blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Misleading Register Alert event notification on 15.04.19

Following a clean-up exercise of event information regarding (previously) revoked patents, that were later reinstated, some existing revocation events ("Despatch of communication that patent is revoked") were duplicated on 15.04.2019.

2019.04.15

More...
blank News flashes

Deep link introduced in Malta Register

Click here for more information on the deep linking.

2019.01.28

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

Patent family: EP2099464
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9517198Global Dossier 13.12.2016B2
US2014348898 27.11.2014A1
Priority number Date
US85818206 09.11.2006
US93660707 07.11.2007
US201213419700 14.03.2012
US201313960025 06.08.2013
US201414457938 12.08.2014
US201213648577 10.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US9114067Global Dossier 25.08.2015B2
US2015037391 05.02.2015A1
Priority number Date
US85818206 09.11.2006
US93660707 07.11.2007
US201213419700 14.03.2012
US201313960025 06.08.2013
US201213648577 10.10.2012
US201414522395 23.10.2014
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8871246Global Dossier 28.10.2014B2
US2013323297 05.12.2013A1
Priority number Date
US85818206 09.11.2006
US93660707 07.11.2007
US201213419700 14.03.2012
US201313960025 06.08.2013
US201213648577 10.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8506990Global Dossier 13.08.2013B2
US2013034595 07.02.2013A1
Priority number Date
US85818206 09.11.2006
US93660707 07.11.2007
US201213419700 14.03.2012
US201213648577 10.10.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8293268Global Dossier 23.10.2012B2
US2012171275 05.07.2012A1
Priority number Date
US93660707 07.11.2007
US85818206 09.11.2006
US201213419700 14.03.2012
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
US8168214Global Dossier 01.05.2012B2
US2008113004 15.05.2008A1
Priority number Date
US93660707 07.11.2007
US85818206 09.11.2006
TypeType Patent family member
Publication No. DateType
EP2099464Global Dossier 25.05.2016B1
EP2099464 06.07.2011A4
EP2099464 16.09.2009A2
Priority number Date
US85818206 09.11.2006
WO2007US83976 07.11.2007
TypeType Equivalent
Publication No. DateType
WO2008058210Global Dossier 27.11.2008B1
WO2008058210 09.10.2008A3
WO2008058210 15.05.2008A2
Priority number Date
US85818206 09.11.2006