Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2025178

EP2025178 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LOCATING AND MONITORING FIRST RESPONDERS [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  10.06.2011
Database last updated on 20.02.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip10.06.2011Withdrawal of applicationpublished on 13.07.2011  [2011/28]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TRX Systems, Inc.
387 Technology Drive
College Park, MD 20742 / US
[2009/08]
Inventor(s)01 / BANDYOPADHYAY, Amrit
3014 13th Street, N.W.
Washington, D.C. 20009 / US
02 / KOHN, Eric, A.
4705 Norwich Road
College Park, MD 20740 / US
03 / GOLDSMAN, Neil
7101 Poplar Avenue
Takoma Park, MD 20912 / US
04 / TEOLIS, Carole, A.
8101 Hollygate Drive
Glendale, MD 20769 / US
05 / BLANKENSHIP, Gilmer, L.
4500 Lowell Street, NW
Washington, DC 20016 / US
06 / FUNK, Benjamin, E.
6478 Hanover Rd.
Hanover, MD 21076-1029 / US
 [2009/25]
Former [2009/13]01 / BANDYOPADHYAY, Amrit
120 Westway, Apt. T2
Greenbelt, MD 20770 / US
02 / KOHN, Eric, A.
4705 Norwich Road
College Park, MD 20740 / US
03 / GOLDSMAN, Neil
7101 Poplar Avenue
Takoma Park, MD 20912 / US
04 / TEOLIS, Carole, A.
8101 Hollygate Drive
Glendale, MD 20769 / US
05 / BLANKENSHIP, Gilmer, L.
4500 Lowell Street, NW
Washington, DC 20016 / US
06 / FUNK, Benjamin, E.
6478 Hanover Rd.
Hanover, MD 21076-1029 / US
Former [2009/08]01 / BANDYOPADHYAY, Amrit
120 Westway, Apt. T2
Greenbelt, MD 20770 / US
02 / KOHN, Eric, A.
4705 Norwich Road
College Park, MD 20740 / US
03 / GOLDSMAN, Neil
7101 Poplar Avenue
Takoma Park, MD 20912 / US
04 / TEOLIS, Carole, A.
8101 Hollygate Drive
Glendale, MD 20769 / US
05 / BLANKENSHIP, Gilmer, L.
4500 Lowell Street, NW
Washington, DC 20016 / US
06 / FUNK, Benjamin, E.
8811 Colesville Road, Apt. 1001
Silver Spring, MD 20910 / US
Representative(s)Beck, Simon Antony , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP
4 More London Riverside
London SE1 2AU / GB
[N/P]
Former [2009/08]Beck, Simon Antony , et al
Withers & Rogers LLP Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London
SE1 2HW / GB
Application number, filing date07873941.431.05.2007
[2009/08]
WO2007US13039
Priority number, dateUS20060809900P31.05.2006         Original published format: US 809900 P
US20070914032P25.04.2007         Original published format: US 914032 P
[2009/08]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008108788
Date:12.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/37]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2025178
Date:18.02.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.09.2008
[2009/08]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US20.11.2008
ClassificationInternational:H04W84/02
[2009/09]
Former International [2009/08]H04Q7/20
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/08]
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR LOKALISIERUNG UND ÜBERWACHUNG VON ERSTEN REAKTIONEN[2009/08]
English:METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR LOCATING AND MONITORING FIRST RESPONDERS[2009/08]
French:PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME PERMETTANT LA LOCALISATION ET LA SURVEILLANCE DE PREMIERS INTERVENANTS[2009/08]
Entry into regional phase09.12.2008National basic fee paid 
09.12.2008Search fee paid 
09.12.2008Designation fee(s) paid 
09.12.2008Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure09.12.2008Examination requested  [2009/08]
13.02.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.05.2011Application withdrawn by applicant  [2011/28]
Fees paidRenewal fee
09.12.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[X]US2004021569  (LEPKOFKER ROBERT [US], et al) [X] 1-2 * entire document (especially para [0016],[0022]-[0027],[0033]-[0037],[0041]-[0043]) *;
 [A]US2006074540  (BRAUNBERGER ALFRED S [US], et al) [A] 1-2 * entire document *;
 [A]US2003045998  (MEDL THOMAS E [US]) [A] 1-2 * entire document *