Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP2068918

EP2068918 - VACCINE COMPOSITION CONTAINING SYNTHETIC ADJUVANT [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe patent has been granted
Status updated on  30.03.2012
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip25.01.2019Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: PT
published on 27.02.2019  [2019/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Infectious Disease Research Institute
1124 Columbia Street Suite 400
Seattle, Washington 98104 / US
[2009/25]
Inventor(s)01 / REED, Steven, G.
2843 122nd Place Northeast
Bellevue, WA 98005 / US
02 / CARTER, Darrick
836 Northwest 64th
Seattle, WA 98107 / US
 [2009/25]
Representative(s)Mewburn Ellis LLP
City Tower
40 Basinghall Street
London EC2V 5DE / GB
[N/P]
Former [2013/11]Brasnett, Adrian Hugh , et al
Mewburn Ellis LLP
33 Gutter Lane
London EC2V 8AS / GB
Former [2012/18]Walker, Ross Thomson , et al
Forresters
Skygarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2012/13]Walker, Ross Thomson , et al
Forrester & Boehmert
SkyGarden
Erika-Mann-Strasse 11
80636 München / DE
Former [2010/22]Walker, Ross Thomson , et al
Forrester & Boehmert Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22
80336 München / DE
Former [2009/25]Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät
Leopoldstrasse 4
80802 München / DE
Application number, filing date07875082.526.09.2007
[2009/25]
WO2007US21017
Priority number, dateUS20060847404P26.09.2006         Original published format: US 847404 P
[2009/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO2008153541
Date:18.12.2008
Language:EN
[2008/51]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP2068918
Date:17.06.2009
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.12.2008
[2009/25]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP2068918
Date:02.05.2012
Language:EN
[2012/18]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP18.12.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61K39/39
[2009/25]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IS,   IT,   LI,   LT,   LU,   LV,   MC,   MT,   NL,   PL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2009/25]
TitleGerman:IMPFSTOFFZUSAMMENSETZUNG MIT EINEM SYNTHETISCHEN ADJUVANS[2009/25]
English:VACCINE COMPOSITION CONTAINING SYNTHETIC ADJUVANT[2009/25]
French:COMPOSITION DE VACCIN CONTENANT UN ADJUVANT SYNTHETIQUE[2009/25]
Entry into regional phase05.03.2009National basic fee paid 
05.03.2009Designation fee(s) paid 
05.03.2009Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure05.03.2009Examination requested  [2009/25]
29.06.2009Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
02.02.2010Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
11.08.2010Reply to a communication from the examining division
03.02.2011Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
20.09.2011Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
30.11.2011Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.03.2012Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.03.2012Fee for grant paid
23.03.2012Fee for publishing/printing paid
Divisional application(s)EP12153249.3  / EP2484375
EP12153254.3   Application refused  : 06.07.2012
EP12153256.8  / EP2486938
EP12153267.5  / EP2468300
EP18165195.1  / EP3403667
The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is  02.02.2010
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  01.02.2013   
Avanti Polar Lipids, Inc.
700 Industrial Park Drive
Alabaster, AL 35007-9105 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB
Siebertstrasse 3
81675 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2013/11]
Opponent(s)01  01.02.2013   
Avanti Polar Lipids, Inc.
700 Industrial Park Drive
Alabaster, AL 35007-9105 / US
Opponent's representative
Vossius & Partner
Siebertstrasse 4
81675 München / DE
12.03.2013Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
27.09.2013Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.07.2014Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M06)
30.01.2015Reply to a communication from the opposition division
30.09.2016Date of oral proceedings
20.12.2016Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.12.2016Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
Appeal following opposition24.02.2017Appeal received No.  T0154/17
28.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
18.01.2017Appeal received No.  T0154/17
28.04.2017Statement of grounds filed
Request for further processing for:The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report
30.11.2011Request for further processing filed
30.11.2011Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
13.12.2011Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
25.09.2009Renewal fee patent year 03
27.09.2010Renewal fee patent year 04
26.09.2011Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2019/09]
Former [2018/28]PT26.03.2018
Former [2018/27]CY26.09.2017
PT26.03.2018
Former [2018/23]CY26.09.2017
Cited inInternational search[A]EP0224260  (TOHO YAKUHIN KOGYO KK [JP]) [A] 1-25 * the whole document *
 [X]  - ULRICH J T ET AL, "THE ADJUVANT ACTIVITY OF MONOPHOSPHORYL LIPID A", ADJUVANT ACTIVITY OF MONOPHOSPHORYL LIPID A, (19910101), pages 133 - 143, XP002906191 [X] 1-25 * the whole document *
 [X]  - ULRICH J T ET AL, MONOPHOSPHORYL LIPID A AS AN ADJUVANT, VACCINE DESIGN. SUBUNIT AND ADJUVANT APPROACH; [PHARMACEUTICAL BIOTECHNOLOGY], NEW YORK, PLENUM PRESS, US, PAGE(S) 495 - 526, (19950101), ISBN 978-0-306-44867-6, XP000942421 [X] 1-25 * the whole document *
 [X]  - MAEDA H ET AL, "ADJUVANT ACTIVITIES OF SYNTHETIC LIPID A SUBUNIT ANALOGUES AND ITS CONJUGATES WITH MURAMYL DIPEPTIDE DERIVATIVES", VACCINE, (1989), vol. 7, no. 3, ISSN 0264-410X, pages 275 - 281, XP000993028 [X] 1-25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/0264-410X(89)90243-0
 [X]  - KANEGASAKI S ET AL, "BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITIES OF ANALOGS OF LIPID A BASED CHEMICALLY ON THE REVISED STRUCTURAL MODEL COMPARISON OF MEDIATOR-INDUCING IMMUNOMODULATING AND ENDOTOXIC ACTIVITIES", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1984), vol. 143, no. 2, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 237 - 242, XP002498330 [X] 1-5,8-14,17-21,24,25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1984.tb08364.x
 [X]  - YASUDA T ET AL, "FURTHER STUDY OF BIOLOGICAL ACTIVITIES OF CHEMICALLY SYNTHESIZED ANALOGS OF LIPID A IN ARTIFICIAL MEMBRANE VESICLES", EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1984), vol. 140, no. 2, ISSN 0014-2956, pages 245 - 248, XP002498331 [X] 1-3,5,8-12,14,17-21,24,25 * the whole document *

DOI:   http://dx.doi.org/10.1111/j.1432-1033.1984.tb08094.x
by applicant   - VACCINE, (1989), vol. 7, no. 3, pages 275 - 281
    - EUROPEAN JOURNAL OF BIOCHEMISTRY, (1984), vol. 143, no. 2, pages 237 - 242