blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP2099464 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP2099464



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 204
31.03.2017 Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period Search / examination 1
25.05.2016 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
29.04.2016 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.03.2016 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
07.03.2016 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 2
07.03.2016 French translation of claims Search / examination 3
07.03.2016 German translation of the claims Search / examination 3
16.12.2015 Bibliographic data of the European patent application Search / examination 1
16.12.2015 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 5
16.12.2015 Intention to grant (signatures) Search / examination 2
16.12.2015 Text intended for grant Search / examination 17
16.12.2015 Text intended for grant (clean copy) Search / examination 17
13.01.2015 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 1
13.01.2015 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
13.01.2015 Claims Search / examination 1
13.01.2015 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
13.01.2015 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
15.09.2014 Annex to the communication Search / examination 2
15.09.2014 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
09.09.2014 Examination started Search / examination 1
20.05.2014 Enquiry as to when a communication from the Examining Division can be expected Search / examination 1
20.05.2014 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
15.10.2012 CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) Search / examination 1
19.12.2011 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
19.12.2011 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 2
19.12.2011 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
19.12.2011 Amendments received before examination Search / examination 6
19.12.2011 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
19.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 35
19.12.2011 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 11
24.06.2011 Invitation to declare maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
06.06.2011 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
06.06.2011 European search opinion Search / examination 3
06.06.2011 Supplementary European search report Search / examination 2
03.11.2009 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
19.08.2009 Notification on forthcoming publication of bibliographic data Search / examination 1
17.07.2009 Communication regarding possible amendment of claims/payment of claims fees Search / examination 2
02.06.2009 (Electronic) Receipt Search / examination 2
02.06.2009 Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report Search / examination 1
02.06.2009 Amended claims with annotations Search / examination 2
02.06.2009 Request for entry into the European phase Search / examination 3
27.05.2009 Copy of the international preliminary report on patentability Search / examination 7
20.03.2009 Information on entry into European phase Search / examination 3
27.11.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 5
09.10.2008 Copy of the international search report Search / examination 4
09.10.2008 International publication of the international search report Search / examination 1
30.07.2008 Priority document (electronically transmitted) Search / examination 17
15.05.2008 International publication of the A2 Pamphlet Search / examination 19