Extract from the Register of European Patents

Event history: EP2099464


Date  Description European Patent Bulletin date, issue number
21.09.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  24.10.2018  [2018/43]
17.08.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  19.09.2018  [2018/38]
13.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.08.2018  [2018/33]
06.07.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.08.2018  [2018/32]
15.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  18.07.2018  [2018/29]
08.06.2018 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  11.07.2018  [2018/28]
27.10.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  29.11.2017  [2017/48]
11.08.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  13.09.2017  [2017/37]
31.03.2017 No opposition filed within time limit published on  03.05.2017  [2017/18]
24.03.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  26.04.2017  [2017/17]
17.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  22.03.2017  [2017/12]
10.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.03.2017  [2017/11]
03.02.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  08.03.2017  [2017/10]
27.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  01.03.2017  [2017/09]
13.01.2017 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  15.02.2017  [2017/07]
23.12.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  25.01.2017  [2017/04]
25.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  28.12.2016  [2016/52]
18.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  21.12.2016  [2016/51]
11.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  14.12.2016  [2016/50]
04.11.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  07.12.2016  [2016/49]
14.10.2016 Lapse of the patent in a contracting state published on  16.11.2016  [2016/46]
22.04.2016 (Expected) grant published on  25.05.2016  [2016/21]
14.03.2016 New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
09.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for grant
09.03.2016 New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing
15.12.2015 New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent
27.11.2015 Change - classification published on  30.12.2015  [2015/53]
27.11.2015 Change - classification published on  30.12.2015  [2015/53]
23.11.2015 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.01.2015 New entry: Reply to examination report
27.11.2014 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.09.2014 New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit
12.09.2014 First examination report
29.11.2013 New entry: Renewal fee paid
21.11.2012 New entry: Renewal fee paid
17.01.2012 Amendment by applicant
02.12.2011 New entry: Renewal fee paid
03.06.2011 Supplementary search report published on  06.07.2011  [2011/27]
18.11.2010 New entry: Renewal fee paid
15.01.2010 Change - extension states published on  17.02.2010  [2010/07]
10.11.2009 New entry: Renewal fee paid
14.08.2009 Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin published on  16.09.2009  [2009/38]
14.08.2009 Request for examination filed published on  16.09.2009  [2009/38]
24.07.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
07.07.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
07.07.2009 Amendment by applicant
29.05.2009 PCT data prior to European publication
11.10.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
30.05.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
22.05.2008 PCT data prior to European publication
26.03.2008 PCT data prior to European publication