Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2086877

EP2086877 - METAL OXIDE FIBERS AND NANOFIBERS, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME, AND USES THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.05.2014
Database last updated on 23.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip16.05.2014Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 18.06.2014  [2014/25]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
University of Akron
Buchtel Hall
Akron, OH 44325 / US
[2009/33]
Inventor(s)01 / CHASE, George, C.
654 Archwood Road
Wadsworth, OH 44281 / US
02 / ESPE, Matthew, P.
150 North Highland
Akron, OH 44302 / US
03 / EVANS, Edward, A.
1699 Callandar Drive
Hudson, OH 44236 / US
04 / RAMSIER, Rex, D.
1261 W. Bayton Street
Alliance, OH 44601 / US
05 / RENEKER, Darrell, H.
2988 Ridgeline Trail
Stow, OH 44224 / US
06 / TUTTLE, Richard, W.
514A 8th Street
Irwin, PA 15642 / US
07 / RAPP, Jennifer
108 Jewel Dr. 207
Ames, IA 50010 / US
 [2009/33]
Representative(s)dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB
Deichmannhaus am Dom
Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
[N/P]
Former [2010/15]von Kreisler Selting Werner
Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Former [2009/33]Weber, Thomas
Patentanwälte von Kreisler Selting Werner Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1
50667 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date07873978.628.09.2007
[2009/33]
WO2007US20948
Priority number, dateUS20060848189P29.09.2006         Original published format: US 848189 P
US20070919453P22.03.2007         Original published format: US 919453 P
US20070939498P22.05.2007         Original published format: US 939498 P
[2009/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008111960
Date:18.09.2008
Language:EN
[2008/38]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2086877
Date:12.08.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.09.2008
[2009/33]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:US31.12.2008
(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.12.2010
ClassificationInternational:C01B21/26
[2009/33]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/33]
TitleGerman:METALLOXIDFASERN UND NANOFASERN, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN UND VERWENDUNGEN DAFÜR[2009/33]
English:METAL OXIDE FIBERS AND NANOFIBERS, METHOD FOR MAKING SAME, AND USES THEREOF[2009/33]
French:FIBRES ET NANOFIBRES D'OXYDE DE MÉTAL, PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION DE CELLES-CI ET LEURS UTILISATIONS[2009/33]
Entry into regional phase27.04.2009National basic fee paid 
27.04.2009Search fee paid 
27.04.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
27.04.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure27.04.2009Examination requested  [2009/33]
18.10.2011Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
24.04.2012Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
05.11.2012Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.09.2013Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.01.2014Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [2014/25]
12.02.2014Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time  [2014/25]
Divisional application(s)EP10185802.5  / EP2267199
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  24.04.2012
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report
25.10.2011Request for further processing filed
18.10.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.02.2012Decision despatched
The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application
18.10.2011Request for further processing filed
18.10.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.02.2012Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
04.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
07.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
08.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
27.09.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
26.09.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
Documents cited:Search[XYI]US2004067358  (KIM HAG-YONG [KR]) [X] 1-8,10,18 * claims 1,2,4-6 * * paragraphs [0013] - [0014] - [0020] , [0039] - [0044] - [0000] , [0053] * * figure 1 * * example 2 * [Y] 11-14 [I] 9;
 [Y]US2005287042  (CHASE GEORGE G [US] ET AL) [Y] 14 * claims 1-3 * * paragraphs [0017] - [0019] *;
 [Y]  - KATTA P ET AL, "Continuous Electrospinning of Aligned Polymer Nanofibers onto a Wire Drum Collector", NANO LETTERS, ACS, WASHINGTON, DC, US, (20040928), vol. 4, no. 11, doi:DOI:10.1021/NL0486158, ISSN 1530-6984, pages 2215 - 2218, XP002466227 [Y] 11,12 * title * * abstract * * figures 1-2 * * page 2217, column 2, line 3 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/nl0486158
 [Y]  - DAN LI ET AL, "Electrospinning of Nanofibers: Reinventing the Wheel?", ADVANCED MATERIALS, WILEY VCH VERLAG, DE, (20040719), vol. 16, no. 14, doi:DOI:10.1002/ADMA.200400719, ISSN 0935-9648, pages 1151 - 1170, XP002385745 [Y] 11-14 * page 1162, paragraph 4.1 * * page 1158, column 1, lines 1-8, paragraph 3.2.3 * * page 1158, column 2, line 47, paragraph 3.2.4 - page 1159, column 1, line 7 *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/adma.200400719
 [X]  - Richard W. TUTTLE, "Electrospun alumina fibers: synthesis and characterization", (200612), the Graduate Faculty of the University of Akron, URL: http://etd.ohiolink.edu/send-pdf.cgi/Tuttle%20Richard%20W.pdf?akron1164040902, XP002610560 [X] 9 * the whole document *
International search[X]US2004067358  ;
 [X]US2006065021  ;
 [X]US2006182670  ;
 [Y]US2007018361  ;
 [Y]US6106913  ;
 [Y]US2003054245  ;
 [Y]US2005287042  ;
 [YP]US2007076349  ;
 [YP]US2007269655