Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2099464

EP2099464 - LOCAL ADMINISTRATION OF GALLIUM COMPOSITIONS TO TREAT PAIN [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  31.03.2017
Database last updated on 14.09.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip21.09.2018Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): MT
published on 24.10.2018  [2018/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BERNSTEIN, Lawrence Richard
285 Willow Road
Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US
[2009/38]
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
 [2009/38]
Representative(s)reuteler & cie SA
Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29
1260 Nyon / CH
[2016/21]
Former [2009/38]reuteler & cie SA
Chemin de la Vuarpillière 29
1260 Nyon / CH
Application number, filing date07868690.407.11.2007
[2009/38]
WO2007US83976
Priority number, dateUS20060858182P09.11.2006         Original published format: US 858182 P
[2009/38]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008058210
Date:15.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/20]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2099464
Date:16.09.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.05.2008
[2009/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2099464
Date:25.05.2016
Language:EN
[2016/21]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US09.10.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP06.06.2011
ClassificationInternational:A61K33/24, A61P25/02
[2016/01]
Former International [2009/38]A61K33/24, A61K31/28, A61K31/555, A61P25/02, A61P29/00
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2016/21]
Former [2009/38]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
TitleGerman:LOKALE VERABREICHUNG VON GALLIUMZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR SCHMERZBEHANDLUNG[2009/38]
English:LOCAL ADMINISTRATION OF GALLIUM COMPOSITIONS TO TREAT PAIN[2009/38]
French:ADMINISTRATION LOCALE DE COMPOSITIONS DE GALLIUM POUR TRAITER LA DOULEUR[2009/38]
Entry into regional phase02.06.2009National basic fee paid 
02.06.2009Search fee paid 
02.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
02.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure02.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/38]
19.12.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
15.09.2014Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.01.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.12.2015Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.03.2016Fee for grant paid
07.03.2016Fee for publishing/printing paid
07.03.2016Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  15.09.2014
Opposition(s)28.02.2017No opposition filed within time limit [2017/18]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
12.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
24.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
19.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
25.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
24.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
19.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU07.11.2007
AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
BG25.05.2016
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IS25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
TR25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
MT07.11.2016
LU30.11.2016
[2018/43]
Former [2018/38]HU07.11.2007
AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
BG25.05.2016
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IS25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
TR25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/32]HU07.11.2007
AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IS25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
TR25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/29]HU07.11.2007
AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
TR25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2018/28]HU07.11.2007
AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CY25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
MC25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/48]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
LU30.11.2016
Former [2017/37]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SI25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/11]AT25.05.2016
BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/10]BE25.05.2016
CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
PL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
SK25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/09]CZ25.05.2016
DK25.05.2016
EE25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
RO25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/07]DK25.05.2016
ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2017/04]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
IT25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/52]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
SE25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/51]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
GR26.08.2016
PT26.09.2016
Former [2016/50]ES25.05.2016
FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
LV25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
Former [2016/49]FI25.05.2016
LT25.05.2016
NL25.05.2016
Former [2016/46]LT25.05.2016
Documents cited:Search[X]US5902825  (JIA WEI [US]) [X] 1,2,5,9,11,12 * column 6, lines 45-47 * * column 7, lines 55-60 * * column 8, lines 25-25 * * claims 1, 9, 10, 17 *;
 [X]WO2006072070  (EMISPHERE TECH INC [US]; BENDER LEWIS [US]; SHANKAR BAVANI [US] EMISPH) [X] 1,2,6-9,11,12 * claims 1,2, 8, 30 * * paragraphs [0122] , [ 131] , [ 132] *;
 [A]US6165514  (BOCKMAN RICHARD [US] ET AL) [A] 1-15
 [XI]  - EBY ET AL, "Elimination of arthritis pain and inflammation for over 2years with a single 90min, topical 14% gallium nitrate treatment: Case reports and review of actions of gallium III", MEDICAL HYPOTHESES, EDEN PRESS, PENRITH, US, (20050101), vol. 65, no. 6, doi:DOI:10.1016/J.MEHY.2005.06.021, ISSN 0306-9877, pages 1136 - 1141, XP005101378 [X] 1,2,5,9,11,12 * abstract * [I] 1-15

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.mehy.2005.06.021
International search[X]US5902825  ;
 [Y]US6165514  ;
 [Y]  - MATISON M.P. ET AL., "Cellular signaling roles of TGP beta, TNF alpha and beta APP in Brain injury responses and Altzheimer's disease", MEDLINE, U.S. NATIONAL LIBRARY OF MEDICINE, (BETHESDA, MD, USA), (199702), Database accession no. (97217625), XP008109960
    [ ] - BRAIN RESEARCH, BRAIN RESEARCH REVIEWS
Examination   - O'CONNOR A B ET AL, "Treatment of Neuropathic Pain: An Overview of Recent Guidelines", AMERICAN JOURNAL OF MEDICINE, EXCERPTA MEDICA, INC, UNITED STATES, vol. 122, no. 10, doi:10.1016/J.AMJMED.2009.04.007, ISSN 0002-9343, (20091001), pages S22 - S32, (20091001), XP026669925

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.amjmed.2009.04.007