blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP2094805

EP2094805 - SILICONE ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  04.07.2014
Database last updated on 23.04.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip04.07.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 06.08.2014  [2014/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Momentive Performance Materials Inc.s
187 Danbury Road
Wilton, CT 06897 / US
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]For all designated states
Momentive Performance Materials Inc.
187 Danbury Road
Wilton, CT 06897 / US
Inventor(s)01 / DAVID, Jennifer, Lynn
53 Church Avenue
Ballston Spa, NY 12020 / US
 [2009/36]
Representative(s)Herrmann, Uwe, et al
Lorenz Seidler Gossel
Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte
Partnerschaft mbB
Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2009/36]Herrmann, Uwe, et al
Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel Widenmayerstrasse 23
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date07873954.730.08.2007
[2009/36]
WO2007US19111
Priority number, dateUS2006056610201.12.2006         Original published format: US 566102
[2009/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report
No.:WO2008111953
Date:18.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2094805
Date:02.09.2009
Language:EN
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[2009/36]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP27.08.2009
ClassificationIPC:C09J183/07
[2009/36]
CPC:
C09J183/04 (EP,KR,US); C08L83/00 (EP,US); C09J9/02 (KR);
C08K3/013 (EP,US); C08K3/22 (EP,US); C08K3/28 (EP,US);
C08K3/38 (EP,US); C08L2666/54 (EP,US) (-)
C-Set:
C09J183/04, C08L83/00 (US,EP);
C09J183/04, C08L83/00, C08L2666/54 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/36]
TitleGerman:SILIKONHAFTZUSAMMENSETZUNG UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG[2009/36]
English:SILICONE ADHESIVE COMPOSITION AND METHOD FOR PREPARING THE SAME[2009/36]
French:COMPOSITION ADHÉSIVE DE SILICONE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION[2009/36]
Entry into regional phase30.06.2009National basic fee paid 
30.06.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
30.06.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure30.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
30.06.2009Examination requested  [2009/36]
01.03.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/32]
28.03.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [2014/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
26.10.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
25.08.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
25.08.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.08.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.08.200903   M06   Fee paid on   26.10.2009
31.08.201307   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Cited inInternational search[XD]US5021494  (TOYA MASANORI [JP]) [XD] 1-31 * claims 1,11 *;
 [X]US2002014692  (YAMADA KUNIHIRO [JP], et al) [X] 1-31 * claims 1,3 *;
 [X]WO2004092278  (DOW CORNING TORAY SILICONE [JP], et al) [X] 1-31* claim 1 *;
 [XD]US2005049350  (TONAPI SANDEEP [US], et al) [XD] 1-31 * claims 4,5 *
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.