Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP1911485

EP1911485 - Catheter insertion device [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.07.2010
Database last updated on 27.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.10.2012Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): TR
published on 21.11.2012  [2012/47]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
B. Braun Melsungen AG
Carl-Braun-Strasse 1
34212 Melsungen / DE
[2008/16]
Inventor(s)01 / Woehr, Kevin
Danziger Strasse 2
34587 Felsburg / DE
 [2008/16]
Representative(s)Klingseisen, Franz
Klingseisen, Rings & Partner
Patentanwälte
Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/16]Klingseisen, Franz
Klingseisen & Partner Postfach 10 15 61
80089 München / DE
Application number, filing date08000580.402.07.2003
[2008/16]
Priority number, dateDE2002210394U04.07.2002         Original published format: DE 20210394 U
[2008/16]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP1911485
Date:16.04.2008
Language:DE
[2008/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP1911485
Date:09.09.2009
Language:DE
[2009/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.03.2008
ClassificationInternational:A61M25/06
[2008/16]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   BG,   CH,   CY,   CZ,   DE,   DK,   EE,   ES,   FI,   FR,   GB,   GR,   HU,   IE,   IT,   LI,   LU,   MC,   NL,   PT,   RO,   SE,   SI,   SK,   TR [2008/16]
TitleGerman:Kathetereinführvorrichtung[2008/16]
English:Catheter insertion device[2008/16]
French:Dispositif d'introduction de cathéter[2008/16]
Examination procedure14.01.2008Examination requested  [2008/16]
07.07.2008Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description)
25.03.2009Communication of intention to grant the patent
17.07.2009Fee for grant paid
17.07.2009Fee for publishing/printing paid
Parent application(s)   TooltipEP03762595.1  / EP1545681
Opposition(s)10.06.2010No opposition filed within time limit [2010/33]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 03
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 04
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 05
14.01.2008Renewal fee patent year 06
22.07.2009Renewal fee patent year 07
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBG09.09.2009
CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
DK09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
IE09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
TR09.09.2009
GR10.12.2009
PT11.01.2010
HU10.03.2010
[2012/47]
Former [2012/42]BG09.09.2009
CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
DK09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
IE09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
GR10.12.2009
PT11.01.2010
HU10.03.2010
Former [2012/41]BG09.09.2009
CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
DK09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
IE09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
GR10.12.2009
PT11.01.2010
Former [2011/25]CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
DK09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
IE09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
GR10.12.2009
PT11.01.2010
Former [2010/44]CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
DK09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
IE09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
PT11.01.2010
Former [2010/28]CY09.09.2009
CZ09.09.2009
EE09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
IE09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
RO09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
SK09.09.2009
PT11.01.2010
Former [2010/19]CY09.09.2009
FI09.09.2009
NL09.09.2009
SE09.09.2009
SI09.09.2009
Documents cited:Search[A]DE4434569  (BECTON DICKINSON CO [US]) [A] 1-7 * column A * * column 1, line 31 - line 51 * * column 3, line 62 - column 4, line 25; figures 1-9 *;
 [A]DE20104539U  (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * column A; figures 1,2 *;
 [A]EP1003588  (BRAUN MELSUNGEN AG [DE]) [A] 1-7 * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0022]; figures 1A-D *;
 [A]DE3210148  (FRESENIUS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *
by applicantDE4434569