Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2095055

EP2095055 - COMPOSITE ARMOR AND METHOD FOR MAKING COMPOSITE ARMOR [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  23.02.2018
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
FormerThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  17.03.2017
FormerGrant of patent is intended
Status updated on  10.03.2017
Most recent event   Tooltip11.10.2019Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): CY
published on 13.11.2019  [2019/46]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
505 King Avenue
Columbus, OH 43201-2693 / US
[2009/36]
Inventor(s)01 / SAYRE, Jay
5550 Swingley Drive
Gahanna, OH 43230 / US
02 / VERSLUIS, Scott
8079 Inistork Drive
Dublin, OH 43017 / US
03 / VALENTINE, Kary, L.
117 Union Church Road
Mars, PA 16046 / US
 [2009/36]
Representative(s)Samson & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Widenmayerstraße 6
80538 München / DE
[2017/16]
Former [2009/36]Samson & Partner
Widenmayerstrasse 5
80538 München / DE
Application number, filing date07874517.104.12.2007
[2009/36]
WO2007US86353
Priority number, dateUS20060868371P04.12.2006         Original published format: US 868371 P
[2009/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2  Application without search report
No.:WO2008130451
Date:30.10.2008
Language:EN
[2008/44]
Type: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP2095055
Date:02.09.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008
[2009/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2095055
Date:19.04.2017
Language:EN
[2017/16]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP22.01.2009
ClassificationInternational:F41H5/04
[2009/36]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2017/16]
Former [2009/36]AT,  BE,  BG,  CH,  CY,  CZ,  DE,  DK,  EE,  ES,  FI,  FR,  GB,  GR,  HU,  IE,  IS,  IT,  LI,  LT,  LU,  LV,  MC,  MT,  NL,  PL,  PT,  RO,  SE,  SI,  SK,  TR 
Extension statesALNot yet paid
BANot yet paid
HRNot yet paid
MKNot yet paid
RSNot yet paid
TitleGerman:VERBUNDPANZER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES VERBUNDPANZERS[2009/36]
English:COMPOSITE ARMOR AND METHOD FOR MAKING COMPOSITE ARMOR[2009/36]
French:BLINDAGE COMPOSITE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE BLINDAGE COMPOSITE[2009/36]
Entry into regional phase03.07.2009National basic fee paid 
03.07.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
03.07.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure03.07.2009Examination requested  [2009/36]
07.09.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
13.01.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.05.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.03.2015Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
21.09.2015Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.02.2016Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.08.2016Reply to a communication from the examining division
31.10.2016Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.03.2017Fee for grant paid
03.03.2017Fee for publishing/printing paid
03.03.2017Receipt of the translation of the claim(s)
Divisional application(s)The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  13.01.2011
Opposition(s)22.01.2018No opposition filed within time limit [2018/13]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.12.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
22.11.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
07.12.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
07.12.2012Renewal fee patent year 06
06.12.2013Renewal fee patent year 07
30.10.2014Renewal fee patent year 08
07.10.2015Renewal fee patent year 09
30.11.2016Renewal fee patent year 10
Lapses during opposition  TooltipHU04.12.2007
AT19.04.2017
CY19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
[2019/46]
Former [2019/31]HU04.12.2007
AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2019/30]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
MC19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2018/52]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
CH31.12.2017
LI31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2018/49]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
BE31.12.2017
FR02.01.2018
Former [2018/45]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
IE04.12.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
Former [2018/43]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
LU04.12.2017
MT04.12.2017
Former [2018/25]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SI19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/11]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
IT19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/10]AT19.04.2017
CZ19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
RO19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
SK19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2018/09]AT19.04.2017
DK19.04.2017
EE19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/50]AT19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
LV19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
PL19.04.2017
SE19.04.2017
BG19.07.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/49]AT19.04.2017
ES19.04.2017
FI19.04.2017
LT19.04.2017
NL19.04.2017
GR20.07.2017
IS19.08.2017
Former [2017/48]NL19.04.2017
Cited inInternational search[XY]US5254383  (HARPELL GARY A [US] ET AL) [X] 1-20,29-31 * column 1, lines 23-37; figures 1,2,5-7; claims 1,6,14-17 * * column 3, lines 31-42 * * columns 5,6 * * column 8, line 62 - column 9, line 12 * * column 10, line 22 - line 31 * * column 12, line 14 - line 33 * * column 13, line 46 - line 49 * [Y] 21-28,32,33;
 [Y]US6532857  (SHIH CHIENCHUNG JAMES [US] ET AL) [Y] 21-28,32,33 * column 5, lines 4-9; figures 5,8; claim 1 * * column 6, lines 12,51 * * column 7, line 53 *;
 [A]US4307140  (DAVIS THOMAS E) [A] 21-28,32,33 * column 3, lines 19-47,59-78 * * column 11, lines 42-46 * * column 2, line 27 - line 34 * * column 2, lines 11-16 * * column 7, line 30 * * column 11, lines 30-46 * * figures 1-12; claim 1 *