Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2073797

EP2073797 - PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.01.2019
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
FormerExamination is in progress
Status updated on  28.07.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.01.2019Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 13.02.2019  [2019/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Alpharma Pharmaceuticals LLC
400 Crossing Boulevard
Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US
[2012/33]
Former [2009/27]For all designated states
Alpharma, Inc.
440 Route 22 East
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
Inventor(s)01 / MATTHEWS, Frank
440 Route 22 East
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
02 / LIANG, Alfred
440 Route 22 East
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
03 / JOHNSON, Frank
440 Route 22 East
Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US
 [2009/27]
Representative(s)Pfizer
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
[2012/33]
Former [2012/30]Motion, Keith Robert , et al
Pfizer Inc.
European Patent Department
23-25 avenue du Docteur Lannelongue
75668 Paris Cedex 14 / FR
Former [2009/27]Rodger, Sarah Anne
HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane
Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB
Application number, filing date07870775.910.10.2007
[2009/27]
WO2007US21627
Priority number, dateUS20060851099P11.10.2006         Original published format: US 851099 P
[2009/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008063301
Date:29.05.2008
Language:EN
[2008/22]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2073797
Date:01.07.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008
[2009/27]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP04.09.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/20, A61K9/50, A61K31/485, A61P25/04, A61P25/36
[2009/27]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/27]
TitleGerman:PHARMAZEUTISCHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN[2009/27]
English:PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS[2009/27]
French:COMPOSITIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES[2009/27]
Entry into regional phase19.03.2009National basic fee paid 
19.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
19.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure19.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/27]
29.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
08.01.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.07.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.06.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.04.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.01.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.07.2017Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.01.2018Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.02.2018Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.09.2018Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2019/07]
02.10.2018Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2019/07]
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  08.01.2010
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
11.01.2016Request for further processing filed
11.01.2016Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
27.01.2016Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
11.04.2013Request for further processing filed
11.04.2013Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
24.04.2013Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
06.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
10.10.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
31.10.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
31.10.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
31.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
02.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
31.10.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
02.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
31.10.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
Cited inInternational search[X]US2003157168  (BREDER CHRISTOPHER [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 1,8-12 * * example 5 and process [0292] * * example 11 and process [0350] *;
 [X]WO2004093801  (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 2,4,5,7,21-25 * * example 12 *;
 [X]WO0158447  (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-17 * claim 1 * * example 1a-1c pages 47-50 *;
 [X]US2004202717  (MEHTA ATUL M [US]) [X] 1-17 * claims 1,4,12 *;
 [X]WO02092059  (ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 1,4,5,9 *;
 [X]WO2005081825  (EURO CELTIQUE SA [LU], et al) [X] 1-17 * claims 1,16-18 *;
 [X]US2003143269  (OSHLACK BENJAMIN [US], et al) [X] 1-17 * examples 1,4; claims 1,19-23 *;
 [E]WO2007149438  (ALPHARMA INC [US], et al) [E] 1-17 * claims 1,50-54 *