Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2095221

EP2095221 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFICATION AND AUTHENTICATION OF A USER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusExamination is in progress
Status updated on  06.02.2013
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip16.11.2019New entry: Renewal fee paid 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Verient, Inc.
1190 Saratoga Ave., 220
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
[2009/36]
Inventor(s)01 / SHAKKARWAR, Rajesh, G.
1190 Saratoga Ave. No. 220
San Jose, CA 95129 / US
 [2009/52]
Former [2009/38]01 / SHAKKARWAR, Rajesh, G.
20640 Oak Creek Lane
Saratoga, CA 95070 / US
Former [2009/36]01 / SHAKKARWAR, Rajesh, G.
1136 Derbyshire Drive
Cupertino, CA 95014 / US
Representative(s)Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Dilg, Haeusler, Schindelmann Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Leonrodstraße 58
80636 München / DE
Application number, filing date07873624.621.11.2007
[2009/36]
WO2007US85332
Priority number, dateUS2006056233021.11.2006         Original published format: US 562330
US2006056235321.11.2006         Original published format: US 562353
[2009/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008127431
Date:23.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/43]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2095221
Date:02.09.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008
[2009/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US08.01.2009
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP16.07.2010
ClassificationInternational:G06F7/04, G06F21/00, G07F7/10
[2010/31]
Former International [2009/36]G06F7/04
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/36]
TitleGerman:SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR IDENTIFIKATION UND AUTHENTIFIZIERUNG EINES BENUTZERS[2009/36]
English:SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR IDENTIFICATION AND AUTHENTICATION OF A USER[2009/36]
French:SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS D'IDENTIFICATION ET D'AUTHENTIFICATION D'UN UTILISATEUR[2009/36]
Entry into regional phase21.05.2009National basic fee paid 
21.05.2009Search fee paid 
21.05.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
21.05.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure21.05.2009Examination requested  [2009/36]
11.02.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
12.04.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
18.08.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
08.10.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
04.02.2013Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.09.2013Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 16.09.2013
16.09.2013Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
16.09.2013Date of oral proceedings (cancelled)
Appeal following examination18.11.2013Appeal received No.  T0439/14
27.01.2014Statement of grounds filed
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  12.04.2011
Fees paidRenewal fee
06.11.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
22.10.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
07.11.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
07.11.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
07.11.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
07.11.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
06.11.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
07.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
07.11.2017Renewal fee patent year 11
07.11.2018Renewal fee patent year 12
14.11.2019Renewal fee patent year 13
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US6000832  (FRANKLIN D CHASE [US] ET AL) [X] 1-6,15 * the whole document * [Y] 7-10 [I] 11-14;
 [XAY]WO03038719  (ARCOT SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 1-6,15 * the whole document * [A] 11-14 [Y] 7-10;
 [A]US2006124756  (BROWN KERRY D [US] BROWN KERRY DENNIS [US]) [A] 1-15 * paragraph [0013] *;
 [YA]US2004010685  (SAKAGUCHI HARUHIKO [JP] ET AL) [Y] 7,8 * the whole document * [A] 1-6,9-15;
 [YA]US2002053035  (SCHUTZER DANIEL [US]) [Y] 7-10 * the whole document * [A] 1-6,11-15
    [XAYI] - E. R. Harold, "Virtual account numbers", (20060829), URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20060829000813/http://www.elharo.com/blog/privacy/2006/05/17/virtual-account-numbers/, (20100621), XP002588797 [X] 1-4,7,15 * the whole document * [A] 12-14 [Y] 7-10 [I] 5,11
International search[XY]US2006173781  (DONNER IRAH H [US]) [X] 1-5, 9-15, 18-23, 25-28, 31-43, 46-61, 63-78 * , entire document, especially Abstract, FIGS.20, 38 and 47; and para [0048], [0052], [0056], [0089], [0111], [0113], [0141], [0151], [0163], [0166], [0179], [0190]-[0191], [0211], [0218], [0228], [0248], [0258], [0282], [0287]-[0288], [0313]-[0314], [0328], [0358]-[0359], [0379], [0417], [0445]-[044 * [Y] 6-8, 16-17, 24, 29-30, 44- 45, 62;
 [Y]US2006212407  (LYON DENNIS B [US]) [Y] 6-8, 16-17, 24, 29-30, 44- 45, 62 * , entire document, especially Abstract, FIGS.4 and 7B; and para [0002], [0111], (0126], [0131] and [0183] *;
 [A]US2006177061  (ORSINI RICK L [US], et al) [A] 1-78 * entire document *
by applicantUS6000832