvet, Philippe Aventis Pharma S.A. Département Brevets 174 Avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2009/35] | Bouquin, Nicolas Sanofi-Aventis Département Brevets 174, avenue de France 75013 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07866627.8 | 28.11.2007 | [2009/35] | WO2007IB04354 | Priority number, date | EP20060291824 | 28.11.2006 Original published format: EP 06291824 | EP20070290042 | 11.01.2007 Original published format: EP 07290042 | [2009/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008065543 | Date: | 05.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2092069 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2092069 | Date: | 11.05.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/19] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP2092069 | Date: | 18.12.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 14.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C12N15/62, A61K38/17, A61K47/48, C07K14/47, C07K14/71 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
C07K14/71 (EP,US);
C07K19/00 (KR);
A61K38/17 (KR);
A61K45/06 (US);
A61K47/6811 (EP,US);
A61K47/6835 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P35/02 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07K14/47 (KR);
C07K16/46 (US);
C12N15/62 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Extension states | AL | 29.06.2009 | BA | 29.06.2009 | HR | 29.06.2009 | MK | 29.06.2009 | RS | 29.06.2009 | Title | German: | MODIFIZIERTE LÖSLICHE FGF-REZEPTOR-FC-FUSIONEN MIT VERBESSERTER BIOLOGISCHER AKTIVITÄT | [2009/35] | English: | MODIFIED SOLUBLE FGF RECEPTOR FC FUSIONS WITH IMPROVED BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITY | [2009/35] | French: | FUSIONS DE FC RÉCEPTEUR DE FGF SOLUBLE MODIFIÉ, AYANT UNE ACTIVITÉ BIOLOGIQUE AMÉLIORÉE | [2009/35] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/35] | 24.09.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 28.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
10.02.2012
13.03.2012
ADMISSIBLE Five Prime Therapeutics, Inc. Two Corporate Drive South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US Opponent's representative Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | 02
10.02.2012
13.03.2012
ADMISSIBLE Human Genome Sciences, Inc. 14200 Shady Grove Road Rockville MD Maryland 20850 / US Opponent's representative Denison, Christopher Marcus, et al, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2012/12] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
10.02.2012
Five Prime Therapeutics, Inc. Two Corporate Drive South San Francisco, CA 94080 / US Opponent's representative Denison, Christopher Marcus Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London Greater London EC2V 8AS / GB | ||
02
10.02.2012
Human Genome Sciences, Inc. 14200 Shady Grove Road Rockville MD Maryland 20850 / US Opponent's representative Denison, Christopher Marcus Mewburn Ellis LLP 33 Gutter Lane London Greater London EC2V 8AS / GB | 20.03.2012 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.09.2012 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 07.03.2013 | Date of oral proceedings | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 08.04.2013 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 18.04.2013 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 29.07.2013 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.10.2013 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.05.2011 | CZ | 11.05.2011 | PL | 11.05.2011 | [2018/17] |
Former [2016/35] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
Former [2015/24] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | ||
PL | 11.05.2011 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 11.05.2011 | |
CZ | 11.05.2011 | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0046380 (CHIRON CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-39 * abstract *; | [X] - POWELL ANDREW K ET AL, "Fibroblast growth factor receptors 1 and 2 interact differently with heparin/heparan sulfate. Implications for dynamic assembly of a ternary signaling complex", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20020809), vol. 277, no. 32, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 28554 - 28563, XP002429672 [X] 1-39 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M111754200 | [X] - ANDERSON JANE ET AL, "Apert syndrome mutations in fibroblast growth factor receptor 2 exhibit increased affinity for FGF ligand", HUMAN MOLECULAR GENETICS, (199809), vol. 7, no. 9, ISSN 0964-6906, pages 1475 - 1483, XP002429673 [X] 1-39 * page 1480 - page 1481 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/hmg/7.9.1475 | [A] - DUCHESNE LAURENCE ET AL, "N-glycosylation of fibroblast growth factor receptor 1 regulates ligand and heparan sulfate co-receptor binding", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (200609), vol. 281, no. 37, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 27178 - 27189, XP002429674 [A] * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M601248200 | [A] - TRUEB BEAT ET AL, "Characterization of FGFRL1, a novel fibroblast growth factor (FGF) receptor preferentially expressed in skeletal tissues.", JOURNAL OF BIOLOGICAL CHEMISTRY, (20030905), vol. 278, no. 36, ISSN 0021-9258, pages 33857 - 33865, XP002429675 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.M300281200 | Examination | WO2007014123 | by applicant | WO9954342 | WO0046380 | EP1331266 | EP1498490 | EP1498491 | EP1676910 | WO2006105338 | WO2007041635 | EP1792987 | - JI ET AL., FASEB J., (1998), vol. 12, pages 1731 - 1738 | - HANAHAN ET AL., CELL., (1996), vol. 86, pages 353 - 64 | - FOLKMAN, NAT. MED., (1995), vol. 1, pages 27 - 31 | - STROME, THE ONCOLOGIST, (2007), vol. 12, pages 1084 - 1095 | - SHINKAWA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2003), vol. 278, no. 5, pages 3466 - 3473 | - FERRARA ET AL., J. BIOL. CHEM., (2006), vol. 281, no. 8, pages 5032 - 5036 | - BIOTECHNOL. BIOENG., (2006), vol. 93, no. 5, pages 851 - 61 | - POWELL, J. BIOL. CHEM, (2002), vol. 277, pages 28554 - 28563 | - ANDERSON, HUM. MOL. GENET., (1998), vol. 7, pages 1475 - 1483 |