Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2049262

EP2049262 - NANONOZZLE DEVICE ARRAYS: THEIR PREPARATION AND USE FOR MACROMOLECULAR ANALYSIS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  30.11.2016
Database last updated on 13.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip07.08.2019Change: Date of oral proceedings 
07.08.2019Deletion: Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BioNano Genomics, Inc.
3701 Market Street, 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US
[2011/51]
Former [2009/17]For all designated states
Bionanomatrix, Inc.
3701 Market Street, 4th Floor
Philadelphia, PA 19104 / US
Inventor(s)01 / CAO, Han
2001 Hamilton Street Suite 2123
Philadelphia, PA 19130 / US
02 / DESHPANDE, Parikshit, A.
101 Lassen Court, Apt. 4
Princeton, NJ 08540 / US
03 / AUSTIN, Michael, D.
911 South Bodine Street
Philadelphia, PA 19147 / US
04 / BOYCE-JACINO, Michael
2 Clark Court
Titusville, NJ 08560 / US
 [2009/17]
Representative(s)Small, Gary James , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford LLP
One Southampton Row
London WC1B 5HA / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/18]Hallybone, Huw George , et al
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Former [2009/17]Hallybone, Huw George
Carpmaels & Ransford 43-45 Bloomsbury Square
London WC1A 2RA / GB
Application number, filing date07872156.019.07.2007
[2009/17]
WO2007US16408
Priority number, dateUS20060831772P19.07.2006         Original published format: US 831772 P
US20070908582P28.03.2007         Original published format: US 908582 P
US20070908584P28.03.2007         Original published format: US 908584 P
[2009/17]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008079169
Date:03.07.2008
Language:EN
[2008/27]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2049262
Date:22.04.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.07.2008
[2009/17]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP02.10.2008
ClassificationInternational:B01L3/00, B81C1/00, G01N27/447
[2009/17]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/17]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:NANODÜSEN-GERÄTEANORDNUNGEN: IHRE HERSTELLUNG UND VERWENDUNG ZUR MAKROMOLEKULAREN ANALYSE[2009/17]
English:NANONOZZLE DEVICE ARRAYS: THEIR PREPARATION AND USE FOR MACROMOLECULAR ANALYSIS[2009/17]
French:RÉSEAUX DE DISPOSITIF DE NANOBUSES: LEUR PRÉPARATION ET UTILISATION DANS L'ANALYSE MACROMOLÉCULAIRE[2009/17]
Entry into regional phase05.02.2009National basic fee paid 
05.02.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
05.02.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure04.11.2008Request for preliminary examination filed
International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP
05.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
05.02.2009Examination requested  [2009/17]
01.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.06.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
15.07.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.11.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.09.2017Date of oral proceedings
12.10.2017Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
12.10.2017Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Appeal following examination19.12.2017Appeal received No.  T0648/18
22.02.2018Statement of grounds filed
19.05.2020Date of oral proceedings
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  01.02.2016
Fees paidRenewal fee
05.02.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
14.07.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
12.07.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
13.07.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
10.07.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
14.07.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
10.07.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
11.07.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
12.07.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
11.07.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
15.07.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Cited inInternational search[X]US6696022  (CHAN EUGENE Y [US] ET AL) [X] 1-85 * column 18, line 13 - column 27, line 27; figures 1-6,10-28 * * column 28, line 22 - column 32, line 67 *;
 [X]US6627067  (BRANTON DANIEL [US] ET AL) [X] 1-85 * column 4, lines 29-60; figures 8-16 * * column 7, line 50 - column 14, line 67 *;
 [X]US2006011862  (BERNSTEIN JONATHAN [US]) [X] 1-85 * paragraphs [0033] , [0035] , [0050] *;
 [X]US2004033515  (CAO HAN [US] ET AL CAO HAN [US] ET AL) [X] 1-85 * paragraphs [0037] - [0042] - [0051] , [0054] - [0060]; figure 7 *;
 [X]  - RECCIUS ET AL., "Compression and Free Expansion of Single DNA Molecules in Nanochannels", PHYSICAL REVIEW LETTERS, (20051221), vol. 95, pages 268101-1 - 268101-4, XP002488756 [X] 18-51 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1103/PhysRevLett.95.268101
 [A]  - HENRIQUEZ ET AL., "The resurgence of Coulter counting for analyzing nanoscale objects", THE ANALYST, (2004), vol. 129, pages 478 - 482, XP002488755 [A] 1-85 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b404251b
 [A]  - MIJATOVIC D ET AL, "TECHNOLOGIES FOR NANOFLUIDIC SYSTEMS: TOP-DOWN VS. BOTTOM-UP - A REVIEW", LAB ON A CHIP, ROYAL SOCIETY OF CHEMISTRY, CAMBRIDGE, GB, (20050101), vol. 5, ISSN 1473-0197, pages 492 - 500, XP001090558 [A] 61-72 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1039/b416951d